Woods v. McKeithen et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Woods
Defendant: Jack McKeithen, Kevin Wyles, David Callender, Unknown Down and Lt Down
Case Number: 3:2024cv00326
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/18/2024. (crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Woods. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachments, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Proposed order). Clerk mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Plaintiff per request in attached letter.(crt,Devillier, W)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/29/2024) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(crt,Crawford, A)
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 4, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00092. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/4/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order: This action be and is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2024. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/4/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Callender, Unknown Down, Jack McKeithen, Kevin Wyles, filed by Ronnie Woods.(NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/4/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. McKeithen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McKeithen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Callender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Down
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Down
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?