Terral v. Ducote et al

Plaintiff: Brendan Matthew Terral
Defendant: Timothy Ducote, Curry, Parks, Fitzgerald, Womack, Unknown, Parish of Jackson, Jackson Parish Correctional Center, Sheriffs Dept Jackson Parish and Bird
Case Number: 3:2015cv02366
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 81 Motion to Vacate. 78 Judgment is VACATED and this case is RE-OPENED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is re-set and referred to Magistrate Judge Hayes for report and recommendation. Plaintiff's response to the Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 6/21/17. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/31/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 11, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 73 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the instant civil rights suit is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/11/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 13, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendation 57 , granting 36 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's claims against the Jackson Parish Correctional Center, the Jackson Parish Sheriff's Department, and Jackson Parish. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/13/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 19, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part 29 Motion to Compel, (styled as a "Response to Objections), solely to the extent specified in the body of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this motion is otherwise DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery completion deadline is extended until 10/19/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/19/16. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terral v. Ducote et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Matthew Terral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept Jackson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?