Pitre v. City of Eunice, et al

Plaintiff: Jana K Pitre
Defendant: City of Eunice, Rusty Moody, Police Dept City of Eunice, Gary Fontenot, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3 and John Doe #4
Case Number: 6:2014cv02843
Filed: October 1, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Landry
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' motion for the recovery of attorneys' fees (Rec. Doc. 33) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/21/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 30, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the 33 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. When a motion to compel is granted, the court must, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)( 5)(A), award the prevailing party reasonable expenses incurred in bringing the motion to compel, including attorneys' fees. Therefore, the defendants are entitled to recover such expenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not more than 21 days after the date of this order, the defendants shall file an affidavit detailing the insufficiencies in the plaintiff's response to the written discovery requests and establishing the attorneys' fees and expenses incurred by the defendants in brin ging the motion to compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not more than 30 days after the date of this order, the plaintiff shall supplement his responses to the defendants' discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/30/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 10, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/10/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
March 24, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 20 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED and the plaintiff's Section 1983 claim based on alleged violation of her Fifth Amendment rights is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/23/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitre v. City of Eunice, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana K Pitre
Represented By: Shannon LaSalle Battiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eunice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept City of Eunice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?