Dunn v. City of Eunice et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dunn
Defendant: Randy Fontenot and City of Eunice
Case Number: 6:2020cv01063
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: James D Cain
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
2 Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City of Eunice, Randy Fontenot.(aty,Caswell, Chelsea)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 9/14/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. City of Eunice answer due 10/2/2020; Randy Fontenot answer due 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/14/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by City of Eunice, Randy Fontenot. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Bradley C Myers added to party City of Eunice(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley C Myers added to party Randy Fontenot(pty:dft))(aty,Myers, Bradley)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dunn. Randy Fontenot served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (aty,Loughlin, Kearney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Eunice, Randy Fontenot. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 17, 2020 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of Eunice, Randy Fontenot, requested by Michael Dunn. (aty,Loughlin, Kearney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Eunice, Randy Fontenot with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4359275) filed by Michael Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kearney S Loughlin added to party Michael Dunn(pty:pla))(aty,Loughlin, Kearney) Modified on 8/17/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. City of Eunice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Fontenot
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eunice
Represented By: Bradley C Myers
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dunn
Represented By: Kearney S Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?