Nairne et al v. Ardoin
Plaintiff: Dr. Dorothy Nairne, Jarrett Lofton, Rev. Clee E. Lowe, Dr. Alice Washington, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Dorothy Nairne, Clee E. Lowe, Alice Washington, Rose Thompson, Steven Harris and Alexis Calhoun
Defendant: R. Kyle Ardoin
Petitioner: State Of Louisiana
Intervenor Defendant: Clay Schexnayder and Patrick Page Cortez
Case Number: 3:2022cv00178
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER of ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE: The bench trial set for January 17, 2023 and pretrial conference set for December 19, 2022 are CANCELLED. These proceedings are ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, pending the stay of this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/31/2022. (ELW)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RULING granting #61 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/30/2022. (SWE)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Modify. The deadlines listed below, which were previously set by the Court's June 23, 2022 Scheduling Order (R. Doc. 66), are modified as follows: Completing fact discovery and filing any related motions due by 10/17/2022. Completing expert discovery and filing any related motions due by 10/21/2022. Defendant and Intervenors' Expert Reports due by 9/9/2022. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 9/23/2022. Defendant and Intervenors' Sur- Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/23/2022. (KAH)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY in Support of #61 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by State Of Louisiana. (LLH)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 61) filed by State Of Louisiana. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/22/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #75 Consent MOTION to Amend #66 Scheduling Conference,Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Alice Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Sarah) Modified on 8/22/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson: Status Conference held on 8/15/2022. The Court addressed the three discovery-related issues described in both Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference (R. Doc. 68) and the Response (R. Doc.69). The Court gave the parties guidance, emphasizing the value of practical problem solving in the place of costly litigation of inflexible, adversarial positions. (KAH)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 61) by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Stay)(Torchinsky, Jason)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Exhibit(s) to #69 Response by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - ESI Protocol, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Topics for Meet & Confer 08.01.2022, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2022.08.09 Response Letter to Plaintiffs)(Mengis, Michael)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #69 Response to Motion for Status Conference. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (EDC)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Status Conference. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 8/15/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call using the AT&T Teleconference System five minutes prior to the conference. Counsel will receive a separate e-mail containing dial-in information prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/12/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to #68 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(Prouty, Erika)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #68 MOTION for Status Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Status Conference, #2 Proposed Order for Status Conference)(Brannon, Sarah)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Exhibit(s) to #64 Memorandum in Opposition to by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Def. Discovery Responses, #2 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Sarah)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #64 Memorandum in Opposition to. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (JEG)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #61 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Sarah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw Samantha Osaki as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/1/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #62 MOTION for Samantha Osaki to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Samantha Osaki to Withdraw as Attorney by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Alice Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osaki, Samantha)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Stay by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Torchinsky, Jason)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 , #57 , and #58 Motions for Jason Torchinsky, Phillip Gordon, and Andrew B. Pardue to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/5/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #57 First MOTION for Phillip Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445240), #58 First MOTION for Andrew B. Pardue to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445243), #56 First MOTION for Jason Torchinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445221). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Proposed Order to #56 First MOTION for Jason Torchinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445221) by State Of Louisiana. (Wale, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/1/2022 to edit text (ELW).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 First MOTION for Andrew B. Pardue to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445243) by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Wale, Jeffrey) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/1/2022) (ELW). Modified on 7/1/2022 to correct page orientation (ELW).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 First MOTION for Phillip Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445240) by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Wale, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 First MOTION for Jason Torchinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2445221) by State Of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Attachment List of Admissions)(Wale, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 and #54 Motions for Michael B. De Leeuw and Amanda Giglio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/23/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #53 Ex Parte MOTION for Michael B. De Leeuw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2442163), #54 Ex Parte MOTION for Amanda Giglio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2442164). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Ex Parte MOTION for Amanda Giglio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2442164) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Amanda Giglio, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Ex Parte MOTION for Michael B. De Leeuw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2442163) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Michael B. De Leeuw, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Adcock, John)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Stephanie Legros for Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Rose Thompson, Alice Washington replacing Megan E. Snider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Substitute Stephanie Willis in place of Megan E. Snider as Attorney by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Rose Thompson, Alice Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snider, Megan)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #50 MOTION to Substitute Stephanie Willis in place of Megan E. Snider as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Efrem Mark Braden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/23/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #47 Ex Parte MOTION for Efrem Mark Braden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2431250). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder.(Mengis, Michael)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Ex Parte MOTION for Efrem Mark Braden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2431250) by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Plaintiffs' #45 Motion for Expedited Consideration is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' #41 Motion to Move the Scheduling Conference is DENIED, as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/19/2022. (KAH)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #41 MOTION to Move Scheduling Conference to an Earlier Date in Order to Preventa Situation in which Final Judgment Comes too Close to the Election Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Of Louisiana.(NLT)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder.(NLT)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #13 Motion of the Presiding Officers of the Louisiana Legislature to Intervene and #33 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/17/2022. (KAH)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #41 MOTION to Continue To move Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Move Scheduling Conference to an Earlier Date in Order to Preventa Situation in which Final Judgment Comes too Close to the Election Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Adcock, John) Modified on 5/17/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
May 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 MOTION to convene a three-judge panel filed by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Alice Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Brannon, Sarah)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition to #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Alexis Calhoun, Steven Harris, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Clee E. Lowe, Dorothy Nairne, Alice Washington. (Brannon, Sarah)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Before the Court is a #33 Motion to Intervene, filed by the State of Louisiana on April 19, 2022. Any opposition(s) to the Motion to Intervene (R. Doc. 33) must be filed by Plaintiffs no later than May 2, 2022. If any Plaintiff does not oppose the Motion to Intervene (R. Doc. 33), they must file a Notice of No Opposition as soon as possible, but again no later than May 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/28/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KAH)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 and #36 Motions for Jared Evans and Sara Rohani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/25/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Ex Parte MOTION for Sara Rohani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2420743) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Sara Rohani, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Ex Parte MOTION for Jared Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2420741) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Jared Evans, #3 Proposed order)(Adcock, John)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #35 Ex Parte MOTION for Jared Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2420741). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #36 Ex Parte MOTION for Sara Rohani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2420743). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Convene a Three-Judge Court or in the Alternative, To Certify An Interlocutory Appeal by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Strach, Phillip) Modified on 4/22/2022 to edit text (ELW).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene by State of Louisiana -Attorney General Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Answer)(Freel, Angelique)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by R. Kyle Ardoin.(Strach, Phillip)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Richard B. Raile to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/14/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION for Richard B. Raile to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2417491) by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 Ex Parte MOTION for Richard B. Raile to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2417491). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , and #28 Motions for John E. Branch, III, Thomas A. Farr, Cassie A. Holt, Alyssa M. Riggins, and Phillip J. Strach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/13/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Ex Parte MOTION for Phillip J. Strach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416870) by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Walsh, John)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION for Alyssa M. Riggins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416867) by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Walsh, John)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Ex Parte MOTION for Cassie A. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416866) by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Walsh, John)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Thomas A. Farr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416859) by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Walsh, John)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION for John E. Branch, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416856) by R. Kyle Ardoin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Walsh, John)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Alyssa M. Riggins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416867), #24 Ex Parte MOTION for John E. Branch, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416856), #28 Ex Parte MOTION for Phillip J. Strach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416870), #26 Ex Parte MOTION for Cassie A. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416866), #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Thomas A. Farr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2416859). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Considering that the above titled actions involve common questions of law and fact, and further that judicial efficiency will be achieved. Civil Action No. 22-211-SDD-RLB and Civil Action No. 22-214-BAJ-RLB shall be reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/12/2022. (LLH)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , and #21 Motions for Katherine L. McKnight, Patrick T. Lewis, Erika D. Prouty, Kathryn C. Sadasivan, Leah C. Aden, Stuart C. Naifeh, and Victoria Wenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/8/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Ex Parte MOTION for Victoria Wenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415281) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Victoria Wenger, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Stuart C. Naifeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415275) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Stuart C. Naifeh, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leah C. Aden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415272) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Leah C. Aden, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Kathryn C. Sadasivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415270) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of good standing, #2 Declaration of Kathryn C. Sadasivan, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Ex Parte MOTION for Erika D. Prouty to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415256) by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Patrick T. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415251) by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Katherine L. McKnight to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415220) by Patrick Page Cortez, Clay Schexnayder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Patrick T. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415251), #20 Ex Parte MOTION for Stuart C. Naifeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415275), #17 Ex Parte MOTION for Erika D. Prouty to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415256), #21 Ex Parte MOTION for Victoria Wenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415281), #15 MOTION for Katherine L. McKnight to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415220), #19 Ex Parte MOTION for Leah C. Aden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415272), #18 Ex Parte MOTION for Kathryn C. Sadasivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2415270). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by all Plaintiffs against R. Kyle Ardoin, filed by Dorothy Nairne.(Adcock, John)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION of The Presiding Officers of the Louisiana Legislature to Intervene by Clay Schexnayder, Patrick Page Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) Modified on 4/5/2022 to edit text (ELW).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 , #9 , #10 , and #11 Motions for Alora Thomas, Sophia Lin Lakin, Samantha Osaki and Sarah E. Brannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/31/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Samantha Osaki to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410955), #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Sophia Lin Lakin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410950), #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Alora Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410948), #11 Ex Parte MOTION for Sarah E. Brannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410959). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Sarah E. Brannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410959) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah E. Brannon, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Samantha Osaki to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410955) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha Osaki, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Sophia Lin Lakin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410950) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sophia Lin Lakin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Alora Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2410948) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alora Thomas, #2 Proposed order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Adcock, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/24/2022. (KAH)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Jarrett Lofton, Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP, Dorothy Nairne, Clee E. Lowe, Rose Thompson, Alice Washington. R. Kyle Ardoin served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Adcock, John)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Nora Sam Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/16/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Nora Sam Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2406428). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Nora Sam Ahmed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2406428) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Snider, Megan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to R. Kyle Ardoin. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to R. Kyle Ardoin (Adcock, John)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. Kyle Ardoin ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2405905.), filed by Dorothy Nairne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adcock, John) (Attachment 2 and 4 replaced on 3/15/2022 to correct page orientation) (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nairne et al v. Ardoin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Dorothy Nairne
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Lofton
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Clee E. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Alice Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Nairne
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clee E. Lowe
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Washington
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Thompson
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harris
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Calhoun
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: Kathryn C. Sadasivan
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Megan E. Snider
Represented By: Nora Ahmed
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Represented By: Samantha Osaki
Represented By: Sarah E Brannon
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Stuart C. Naifeh
Represented By: Tiffany Alora Thomas
Represented By: Victoria Wenger
Represented By: Amanda Giglio
Represented By: Jared Evans
Represented By: Michael de Leeuw
Represented By: Sara Sara Rohani
Represented By: Stephanie Legros
Represented By: Michael B. de Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kyle Ardoin
Represented By: John Carroll Walsh
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Represented By: Cassie Holt
Represented By: John E. Branch, III
Represented By: Phillip Strach
Represented By: Thomas A. Farr
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Clay Schexnayder
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Patrick Page Cortez
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State Of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Carey T. Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Wale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?