Lopez v. Sessions

Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Lopez
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01501
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Miguel Angel Lopez in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635060541. (crt,Adams, K)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/19/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 15, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miguel Angel Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) . Application not on approved forms.
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miguel Angel Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?