American Freedom Defense Initiative et al v. Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller and Robert Spencer
Defendant: Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART), Gary l. Hendrickson, John Hertel and Beth Gibbons
Case Number: 2:2010cv12134
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2015 73 Featured Case ORDER Granting 68 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
June 6, 2014 72 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1--Email Correspondence) (Muise, Robert)
June 5, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute as to defendant Gary Hendrickson. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2014 Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
December 19, 2013 70 RESPONSE to 68 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief, 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Brief of Defendants, Gibbons, Hertel and Suburban Mobility Authority for Regional Transportation filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Hildebrandt, Christian)
December 11, 2013 69 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 68 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (LSau)
December 5, 2013 68 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller, Robert Spencer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Yerushalmi, David)
November 13, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2013 re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART), 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART), 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Spencer, American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
September 20, 2013 67 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Withdrawal of Attorney. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (PMil)
September 18, 2013 66 REPLY to Response re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment in favor of Defendants filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - RefugeFromIslam.com website print, # 3 Exhibit AFLC blog/website print) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
September 17, 2013 65 REPLY to Response re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muise, Robert)
September 5, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
September 4, 2013 63 RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit -1 Declaration of Robert J. Muise) (Muise, Robert)
September 4, 2013 62 RESPONSE to 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
September 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing RESET for 11/13/2013 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 30, 2013 61 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Muise, Robert)
August 22, 2013 60 NOTICE OF HEARING on 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2013 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Ciesla, C)
August 21, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Ciesla, C)
August 15, 2013 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1--Declaration of Robert Spencer, # 3 Exhibit 2--Declaration of Pamela Geller, # 4 Exhibit 3--Declaration of Robert J. Muise, # 5 Exhibit 4--SMART deposition excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 5--SMART deposition exhibits, # 7 Exhibit 6--Beth Gibbons deposition excerpts, # 8 Exhibit 7--Pamela Geller deposition excerpts, # 9 Exhibit 8--Pamela Geller deposition exhibits, # 10 Exhibit 9--Elizabeth Dryden deposition excerpts) (Muise, Robert)
August 15, 2013 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
August 15, 2013 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - email) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
August 15, 2013 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
August 15, 2013 54 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit email) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
July 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2013 re 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Robert Spencer, American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
July 12, 2013 53 REPLY to Response re 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1--Declaration of Robert J. Muise) (Muise, Robert)
July 3, 2013 52 RESPONSE to 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
June 30, 2013 51 NOTICE OF HEARING on 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 21, 2013 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1--Declaration of Robert J. Muise, # 3 Exhibit A--Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, # 4 Exhibit B--Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Certificate of Service, # 5 Exhibit C--Sample of emails produced by Defendants in response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, # 6 Exhibit D--Excerpts of the Deposition of SMART, # 7 Exhibit E--Email correspondence between and among counsel for the parties, # 8 Exhibit F--Privilege log produced by Defendants on June 5, 2013, # 9 Exhibit G--Revised privilege log produced by Defendants on June 11, 2013) (Muise, Robert)
June 7, 2013 49 WITNESS LIST by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
June 7, 2013 48 WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Muise, Robert)
March 1, 2013 NOTICE of Error directed to: Christian E. Hildebrandt re 47 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TMcg)
February 28, 2013 47 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) of Defts' Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Hildebrandt, Christian) Modified on 3/1/2013 (TMcg).
January 16, 2013 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Mersino on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mersino, Erin)
January 14, 2013 45 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2013 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/16/2013 Joint Final Pretrial Order & Motions in Limine due by 11/5/13; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2013 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 12/10/2013 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
January 14, 2013 Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 1/14/2013 before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 2, 2013 44 AMENDED MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) [Appeal Case Number 11-1538] (KKra)
December 27, 2012 43 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) [Appeal Case Number 11-1538] (KKra)
November 19, 2012 42 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 1/14/2013 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 19, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER Deeming Moot Defendants' Motion for Stay and Emergency Motion for Ruling on Pending Motion to Stay 35 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
November 9, 2012 40 COSTS TAXED in the amount of $455.00 against appellees. (DPer)
November 8, 2012 39 BILL OF COSTS ON APPEAL by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Hildebrandt, Christian)
October 25, 2012 38 JUDGMENT from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) - Disposition: the district courts grant of preliminary injunction is REVERSED. [Appeal Case Number 11-1538] (KKra)
January 31, 2012 37 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Robert J. Muise on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Muise, Robert)
January 25, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) - Disposition: denying motion to expedite decision [Appeal Case Number 11-1538] (KKra)
July 19, 2011 35 Emergency MOTION Requesting Ruling on Pending Motion to Stay Prel. Inj. re 33 Reply to Response to Motion, 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24]Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24], 32 Response to Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Yerushalmi, David)
July 13, 2011 34 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 07/13/2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryl E. Daniel) (Number of Pages: 75) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Daniel, C.)
May 12, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2011 re 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren-Daniel) (LSau)
May 10, 2011 33 REPLY to Response re 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24]Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24] filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Hildebrandt, Christian)
May 3, 2011 32 RESPONSE to 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24]Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1-Miami Herald Article) (Muise, Robert)
May 3, 2011 Court Reporter Acknowledgment of Transcript Order Form received on May 2, 2011. Transcript for court proceeding held on: July 13, 2010. Estimated transcript completion date: June 2, 2011. Estimated number of pages: 75. Payment arrangements were made on May 2, 2011. (Daniel, C.)
April 25, 2011 31 Certificate of Service re 29 Notice of Appeal. (CGre)
April 25, 2011 30 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY with Local Rule 5.1.1 issued to attorney Christian E. Hildebrandt re 29 Notice of Appeal. (CGre)
April 25, 2011 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) re 24 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Receipt No: DET030408 - Fee: $ 455 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (CGre)
April 25, 2011 28 NOTICE of hearing on 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24]Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24]. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 25, 2011 Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 4/25/2011 before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 21, 2011 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Order Granting Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 24] by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contract Provision 5.07, # 2 Exhibit Seattle Mideast v King County Order (WD Wash)) (Hildebrandt, C.)
April 21, 2011 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: C. Edward Hildebrandt appearing on behalf of Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Hildebrandt, C.)
April 7, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 4/25/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
April 6, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 4/19/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 31, 2011 25 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 4/11/2011 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 31, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 plaintiffs' preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 21, 2011 23 REPLY to Response re 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Response to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Response to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Gordon, Avery)
March 14, 2011 22 RESPONSE to 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Response to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Response to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Muise, Robert)
March 8, 2011 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Response to Motion,, for Preliminary Injunction by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opinion & Order Seattle Mideast Awareness Campaign v. King County, Case No. 2:11-CV-00094-RAJ) (Gordon, Avery)
February 18, 2011 20 RESPONSE to 19 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Gordon, Avery)
February 4, 2011 19 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Yerushalmi, David)
September 29, 2010 18 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/13/2010. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryl Daniel) (Number of Pages: 35) Redaction Request due 10/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Daniel, C.)
July 13, 2010 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2010 re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /TRO filed by Robert Spencer, American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: Taken under advisement.(Court Reporter C. Warren-Daniel) (DTof)
July 13, 2010 17 STIPULATION re Law & Facts (corrected filing) by American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller, Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Robert Spencer, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Yerushalmi, David)
July 13, 2010 16 Proposed Findings of Fact by American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller, Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Robert Spencer, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Yerushalmi, David) Modified on 7/14/2010 (PMil).[WRONG DOCKET EVENT SELECTED - DOCUMENT TITLED STIPULATION]
July 9, 2010 15 JOINT WITNESS LIST by American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller, Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Robert Spencer, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) (Yerushalmi, David)
July 9, 2010 14 REPLY to Response re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /TRO filed by All Plaintiffs. (Yerushalmi, David)
July 7, 2010 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Gordon, Avery)
July 2, 2010 12 RESPONSE to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /TRO Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit CBS/SMART Contract/Content Policy, # 3 Exhibit Rejected Political Ad - Pinckney Pro-Life, # 4 Exhibit Rejected Violence Ad - Video Game, # 5 Exhibit Anti-Islam Political Advertisement, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Hawkins, # 7 Exhibit Atheist Advertisement, # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard Hollis, # 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Beth Gibbons) (Gordon, Avery)
June 30, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K Chubb on behalf of Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Chubb, Anthony)
June 22, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Avery E. Gordon on behalf of Beth Gibbons, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART). (Gordon, Avery)
June 22, 2010 Minute Entry - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2010 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (BLew)
June 22, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Hearing on re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / filed by Robert Spencer, American Freedom Defense Initiative, Pamela Geller. Hearing set for 7/13/2010 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (BLew)
June 17, 2010 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /TRO by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Pamela Geller, # 3 Exhibit A Certificate of Incorporation for FDI, # 4 Exhibit B FDI Religious Freedom Message, # 5 Exhibit C CBS-FDI Agreement-Miami, # 6 Exhibit D CBS-FDI Agreement-NYC, # 7 Exhibit E CBS-FDI Agreement-Detroit, # 8 Exhibit F Email thread--DDOT rejection, # 9 Exhibit G Atheist Bus Advertisement, # 10 Exhibit H SMART "Advertising Guidelines" and "Policies and Regulations", # 11 Exhibit I Email thread--SMART request, # 12 Exhibit J Email thread--SMART rejection) (Muise, Robert)
June 17, 2010 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Beth Gibbons served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Muise, Robert)
June 17, 2010 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John Hertel served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Muise, Robert)
June 17, 2010 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. (Muise, Robert)
May 28, 2010 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Freedom Defense Initiative (Muise, Robert)
May 27, 2010 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Yerushalmi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Yerushalmi, David)
May 27, 2010 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Beth Gibbons, Gary l. Hendrickson, John Hertel, Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART)* (DWor)
May 27, 2010 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-2486115 - Fee: $ 350. County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit --1 Accepted Bus Advertisement of Detroit Area Coalition of Reason, # 3 Exhibit --2 Rejected Bus Advertisement of Plaintiffs) (Muise, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Freedom Defense Initiative et al v. Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Freedom Defense Initiative
Represented By: Robert J. Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Geller
Represented By: Robert J. Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Spencer
Represented By: Robert J. Muise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suburban Mobility Authority For Regional Transportation (SMART)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary l. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?