Marks v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Carnella M Marks
Defendant: Wayne Edwards, Cox, Major Jenkins and Robert Rachal
Case Number: 3:2011cv00114
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Webster
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : For the foregoing reasons 31 and for those reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation 6 of the Magistrate Judge, to the extent adopted, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Plaintiff's civil rights action is DISMISS ED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's second motion for appointment of counsel, contained in her objections to the Report and Recommendation 30 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 1/23/12. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
October 4, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RULING granting in part and denying in part 10 MOTION for Reconsideration of 9 Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations, filed by Carnella M Marks. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 10/4/11. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 3, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion by Letter. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 8/3/11. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 27, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Plaintiff's civil rights action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Robert G James on 06/23/11. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnella M Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?