Milton v. Townsend et al

Plaintiff: Roy Milton
Defendant: Ricky Jones, Fred Schoonover, John Smith and Richard Townsend
Case Number: 3:2014cv00061
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 53 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 50 , is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's Complaints 1 ; 8 , is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 1/15/2015. (crt,Joffrion, B)
September 22, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted 12 , filed by Defendants Sheriff Ricky Jones, Deputy Warden Fred Scho onover, and Warden John Smith is granted in part and that Plaintiff's punitive damage claim against the moving defendants be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion be otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/22/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
August 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to either produce the requested surveillance videoas well as any accompanying audioand photographs or show cause, in writing, why no adverse presumption should be entered against them. ORDER granting 26 Motion for Discovery to the extent that Plaintiff seeks an extension of the discovery deadline. Discovery due by 9/26/14, and each party shall file either a Motion for Summary Judgment or Statement of Issues by October 24, 2014. To the extent that Plaintiff asks the Court to engage in discovery on his behalf, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/29/14. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Townsend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?