Vincent v. City of Sulphur et al

Plaintiff: Carol J Vincent
Defendant: City of Sulphur, Lewis Coats and Chester Gremillion
Case Number: 2:2013cv00189
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 113 MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Dismiss Lawsuit filed by City of Sulphur will be GRANTED; Plaintiff's 115 MOTION for Oral Argument will be DENIED AS MOOT and plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions will be DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 1/12/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 21, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER 103 Report and Recommendations is not adopted; denying 105 plaintiff's Objections; withdrawing 108 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must comply with Order issued 5/25/2016 85 within 10 calendars day from when this order is signed. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/21/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 18, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 75 Motion for Recusal. Vincent's claims do not demonstrate any impropriety, bias, or prejudice on our part. Accordingly, there is no basis for Recusal/Disqualification and the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 05/18/2016. (crt,LaCombe, L)
January 29, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' request for attorneys' fees be and hereby is DENIED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/25/2015. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 21, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Qualified Immunity be and hereby is GRANTED as to Vincent's First Amendment claims; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Qualified Immunity as to the plaintiff's claims based on municipal liability under 42 USC 1983 be and hereby is DENIED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 10/21/2014. (crt,Finn, P)
May 15, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glenn Martin, Chester Gremillion, Lewis Coats, City of Sulphur is hereby GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, and STAYED IN PART. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 5/14/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
April 17, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Before the court is 4 Motion to Strike Answer to Complaint on behalf of plaintiff. For the reasons discussed herein, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The court strikes defendants affirmative defenses number 1, 2, 4, 5, and 14. The court declines to strike defendants affirmative defenses number 3, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13. Defendants have 14 days from the issuance of this memorandum order in which to reassert the stricken affirmative defenses in a manner consistent with Woodfield v. Bowman. Plaintiff is counseled that the fair notice standard of Woodfield does not entitle him to exacting specificity from defendants when they plead their affirmative defenses. This case is in the early stages of litigation. The issues will begin to come into sharper focus in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/17/2013. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. City of Sulphur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol J Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sulphur
Represented By: Robin J Magee
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Coats
Represented By: Robin J Magee
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Gremillion
Represented By: Robin J Magee
Represented By: Stephen J Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?