Louisiana Asset Management Pool v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Asset Management Pool
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC., Wells Fargo & Co., Morgan Keegan, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, TD Securities LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Mizuho Securities, LLC, HSBC Securities USA, SG Americas Securities, LLC., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., CREDIT SUISSE AG, Capital One Bank, UBS Securities LLC, Unidentified Parties, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., Bank of America Corporation doing business as Banc of America Securities, JEFFERIES GROUP LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co. and RBC Capital Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss The Remaining Claim in the First Amended Complaint by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #166 Joint Consent Motion Stipulating as to Extension of Capital One Banks Time to Plead. Capital One Bank is granted of extension of time until 3/1/2021, to file a Motion to Dismiss Plainitff's First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its opposition no later than 4/29/2021, and that Capital One Bank shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss no later than 5/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/9/2021. (LLH)
February 8, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #166 Joint Consent Motion Stipulating as to Extension of Capital One Banks Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 5, 2021 Filing 166 Joint Consent Motion Stipulating as to Extension of Capital One Banks Time to Plead by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified on 2/8/2021 to edit text (ELW). Modified on 2/9/2021 to edit event and text - (LLH).
January 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
January 4, 2021 Filing 165 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01095. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 31, 2020 Filing 164 Case transferred to United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/31/2020.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Transfer Venue. The motion is granted as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/31/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Fiona Schaeffer. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine Kelly Fell. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 160 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fiona Anne Schaeffer (Fee previously paid) by SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Statement Under Oath, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 159 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine Kelly Fell (Fee previously paid) by SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Statement under Oath, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 158 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fiona A. Schaeffer (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8476085) by SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Statement under Oath, #3 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 157 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine Kelly Fell (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8475918) by SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Statement under Oath, #3 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE re #148 Request/Statement of Oral Argument: This Court will issue an order setting oral argument for a specific date and time if the Court grants the request. Counsel should not appear for oral argument until ordered to do so. Deadlines for response memoranda are not extended. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 155 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 154 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #130 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 153 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 152 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 151 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #149 MOTION to Strike #117 Response to Motion Doc #63 . **Per the filing Attorney, document was filed in error. See correct filing at record document 150.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 150 MOTION to Strike #143 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion at Doc. 131 or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Reply by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Degan Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Degan Declaration, #4 Notice of Submission)(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 149 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE RECORD DOCUMENT 150 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** MOTION to Strike #117 Response to Motion at Doc #63 or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Reply by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Degan Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Degan Declaration, #4 Notice of Submission)(Degan, Nancy) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 148 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC regarding #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 147 MOTION to Strike #140 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Leave To File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 124 by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 146 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #140 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #143 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (3).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 145 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 144 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #130 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 143 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #131 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 142 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 141 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 8/21/2020. [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 140 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #124 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #116 Amended Complaint. The deadline for the moving defendants to answer Plaintiff's complaint is extended up to and including fourteen days after the Court has ruled upon the Moving Defendants' joint partial motion to dismiss (R. Doc. 124). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/18/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Robert Sacks, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Notice of Submission)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 137 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #131 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint, #132 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge number. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (3) not 2.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 136 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #130 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint. **Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #126 , #132 Requests/Statements of Oral Argument: This Court will issue an order setting oral argument for a specific date and time if the Court grants the request. Counsel should not appear for oral argument until ordered to do so. Deadlines for response memoranda are not extended. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 133 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #126 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge number. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (3) not 2.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 135 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by RBC Capital Markets, LLC regarding #130 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 132 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC regarding #131 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Complaint re: rec. doc. 116 by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Notice of Submission)(Degan, Nancy) Modified on 8/3/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the First Amended Complaint by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Request for Oral Argument)(Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 129 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Robert Sacks, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Notice of Submission)(Freeman, George) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 128 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #116 Amended Complaint by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of No Opposition, #3 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Chastain, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 126 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jefferies Group, LLC regarding #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jefferies Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kenneth I. Schacter in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Transcript of a Chatroom Discussion dated May 5, 2015, #4 Exhibit Transcript of a Chatroom Discussion dated May 6, 2015, #5 Notice of Submission)(Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas E. Schwab on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Gwyneth A O'Neill for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/22/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A Sacks. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Cove, Jr. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 119 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Additional Counsel: Gwyneth A. O'Neill by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 118 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #111 Response to Motion, #112 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #114 Response to Motion, #115 Response to Motion, #116 Amended Complaint, #113 Response to Motion, #117 Response to Motion. Documents list counsel of record, Curtis D. Johnson, Jr., for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court(L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 116 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool.(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 112 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE re #62 , #64 Requests/Statements of Oral Argument. This Court will issue an order setting oral argument for a specific date and time if the Court grants the request. Counsel should not appear for oral argument until ordered to do so. Deadlines for response memoranda are not extended. Issued for the Court by Clerk.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 109 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Andrew Sacks (Fee previously paid) by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Andrew Sacks, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 108 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John F. Cove, Jr. (Fee previously paid) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David S. Lesser. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Sokol. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the motion be and hereby is GRANTED, and that the deadline for the Moving Defendants to answer Plaintiff's complaint is extended up to and including fourteen days after the Court has ruled upon the Moving Defendants' joint partial motion to dismiss (R. Doc. No. 55). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/8/2020. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Alexander M. McIntyre, Jr. for Wells Fargo & Co. and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/8/2020. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT REQUEST re #84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By Clerk on 7/8/2020.(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 94 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Lesser (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8389188) by Cantor Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-filing Consent Form, #4 Order)(Wisdom, Rachel) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 93 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Sokol (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8389186) by Cantor Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 E-filing Consent Form, #4 Order)(Wisdom, Rachel) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 92 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Alexander M. McIntyre, Jr. by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Hakki. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Letter) (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Agnes Dunogue.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Letter) (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 89 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certification of No Opposition, #3 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 88 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jefferies Group, LLC regarding #84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to D. Jarrett Arp. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry Sher. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Antonelli. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jefferson E. Bell. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alison L. Wollin. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (mm) (Attachment(s): #1 PHV Notice). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jawad B. Muaddi. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (mm) (Attachment(s): #1 PHV Notice) . [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jon Roellke. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachment(s): #1 PHV Notice) (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth I. Schacter. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (Attachment(s) : #1 PHV Notice) (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam S. Hakki (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8386231) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 86 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Agnes Dunogue (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8386209) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 85 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John F. Cove, Jr. (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8386171) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ryan) Modified on 7/6/2020 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jefferies Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Kenneth I. Schacter, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Request for Oral Argument)(Carter, Winstol) Modified text and removed and re-filed Request for Oral Argument on 7/6/2020 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Capital One Bank is granted a further extension of time to plead until 14 days after the later of the date that the Court resolves the pending motion to transfer, or the date the Court grants Plaintiff leave to file the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/02/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Zoe Wilde Vermeulen for Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/02/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #18 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule re: rec. doc. 18 by Louisiana Asset Management Pool. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2020. (tjg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 79 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice BARRY G. SHER (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8382738) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Barry G. Sher, #2 Exhibit A-1: Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 78 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ANTHONY ANTONELLI (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8382671) by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Anthony Antonelli, #2 Exhibit A-1: Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/30/2020. (NEF: Judge Douglas)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Arp (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8380733) by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 75 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Curtis D. Johnson, Jr. (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8379407) by Louisiana Asset Management Pool. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of C. Johnson, #3 Letter of Good Standing)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 74 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Zoe Vermeulen by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Thomas) Modified text on 6/30/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 73 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #68 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (1).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 72 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #66 Notice (Other). **Document filed in error. Document was filed regarding document 54, which is a deficient document. In addition, for future requests like this, it must be requested in the form of a motion.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 71 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #64 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, #65 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Alexander M. McIntyre, Jr., for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. 2. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (1). 3. On the Statement of Corporate Disclosure, Wells Fargo & Company should have been entered as a Corporate Parent for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. ** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 70 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Document lists counsel of record, Zoe Vermeulen, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 69 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #58 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #59 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (1).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 68 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by HSBC Securities USA identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Markets USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings PLC for HSBC Securities USA (Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 67 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #52 Joint MOTION Stipulating Amendment of Complaint and Consenting to Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 66 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Jefferies Group, LLC (Amended Notice of Submission). (Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 65 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC identifying Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Degan, Nancy) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 64 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC regarding #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Notice of Submission)(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 62 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by RBC Capital Markets, LLC regarding #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Bourgeois, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 59 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. for Stifel Nicolaus & Co. (Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 58 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Beebe, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 56 DEFICIENT: Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: rec.doc. 1 by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 54 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jefferies Group, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Kenneth I. Schacter, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Request for Oral Argument)(Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule. (Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION Stipulating Amendment of Complaint and Consenting to Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank, Louisiana Asset Management Pool. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified filers/text on 6/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jefferson E. Bell (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8375225) by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jefferson E. Bell, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jefferson E. Bell, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 50 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alison Wollin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8375174) by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Wollin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 49 DEFICIENT: JOINT STIPULATION by Capital One Bank, Louisiana Asset Management Pool re #1 Complaint. (Gulotta, James) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jawad B. Muaddi (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8373197) by Jefferies Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to E-Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 47 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon R. Roellke (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8373119) by Jefferies Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to E-Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth I. Schacter (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8373073) by Jefferies Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to E-Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 45 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Andrew Sacks (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8372489) by Stifel Nicolaus & Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 44 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule. **Please disregard the correction sent out at document 43. Motion has been set for submission on 7/8/2020 before Judge Guidry.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 43 **DISREGARD-SEE REC. DOC. 44** Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (mm) Modified text on 6/24/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 42 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule re: rec. doc. 18 by Louisiana Asset Management Pool. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading-Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 41 Supplemental Memorandum filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, in Support of #18 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Ryan Estes Johnson, Justin J. Marocco for BNP Paribas Securities Corp. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/10/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #38 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Transfer of Venue (Rec. Doc. 18) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 6/9/2020. (tjg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Transfer of Venue (Rec. Doc. 18) by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/5/2020. (NEF: Mag. 1) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 36 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Philips, Harry) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 35 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Attorneys George S. Canellos, Sean M. Murphy, Fiona A. Schaeffer are not listed as Counsel of Record. The Attorneys should either be removed from the signature block or file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 34 DEFICIENT: Supplemental Memorandum filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, in support of #18 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule . (Schwab, Thomas) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by SG Americas Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale for SG Americas Securities, LLC (Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Nomura Securities International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Ryan E.Johnson and Justin Marocco by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Raymond James Financial, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Jefferies Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group, LLC (Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Schonekas, Kyle) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BNP Paribas Securities Corp identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp (Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by UBS Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC (Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Chastain, James) Modified text/added Corporate Parent on 5/27/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Capital One Bank identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (Gulotta, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter JPMorgan Chase & Co. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (Hite, John) Modified text/added corporate parents on 5/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 DEFICIENT: Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BNP Paribas Securities Corp identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp (Johnson, Ryan) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the First-Filed Rule by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Thomas E. Schwab, #3 Exhibit 1 to Schwab Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Schwab Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Schwab Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Schwab Declaration, #7 Notice of Submission)(Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Lazerow. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/19/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew D. Lazerow (Fee previously paid) by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to E-Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Lazerow (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8307379) by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION to Reset and Coordinate Responsive Pleading Deadlines by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jefferies Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Mark) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp answer due 6/8/2020; Cantor Fitzgerald answer due 5/26/2020; Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC answer due 5/26/2020; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC answer due 5/26/2020; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/26/2020; Jefferies Group, LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC answer due 5/27/2020; Nomura Securities International, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020; RBC Capital Markets, LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Raymond James & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/26/2020; SG Americas Securities, LLC answer due 5/29/2020; Stifel Nicolaus & Co. answer due 5/29/2020; UBS Securities LLC answer due 5/26/2020; Wells Fargo & Co. answer due 5/26/2020; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC answer due 5/26/2020.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/04/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P.Morgan Securities, LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., Jefferies Group LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Thomas E. Schwab added to party Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC(pty:dft).(Schwab, Thomas) Modified filers on 4/30/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Capital One Bank is granted an extension of time until 06/26/2020 within which to move, answer, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/30/2020. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to 1 Complaint. **This was a duplicate filing of record document 5 and has been noted as such. There was no need to refile record document 5 as there was only a correction sent out, not a deficiency.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING OF REC. DOC. 5** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to 1 Complaint by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Andrew Lazerow and Sarah Suwanda, for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted.** (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead as to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney James C. Gulotta, Jr added to party Capital One Bank(pty:dft).(Gulotta, James) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet or the Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Cantor Fitzgerald, Capital One Bank, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Securities, LLC, Jefferies Group, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Mizuho Securities, LLC, Morgan Keegan, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8243922) filed by Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)Attorney Alejandro R. Perkins added to party Louisiana Asset Management Pool, Inc.(pty:pla).(Perkins, Alejandro) (Attachments 1-25 replaced on 4/2/2020) (cwa). Modified text on 4/2/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Asset Management Pool v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, JR.
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: James Rodney Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities USA
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Kelly Fell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Estes Johnson
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREDIT SUISSE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: James C. Gulotta, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew David Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Jefferson E Bell
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Represented By: Alison L. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Claire Bergeron
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation doing business as Banc of America Securities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERIES GROUP LLC
Represented By: Jawad B Muaddi
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth I Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald
Represented By: Andrew Sokol
Represented By: Rachel Wendt Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Co.
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Asset Management Pool
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?