Pitre v. City of Eunice, et al
Plaintiff: |
Jana K Pitre |
Defendant: |
City of Eunice, Rusty Moody, Police Dept City of Eunice, Gary Fontenot, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3 and John Doe #4 |
Case Number: |
6:2014cv02843 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
St. Landry |
Presiding Judge: |
Rebecca F Doherty |
Presiding Judge: |
Patrick J Hanna |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' motion for the recovery of attorneys' fees (Rec. Doc. 33) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/21/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
40
RULING ON MOTION. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the 33 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. When a motion to compel is granted, the court must, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)( 5)(A), award the prevailing party reasonable expenses incurred in bringing the motion to compel, including attorneys' fees. Therefore, the defendants are entitled to recover such expenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not more than 21 days after the date of this order, the defendants shall file an affidavit detailing the insufficiencies in the plaintiff's response to the written discovery requests and establishing the attorneys' fees and expenses incurred by the defendants in brin ging the motion to compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not more than 30 days after the date of this order, the plaintiff shall supplement his responses to the defendants' discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/30/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
36
JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/10/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
25
JUDGMENT ADOPTING 20 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED and the plaintiff's Section 1983 claim based on alleged violation of her Fifth Amendment rights is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/23/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?