The Shane Group, Inc. et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Plaintiff: The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg, Scott Steele, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund and Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Other: ADAC Automotive, Petoskey Plastics, Inc., Morbark, Inc., Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Kent Companies, Inc., Thelen Inc., Hi-Lex Corporation, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Scott Mancinelli, Fisher & Company, Inc., Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Aetna, Inc., Baker College, Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, SAF-Holland USA, Borroughs Corporation, Christopher Andrews, Alma Products Company, Trillium Staffing Solutions, Tarus Products, Inc., Truss Technologies, Eagle Alloy, Inc., FloraCraft Corporation, Terryberry Company, LLC, Wade Trim Group Inc., Huizenga Group, Star of the West Milling Company, Gemini Group, Inc., Magna International of America, Incorporated, Four Winds Casino Resort and LaBelle Management, Incorporated
Interested Party: Jeffrey Connolly, William Beaumont Hospital - Grosse Pointe, The Dow Chemical Company, St. Mary's of Michigan Medical Center, St. John Macomb - Oakland Hospital, Henry Ford Health System, St. John River District Hospital - East China, DLP Marquette General Hospital, LLC, CHE Trinity, Henry Ford Wyandotte Hospital, Metro Health, University of Michigan Health System, Genesys Regional Medical Center, Providence Park Hospital - Novi, United States of America, Henry Ford West Bloomfield Hospital, William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak, Ascension Health, Alpena Regional Medical Center, Oakwood Southshore Medical Center, Bronson Health Care Group, Inc., William Beaumont Hospital-Troy, Southfield Providence Hospital, Marquette General Health System, McLaren Health Care Corporation, Oakwood Annapolis Hospital, St. John Hospital - North Shore Campus, Prime Healthcare Services - Garden City, LLC, Michigan Health and Hospital Association, Oakwood Healthcare, Inc., Alyson Oliver, Oakwood Heritage Hospital, Henry Ford Macomb Hospital Corporation, Borgess Medical Center, Caro Community Hospital, Henry Ford Hospital, MidMichigan Health, Health Alliance Plan of Michigan, Covenant Healthcare, National Surgical Hospital, Sparrow Hospital, Oakwood Healthcare System, Covenant Medical Center, Inc., Pontiac, City of, Gratiot Community Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Metropolitan Hospital, St. Joseph Health System, Charlevoix Area Hospital, St. John Hospital & Medical Center and Botsford Hospital
Intervenor: Priority Health Insurance Company, Spectrum Health Systems, CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Holland Community Hospital
Case Number: 2:2010cv14360
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER of Attorney Withdrawal., Attorney Jennifer E. Frushour terminated. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (NAhm)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER of Attorney Withdrawal., Attorney Casey A. Fry terminated. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (NAhm)
December 3, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Casey A. Fry (Miller, E.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 357 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Jennifer E. Frushour (Miller, E.)
November 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2018 re #351 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, #342 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, #354 MOTION for Leave to File, #336 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Fairness Hearing held on 11/8/2018. Disposition: Taken Under Advisement (Court Reporter: Andrea Wabeke) (LSau)
November 2, 2018 Filing 356 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Letter to Chief Judge Hood (Miller, E.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 355 NOTICE OF HEARING on #351 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 29, 2018 Filing 354 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant BCBSM's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Response to Memorandum) (Walters, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 353 EXHIBIT A- Corrected Proposed Order Approving Settlement re #351 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, E.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 352 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #351 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Appendix of Unpublished Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 16, 2018 Filing 351 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Final Approval Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - September 19, 2014 Emails, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - September 22, 2014 Emails, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Les Chappell Regarding Settlement Notice and Administration) (Miller, E.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 350 REPLY to #344 Errata Sheet, #341 Objection, #161 Objection,,, #343 Notice (Other),,, #159 Objection, #336 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives Reply to Objectors' Opposition to Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER ENLARGING BRIEFS re #348 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 12, 2018 Filing 348 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limits for (A) Their Brief in Support of Their Motion for Fnal Approval and (B) Their Reply in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 347 REPLY to Response re #342 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Oral Argument Requested) filed by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Walters, Bryan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 346 RESPONSE to #342 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Oral Argument Requested) by the Varnum Objectors filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Appendix of Filed Cases Identified from Pacer) (Miller, E.)
September 18, 2018 Filing 345 NOTICE OF HEARING on #342 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Oral Argument Requested). Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
September 17, 2018 Filing 344 Supplement to #341 Objection, filed by Christopher Andrews. by Christopher Andrews (SSch)
September 14, 2018 Filing 343 NOTICE by ADAC Automotive, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc., FloraCraft Corporation, Floracraft Corporation, Magna International of America, Incorporated of Joint Objection to Proposed Settlement (Oral Argument Requested) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Walters, Bryan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 342 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Oral Argument Requested) by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Walters, Bryan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 341 OBJECTION to the settlement, the attorney's fee, expenses, costs, admin expenses, incentives awards, the named plaintiffs adding two named plaintiffs and the objector will appear at the Fairness Hearing to address the court by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation) (SOso)
August 16, 2018 Filing 340 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Effectuation of Notice Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Les Chappell) (Hedlund, Daniel)
June 4, 2018 Filing 339 Notice of E-mail Delivery Failure as to attorney Casey A. Fry. Bounced NEF for #335 Order of Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney, #337 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #336 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives. (SSch)
June 4, 2018 Filing 338 Notice of E-mail Delivery Failure as to attorney Jennifer E. Frushour. Bounced NEF for #335 Order of Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney, #337 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #336 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives. (SSch)
May 29, 2018 Filing 337 NOTICE OF HEARING on #336 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
May 17, 2018 Filing 336 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund In Support of Motion and Compendium, #2 Exhibit 1 - 19) (Gustafson, Daniel)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER of WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (NAhm)
April 26, 2018 Filing 334 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company of Withdrawal of Attorney Jason R. Gourley (Rheaume, Thomas)
April 26, 2018 Filing 333 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. Corrected Second Notice of Filing Public Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion and Memo In Support of Class Certification, #3 Exhibit A - LLLL) (Hedlund, Daniel)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 STIPULATED ORDER to correct second notice of filing public version of plaintiff's motion for class certification and appointment of class counsel. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPer)
April 20, 2018 Filing 331 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #290 Response to Motion,, #292 Exhibit,, #291 Exhibit,, #294 Sealed Exhibit, #293 Exhibit, Notice of Public Filing of BCBSM's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 290 BCBSM's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Index and Exhibits 1-9, #2 Exhibit 10-46, #3 Exhibit 47-76, #4 Exhibit 77-92) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 330 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). Second Notice of Filing Public Version of BCBSM's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 140 BCBSM's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger, Brief in Support of, Index and Exhibits) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 329 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #139 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Second Notice of Filing Public Version of BCBSM's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 139 BCBSM's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel, Index and Exhibits) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 328 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #127 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, Second Notice of Filing Public Version of BCBSM's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 127 BCBSM's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class, Index and Exhibits) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 327 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company re #110 Sealed Document - Other, Second Notice of Filing Public Version of BCBSM's Brief in Opposition to Non-Parties Joseph T. Aoun and Nuyen, Tomtishen and Aoun, P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110 BCBSM's Brief in Opposition to Non-Parties Joseph T. Aoun and Nuyen, Tomtishen and Aoun, P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena, Index and Exhibits) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 326 [REMOVED FROM THE PUBLIC DOCKET PER 04/25/18 ORDER] NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. Notice of Filing of Public Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion and Memo In Support of Class Certification, #3 Exhibit A - LLLL) (Hedlund, Daniel) Modified on 4/26/2018 (DPer).
April 20, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Supplementing the Public Record Consistent with the Court's April 17, 2018 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Stenerson, Todd)
April 20, 2018 Filing 324 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rachel E. Mossman appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (Mossman, Rachel)
April 18, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval to Proposed Class Settlement #269 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Regarding Various Motions to Seal or Redact. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 10, 2017 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM re #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #315 Memorandum, Letter to Judge Hood Regarding Revised Proposed Preliminary Approval Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF BRUCE HOFFMAN. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSch)
August 4, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Donald Bruce Hoffman for on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Hoffman, Donald)
July 11, 2017 Filing 318 LETTER from Christopher Andrews re seven-month delay without a decision as to motion for preliminary approval (DPer)
June 29, 2017 Filing 317 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Donald Bruce Hoffman on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Hoffman, Donald)
June 29, 2017 Filing 316 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Todd M. Stenerson on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Stenerson, Todd)
June 5, 2017 Filing 315 MEMORANDUM re #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Letter to Judge Hood Regarding Revised Proposed Preliminary Approval Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 23, 2017 Filing 314 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Theodore Bell on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Bell, Theodore)
December 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2016 re #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Bradley A. Veneberg, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Cheryl Daniel) (LSau)
December 6, 2016 Filing 313 NOTICE by Aetna, Inc. re #286 MOTION., #300 MOTION. Status Report of Non-Party Aetna, Inc. re meet and confer with Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Status Report) (Lipton, Joshua)
December 6, 2016 Filing 312 DECLARATION by Chad Matteson re #288 MOTION to Seal filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matteson, #2 Exhibit B - Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order) (Blair, Kevin)
December 5, 2016 Filing 311 DECLARATION by Suzanne Hall, Aetna, Inc. re Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #286 MOTION., #300 MOTION. filed by Aetna, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzanne Hall (part 1), #2 Declaration of Suzanne Hall (part 2 - Attachment A), #3 Declaration of Suzanne Hall (part 3 - Attachment A), #4 Declaration of Suzanne Hall (part 4 - Attachment A), #5 Declaration of Suzanne Hall (part 5 - Attachment A)) (Lipton, Joshua)
November 22, 2016 RE-Set Hearings: Status Conference RE-set for 12/13/2016 at 10:00 AM (from 12/1/2016) before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (KWin)
November 22, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #310 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (JOwe)
November 22, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #310 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Scott Mancinelli at P.O. Box 3266, Holland, MI 49422-3266 and Scott Mancinelli, Hoesch & Vander, Ploeg, PLC, 156 W. Washington Ave, Zeeland, MI 49464-1120. (JOwe)
November 22, 2016 Filing 310 NOTICE OF HEARING on #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Motion Hearing reset for 12/13/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (JOwe)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's #295 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #294 Information Subject to Pending Motions to Seal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
November 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2016 re #288 MOTION to Seal filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, #286 MOTION. filed by Aetna, Inc., #287 MOTION to Intervene filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, #282 MOTION Preserve Exhibits Under Seal filed by Spectrum Health Systems, #284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information filed by The Dow Chemical Company, #300 MOTION. filed by Aetna, Inc., #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan :( Supplemental Submissions due by 12/6/2016, 5:00 p.m.) Disposition: #267 , #282 , #284 , #286 , #288 , #300 - All Taken Under Advisement; #287 - Denied (Court Reporter: Cheryl Daniel) (JOwe)
November 21, 2016 Filing 308 DECLARATION by Shannon R. Wheatman re #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement On Amendment to Notice Plan filed by All Plaintiffs (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 19, 2016 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Blair on behalf of CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Blair, Kevin) Modified on 11/21/2016 (LHos).[DOCUMENT IS AN APPEARANCE FOR MICHELLE S. KALLEN]
November 19, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Blair on behalf of CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Blair, Kevin) Modified on 11/21/2016 (LHos).[DOCUMENT IS AN APPEARANCE FOR JOSEPH J. BIAL]
November 18, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of Aetna, Inc.. (Allen, Matthew)
November 15, 2016 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Nordin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nordin, Daniel)
November 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #288 MOTION to Seal . Motion Hearing RESET for 11/21/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 10, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #303 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (LSau)
November 10, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #303 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Scott Mancinelli at 156 W. Washington Ave., Zeeland, MI 49464-1120 and P.O. Box 3266, Holland, MI 49422-3266. (LSau)
November 10, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE OF HEARING on #288 MOTION to Seal . Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 4, 2016 Filing 302 REPLY to Response re #288 MOTION to Seal and Redact filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Blair, Kevin)
November 4, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #301 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (LSau)
November 4, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #301 Notice of Hearing on Motion, on Scott Mancinelli at P.O. Box 3266, Holland, MI 49422 & 156 W. Washington Ave, Zeeland, MI 49464. (LSau)
November 4, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE OF HEARING on #284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information, #282 MOTION Preserve Exhibits Under Seal , #287 MOTION to Intervene , #288 MOTION to Seal , #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information, #295 MOTION to Seal #294 Sealed Exhibit, 16, 20, 25, 36, 37, 43, 47, 51, 52, 67, 72, 78. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 4, 2016 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on November 8, 2016 is Cancelled re #289 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #270 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (LSau)
November 2, 2016 Filing 300 RESPONSE to #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information and NOTICE OF CORRECTED FILING and CORRECTED RESPONSE to #267 Motion and CORRECTED MOTION to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information filed by Aetna, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lipton, Joshua) Modified on 11/22/2016 (JOwe).
November 1, 2016 Filing 299 RESPONSE to #288 MOTION to Seal , #282 MOTION Preserve Exhibits Under Seal , #284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Response to Third Party Motions to Redact filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Chart, #3 Exhibit 2 - Unreported Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
November 1, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) Second Updated Notice of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal Agreed to be Unsealed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stenerson, Todd)
November 1, 2016 Filing 297 REPLY to Response re #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unreported Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
November 1, 2016 Filing 296 RESPONSE to #288 MOTION to Seal , #284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information , and #286 Response to #267 Motion to Seal, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Nonparties' Motions to Redact and Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 1, 2016 Attorney Joseph A. Fink is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: no longer involved with the case. (Fink, Joseph)
October 28, 2016 Filing 295 MOTION to Seal #294 Sealed Exhibit, 16, 20, 25, 36, 37, 43, 47, 51, 52, 67, 72, 78 by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 294 SEALED EXHIBIT 16_Sealed re #290 Response to Motion,, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20_Sealed, #2 Exhibit 25_Sealed, #3 Exhibit 36_Sealed, #4 Exhibit 37_Sealed, #5 Exhibit 43_Sealed, #6 Exhibit 47_Sealed, #7 Exhibit 51_Sealed, #8 Exhibit 52_Sealed, #9 Exhibit 67_Sealed, #10 Exhibit 72_Sealed, #11 Exhibit 78_Sealed) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 293 EXHIBIT 76 re #290 Response to Motion,, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90, #15 Exhibit 91, #16 Exhibit 92) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 292 EXHIBIT 51 re #290 Response to Motion,, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 291 EXHIBIT 25 re #290 Response to Motion,, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Exhibit 43, #19 Exhibit 44, #20 Exhibit 45, #21 Exhibit 46, #22 Exhibit 47, #23 Exhibit 48, #24 Exhibit 49, #25 Exhibit 50) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 28, 2016 Filing 290 RESPONSE to #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 26, 2016 Filing 289 NOTICE OF HEARING on #282 MOTION to Preserve Exhibits Under Seal, #284 MOTION to Seal, #287 MOTION to Intervene, and #288 MOTION to Seal. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SBur)
October 26, 2016 Filing 288 MOTION to Seal by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Blair, Kevin)
October 25, 2016 Filing 287 MOTION to Intervene by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Blair, Kevin)
October 25, 2016 Filing 286 RESPONSE to #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information and MOTION TO Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information filed by Aetna, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lipton, Joshua) Modified on 11/22/2016 (JOwe).
October 25, 2016 Filing 285 SEALED EXHIBIT A to Affidavit of S. Morgenstern re #284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information by The Dow Chemical Company. (Joseph, James)
October 25, 2016 Filing 284 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact Certain Information by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of S. Morgenstern and Redacted Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 2 - Unreported Cases) (Joseph, James)
October 25, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Joseph on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Joseph, James)
October 25, 2016 Filing 282 MOTION Preserve Exhibits Under Seal by Spectrum Health Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Masternak, Brian)
October 25, 2016 Filing 281 RESPONSE to #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel)
October 21, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) re #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 279 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) re #140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). Notice of Filing Public Version of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2 #140 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 278 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) re #139 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Notice of Filing Public Version of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2 #139 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) re #127 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, Notice of Filing Public Version of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - #127 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintffs for the Proposed Class) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 276 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. Notice of Filing Public Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion and Memo In Support of Class Counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #15 Exhibit Exhibit R, #16 Exhibit Exhibit S, #17 Exhibit Exhibit U, #18 Exhibit Exhibit V, #19 Exhibit Exhibit W, #20 Exhibit Exhibit X, #21 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #23 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #24 Exhibit Exhibit DD, #25 Exhibit Exhibit EE, #26 Exhibit Exhibit FF, #27 Exhibit Exhibit GG, #28 Exhibit Exhibit HH, #29 Exhibit Exhibit II, #30 Exhibit Exhibit JJ, #31 Exhibit Exhibit KK, #32 Exhibit Exhibit LL, #33 Exhibit Exhibit MM, #34 Exhibit Exhibit NN, #35 Exhibit Exhibit OO, #36 Exhibit Exhibit PP, #37 Exhibit Exhibit QQ, #38 Exhibit Exhibit RR, #39 Exhibit Exhibit SS, #40 Exhibit Exhibit TT, #41 Exhibit Exhibit UU, #42 Exhibit Exhibit VV, #43 Exhibit Exhibit WW, #44 Exhibit Exhibit XX, #45 Exhibit Exhibit KKK, #46 Exhibit Exhibit LLL, #47 Exhibit Exhibit OOO, #48 Exhibit Exhibit QQQ, #49 Exhibit Exhibit WWW, #50 Exhibit Exhibit XXX, #51 Exhibit Exhibit CCCC, #52 Exhibit Exhibit EEEE, #53 Exhibit Exhibit FFFF, #54 Exhibit Exhibit GGGG, #55 Exhibit Exhibit IIII, #56 Exhibit Exhibit JJJJ, #57 Exhibit Exhibit KKKK, #58 Exhibit Exhibit LLLL) (Hedlund, Daniel)
October 14, 2016 Filing 275 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) re #110 Sealed Document - Other, Notice of Filing Public Version of BCBSM's Brief in Opposition to Non-Parties Joseph T. Aoun and Nuyen, Tomtishen and Aoun, P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - #110 BCBSM's Brief in Opposition to Non-Parties Joseph T. Aoun and Nuyen, Tomtishen and Aoun, P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #78 Sealed Document - Other Notice of Filing Public Version of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consolidated Amended Complaint) (Hedlund, Daniel)
October 14, 2016 Filing 273 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) Updated Notice of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal Agreed to be Unsealed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 14, 2016 Filing 272 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) Certification of Mailing Notices of Proposed Settlement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1715 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Regla Hernandez) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 12, 2016 Filing 271 NOTICE OF HEARING on #269 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 12, 2016 Filing 270 NOTICE OF HEARING on #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 11, 2016 Filing 269 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Small, Daniel) Modified on 10/12/2016 (LGra).
October 11, 2016 Filing 268 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits A-1 through A-12 to Mark Johnson Declaration re #267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
October 11, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION to Seal Motion to Redact and Keep Under Seal Limited Information by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mark Johnson Declaration and Exhibits A-1 through A-12, #3 Exhibit B - Unreported Order and Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 11, 2016 Filing 266 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) Notice of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal Agreed to be Unsealed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stenerson, Todd)
September 9, 2016 Filing 265 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) of Service to Third Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notices to Third Parties) (Stenerson, Todd)
August 29, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE by Christopher Andrews of withdrawal of Motion for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Docket to the Objector for Review. (DAll)
August 25, 2016 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #263 Order on Motion - Free, #261 Order on Motion to Intervene, #262 Scheduling Order on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (LSau)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Granting #250 Motion for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Objector for Review. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/1/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Denying #236 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 22, 2016 Filing 260 RESPONSE to #250 MOTION for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Docket to the Objector for Review filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
August 18, 2016 Filing 259 RESPONSE to #250 MOTION for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Docket to the Objector for Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 18, 2016 Filing 258 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #250 MOTION for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Docket to the Objector for Review (LSau)
August 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2016 (Court Reporter: Cheryl Daniel) (LSau)
August 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2016 re #236 MOTION to Intervene filed by Eagle Alloy, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., Huizenga Group, Four Winds Casino Resort, Morbark, Inc., Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Hi-Lex Corporation, ADAC Automotive, SAF-Holland USA, Trillium Staffing Solutions, Alma Products Company, Wade Trim Group Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Kent Companies, Inc., Truss Technologies, Star of the West Milling Company, Fisher & Company, Inc., Borroughs Corporation, Thelen Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Tarus Products, Inc., Baker College, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Cheryl Daniel) (LSau)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Withdrawing Motion #243 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 16, 2016 Filing 256 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew M. Dybas appearing on behalf of Henry Ford Health System Third-Party Hospital (Dybas, Matthew)
August 12, 2016 Filing 255 MOTION to Withdraw #243 MOTION for award of appeal costs under Rule 39(e) regarding mandate by Christopher Andrews. (SSch)
August 8, 2016 Filing 254 NOTICE by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc. re #237 Notice (Other) Objections to Proposed Schedule (Walters, Bryan)
August 8, 2016 Filing 253 REPLY to Response re #236 MOTION to Intervene filed by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Man for Complex Lit, #2 Exhibit 2-Managing Class Action Lit) (Walters, Bryan)
August 8, 2016 Filing 252 RESPONSE to #243 MOTION for award of appeal costs under Rule 39(e) regarding mandate filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Blue Cross' and Plaintiffs' Letters to C. Andrews) (Hedlund, Daniel)
August 5, 2016 Filing 251 NOTICE OF HEARING on #243 MOTION for award of appeal costs under Rule 39(e) regarding mandate. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 4, 2016 Filing 250 MOTION for Order Requiring All Counsel to Submit Past and Future Copies of All Filings Made to the Docket to the Objector for Review by Christopher Andrews. (DAll)
August 1, 2016 Filing 249 RESPONSE to #236 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
July 29, 2016 Filing 248 INDEX of Exhibits re #247 Response to Motion, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Unpublished Opinion of Doe v Cin-Lan Inc, #2 Exhibit B: Unpublished Opinion of Bailey v AK Steel Corp, #3 Exhibit C: Unpublished Opinion of Zepeda v PayPal Inc, #4 Exhibit D: Unpublished Opinion of AIG Inc v ACE INA Holdings Inc, #5 Exhibit E: Unpublished Opinion of Etters v Bennett, #6 Exhibit F: Unpublished Opinion of Gascho v Global Fitness Holdings LLC, #7 Exhibit G: Unpublished Opinion of Ruggles v Bulkmatic Transport Co.) (Stenerson, Todd)
July 29, 2016 Filing 247 RESPONSE to #236 MOTION to Intervene filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887). (Stenerson, Todd)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPar)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPar)
July 28, 2016 Filing 244 Letter from Christopher Andrews (DWor)
July 28, 2016 Filing 243 MOTION for award of appeal costs under Rule 39(e) regarding mandate by Christopher Andrews. (DWor)
July 25, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887) Withdrawal of Attorney Alan N. Harris (Rheaume, Thomas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 241 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887) Withdrawal of Attorney Carl T. Rashid (Rheaume, Thomas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 240 NOTICE OF HEARING on #236 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 22, 2016 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887). (Rheaume, Thomas)
July 20, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Phelps on behalf of ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Phelps, Aaron)
July 19, 2016 Filing 237 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) Notice of Proposed Schedule (Stenerson, Todd)
July 13, 2016 Filing 236 MOTION to Intervene by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pride v Allstate) (Walters, Bryan)
July 7, 2016 Filing 235 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 6, 2016 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Perrin Rynders on behalf of ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Rynders, Perrin)
July 5, 2016 Filing 233 REQUEST Joint Request for Scheduling Conference [Amended to correct Certificate of Service] by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), The Shane Group, Inc.(consolidated from 10-14887). (Stenerson, Todd)
July 5, 2016 Filing 232 REQUEST Joint Request for Scheduling Order by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), The Shane Group, Inc.(consolidated from 10-14887). (Stenerson, Todd)
July 5, 2016 Filing 231 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #219 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Eagle Alloy, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., Huizenga Group, Four Winds Casino Resort, Morbark, Inc., Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Hi-Lex Corporation, ADAC Automotive, SAF-Holland USA, Trillium Staffing Solutions, Alma Products Company, Wade Trim Group Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Kent Companies, Inc., Truss Technologies, Star of the West Milling Company, Fisher & Company, Inc., Borroughs Corporation, Thelen Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Tarus Products, Inc., Baker College, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, #227 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment,,, [Appeal Case Number 15-1551] (Ahmed, N)
July 5, 2016 Filing 230 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #227 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment,,, #216 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Andrews [Appeal Case Number 15-1544] (Ahmed, N)
July 5, 2016 Filing 229 MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to #227 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment,,, #221 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Mancinelli [Appeal Case Number 15-1552] (Ahmed, N)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #221 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Mancinelli, #216 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Andrews [Appeal Case Number 15-1552/15-1544] (Ahmed, N)
June 7, 2016 Filing 227 OPINION and JUDGMENT from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #219 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Eagle Alloy, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., Huizenga Group, Four Winds Casino Resort, Morbark, Inc., Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Hi-Lex Corporation, ADAC Automotive, SAF-Holland USA, Trillium Staffing Solutions, Alma Products Company, Wade Trim Group Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Kent Companies, Inc., Truss Technologies, Star of the West Milling Company, Fisher & Company, Inc., Borroughs Corporation, Thelen Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Tarus Products, Inc., Baker College, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, #221 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Mancinelli, #216 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Andrews [Appeal Case Number 15-1544/1551/1552] (Ahmed, N)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER for withdrawal of Attorney Ann T. Regan as counsel for plaintiff Scott Steele. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPer)
May 13, 2016 Filing 225 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Anne T. Regan - NOT SWORN for on behalf of Scott Steele. (Regan - NOT SWORN, Anne)
May 18, 2015 Filing 224 RESPONSE to #223 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Christopher Andrews. (SSch)
May 18, 2015 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $505.00 by Christopher Andrews - Receipt No. DET079676 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (EBro)
May 13, 2015 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #223 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (LSau)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Denying #218 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Appeal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 30, 2015 Filing 222 Certificate of Service re #221 Notice of Appeal. (DTyl)
April 29, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Scott Mancinelli. Receipt No: 0645-5140272 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Mancinelli, Scott)
April 29, 2015 Filing 220 Certificate of Service re #219 Notice of Appeal. (EBro)
April 29, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE OF APPEAL by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc. re #215 Judgment, #213 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,. Receipt No: 0645-5139386 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Walters, Bryan)
April 28, 2015 Filing 218 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs on appeal by Christopher Andrews. (DPer)
April 28, 2015 Filing 217 Certificate of Service re #216 Notice of Appeal. (DPer)
April 28, 2015 Filing 216 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher Andrews re #213 Opinion and order, #214 Order, and #215 Final judgment. Fee Status: IFP. (DPer)
April 2, 2015 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #214 Order, #215 Judgment, #213 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Sanctions, on Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48152-0394. (LSau)
April 2, 2015 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #214 Order, #215 Judgment, #213 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion - Free, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Sanctions, on Scott Mancinelli at P.O. Box 3266, Holland, MI 49422-3266. (LSau)
March 31, 2015 Filing 215 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Approving Settlement. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Fairness Hearing, Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Payment of Incentive Awards, Denying Motions to Intervene, Granting Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan Allocation, Denying Motion to Strike Sur-Reply, and Denying Motions for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 28, 2015 Filing 212 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #206 MOTION CLASS COUNSELS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SHOW CAUSE ORDER RELATING TO SANCTIONABLE CONDUCT , #205 MOTION for Sanctions (LSau)
January 27, 2015 Filing 211 STATEMENT of Letter to Judge Hood regarding filings by Christopher Andrews by The Shane Group, Inc. (Fink, David)
January 26, 2015 Filing 210 SUPPLEMENT TO #163 Objection #205 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Christopher Andrews. (DTyl)
January 22, 2015 Filing 209 REPLY to #208 Response to Motion, by Christopher Andrews. (SOso)
January 20, 2015 Filing 208 RESPONSE to #205 MOTION for Sanctions filed by The Shane Group, Inc.(consolidated from 10-14887). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JOINT DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. SMALL, DANIEL E. GUSTAFSON, DANIEL C. HEDLUND, AND E. POWELL MILLER IN SUPPORT OF CLASS COUNSELS OPPOSITION TO OBJECTOR CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) (Fink, David)
January 12, 2015 Filing 207 RESPONSE to #206 MOTION CLASS COUNSELS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SHOW CAUSE ORDER RELATING TO SANCTIONABLE CONDUCT filed by Christopher Andrews. (SOso)
January 9, 2015 Filing 206 MOTION CLASS COUNSELS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SHOW CAUSE ORDER RELATING TO SANCTIONABLE CONDUCT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Andrews 1-8-2015 Email) (Bell, Theodore)
January 6, 2015 Filing 205 MOTION for Sanctions by Christopher Andrews. (SOso)
January 6, 2015 Filing 204 RESPONSE to Corrected #203 Declaration by Christopher Andrews. (SOso)
December 29, 2014 Filing 203 DECLARATION by E. Powell Miller Corrected filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Time and Lodestar Summary, #2 Exhibit B- Summary of the Expenses) (Miller, E.)
December 15, 2014 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Final Pretrial Conference on December 15, 2014 and Jury Trial on January 20, 2015 are Cancelled re #138 . (LSau)
December 12, 2014 Filing 202 RESPONSE to #200 Memorandum, by Christopher Andrews. (LHos)
December 10, 2014 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM re #169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation PLAINTIFFS' [CORRECTED] SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL by The Shane Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Letter from Dale Schubert, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Charles Marr, #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of Fairness Hearing, July 9, 2012) (Fink, David)
December 9, 2014 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM re #169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation --- PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL by The Shane Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Letter from Dale Schubert, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Charles Marr, #4 Exhibit C - Transcript of Fairness Hearing, July 9, 2012) (Fink, David)
November 20, 2014 Filing 199 Redacted Version of #198 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/14/14. (Appeal Purposes) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2015. (Daniel, C.)
November 20, 2014 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/14/14. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryl E. Daniel) (Number of Pages: 89) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2015. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Daniel, C.)
November 18, 2014 Filing 196 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #192 MOTION to Intervene , #183 MOTION to Intervene , #185 MOTION to Intervene in Response to Petitioners' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records on Behalf of Third Parties Priority Health and Spectrum Health Systems, #186 MOTION to Intervene (LSau)
November 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2014 re #155 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing, #184 MOTION to Intervene, #169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, #177 MOTION to Strike, #183 MOTION to Intervene, #185 MOTION to Intervene, #186 MOTION to Intervene, Fairness Hearing held on 11/12/2014 Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
November 12, 2014 Filing 195 Proof of class membership for all objectors. (SOso)
November 12, 2014 Filing 192 MOTION to Intervene by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (McPhie, Iain)
November 12, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Masternak on behalf of Holland Community Hospital. (Masternak, Brian)
November 11, 2014 Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #181 Response to Motion,, to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing filed by CHE Trinity, Covenant Medical Center, Inc., Health Alliance Plan of Michigan, McLaren Health Care Corporation, Metropolitan Hospital, MidMichigan Health, University of Michigan Health System, Charlevoix Area Hospital, DLP Marquette General Hospital, LLC. (Ettinger, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE by Ascension Health, Borgess Medical Center(consolidated from 10-14887) re #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing Ascension Health and Borgess Health's Notice of Objection to Unsealing Motion (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (unpublished case), #3 Exhibit B (unpublished case), #4 Exhibit C (unpublished case), #5 Exhibit D (unpublished case), #6 Exhibit E (unpublished case)) (Demitrack, Thomas) Modified on 11/12/2014 (DWor). [DOCUMENT IS ENTITLED "NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO MOTION TO UNSEAL BY THIRD PARTY WITNESSES ASCENSION HEALTH AND BORGESS HEALTH"]
November 11, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Jorissen on behalf of Ascension Health, Borgess Medical Center(consolidated from 10-14887). (Jorissen, Jonathan)
November 11, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Demitrack on behalf of Ascension Health, Borgess Medical Center(consolidated from 10-14887). (Demitrack, Thomas)
November 11, 2014 Filing 186 MOTION to Intervene by Holland Community Hospital. (Brooks, Katherine)
November 10, 2014 Filing 197 Letter from Darrell C. Thompson (DWor)
November 10, 2014 Filing 193 Proof of Class Membershio for Objector Michael Andrews. (SOso)
November 10, 2014 Filing 185 MOTION to Intervene in Response to Petitioners' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records on Behalf of Third Parties Priority Health and Spectrum Health Systems by Priority Health Insurance Company, Spectrum Health Systems. (Masternak, Brian)
November 10, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Intervene in Response to Petitioners' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records on Behalf of Third Parties Priority Health and Spectrum Health Systems by Priority Health Insurance Company, Spectrum Health Systems. (Masternak, Brian) Modified on 11/12/2014 (DWor). [FILED IN ERROR]
November 7, 2014 Filing 194 Letter from Darrell C. Thompson (SOso)
November 7, 2014 Filing 183 MOTION to Intervene by Alpena Regional Medical Center, Caro Community Hospital, Henry Ford Hospital, Henry Ford Macomb Hospital Corporation, Henry Ford West Bloomfield Hospital, Henry Ford Wyandotte Hospital, Henry Ford Health System, National Surgical Hospital, Oakwood Healthcare System, Oakwood Healthcare, Inc., Oakwood Annapolis Hospital, Oakwood Heritage Hospital, Oakwood Southshore Medical Center. (Hurwitz, Noah)
November 7, 2014 Filing 182 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #177 MOTION to Strike #172 Docket Annotation Sur-Reply of Objector Christopher Andrews (LSau)
November 6, 2014 Filing 181 RESPONSE to #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing filed by MidMichigan Health (consolidated from 11-10375), Covenant Medical Center, Inc., Metropolitan Hospital, CHE Trinity, Michigan Health and Hospital Association, Bronson Health Care Group, Inc., University of Michigan Health System, Prime Healthcare Services - Garden City, LLC, McLaren Health Care Corporation, Health Alliance Plan of Michigan. (Ettinger, David)
November 5, 2014 Filing 180 RESPONSE to #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
November 4, 2014 Filing 179 RESPONSE to #177 Motion to strike sur-reply by Christopher Andrews. (DPer)
November 3, 2014 Filing 178 RESPONSE to #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Emails between B. Walters and B. Hoffman, Oct. 2014, #3 Exhibit 2 - Unreported Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
October 31, 2014 Filing 177 MOTION to Strike #172 Docket Annotation Sur-Reply of Objector Christopher Andrews by All Plaintiffs. (Small, Daniel)
October 30, 2014 Filing 176 Letter from Marguerite M. Schubert (DWor)
October 30, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE OF HEARING on #169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER on Defendant's Consent Motion to Amend the Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality #168 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 30, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE OF HEARING on #168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Protective Order (with Consent), #166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 28, 2014 Filing 172 Sur Reply, balance of proof of class membership for objector's, breach of attorny client privilege by counsel in their final submission papers (Sandusky, K)
October 24, 2014 Filing 171 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
October 24, 2014 Filing 170 REPLY to Response re #155 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 24, 2014 Filing 169 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits A-O, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I (part 1), #11 Exhibit I (part 2), #12 Exhibit I (part 3), #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O) (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 23, 2014 Filing 168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Protective Order (with Consent) by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Enlarging Briefs re #164 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 20, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Unsealing Records and Adjourning Fairness Hearing by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Morbark, Inc., Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Walters, Bryan)
October 20, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Small, Daniel)
October 15, 2014 Filing 165 Letter from Darrell Thompson (DWor)
October 6, 2014 Filing 163 OBJECTION to settlement by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation) (DPer)
October 2, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Effectuation of Notice Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charles Marr, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman) (Small, Daniel)
September 24, 2014 Filing 161 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement by ADAC Automotive, Alma Products Company, Baker College, Borroughs Corporation, Eagle Alloy, Inc., Fisher & Company, Inc., Four Winds Casino Resort, Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc., Gemini Group, Inc., Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC, Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians, Hi-Lex Corporation, Huizenga Group, Kent Companies, Inc., LaBelle Management, Incorporated, Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated, Petoskey Plastics, Inc., SAF-Holland USA, Star of the West Milling Company, Tarus Products, Inc., Terryberry Company, LLC, Thelen Inc., Trillium Staffing Solutions, Truss Technologies, Wade Trim Group Inc., Morbark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Data, #2 Exhibit 2: Data, #3 Exhibit 3: Aetna Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4: BCBSM Report, #5 Exhibit 5: Email, #6 Exhibit 6: BCBSM Letter, #7 Exhibit 7: Motion to Dismiss) (Walters, Bryan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 160 RESPONSE to #148 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Related Relief -Pro Se Objection to Settlement filed by Scott Mancinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Mancinelli, #2 Exhibit notice of settlement to minor, #3 certificate of service) (Mancinelli, Scott)
September 24, 2014 Filing 159 OBJECTION to Proposed Class Action Settlement. (KKra)
September 15, 2014 Filing 158 Letter of Objection from John Kunitzer (SSch)
August 7, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice Regarding Revised Claim Form (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Consumer Claim Form and draft changes to Section C of Consumer Claim) (Miller, E.)
August 1, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE OF HEARING on #155 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 24, 2014 Filing 155 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Incentive Awards to Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Declaration of Daniel Hedlund in Support of Motion and Compendium, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18) (Gustafson, Daniel)
July 14, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #148 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Related Relief Notice Regarding Amendment to Claim Forms and Long-Form Notice (Small, Daniel)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Mooting Motions #124 , #133 and #140 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
July 1, 2014 Filing 152 STATEMENT of Certification of Mailing Notices of Proposed Settlement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1715 by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration) (Stenerson, Todd)
June 26, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 11/12/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting #148 Preliminary Approval to Proposed Class Settlement. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
June 25, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Letter Clarifying Websites in Xaxis Network (Attachments: #1 List of Websites represented by Xaxis) (Oliver, Alyson)
June 24, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2014 re #148 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Related Relief filed by Bradley A. Veneberg, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund Disposition: Granted; Parties to submit proposed order(Court Reporter Joan Morgan) (JOwe)
June 23, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Related Relief (Small, Daniel)
June 23, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Small, Daniel)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER of withdrawal of the appearance of Attorney Meghan M. Boone for plaintiffs; with notice of withdrawal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPer)
June 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Status Conference held on 6/10/2014 (Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
May 14, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 6/10/2014 04:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Adjourning All Deadlines ( Status Conference set for 5/19/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for Class Certification #133 Motion, Daubert #140 Motion, and to Extend the Deadline for Merits Expert Reports. :( Replies due by 3/28/2014; 04/09/2014, Response due by 3/28/2014) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
March 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375)., #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund.. Motion Hearing RESET for 4/22/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Opposition to #140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). Response due by 3/21/2014. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Monda, H)
February 11, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE OF HEARING on #140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375).. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation Applicable to BCBSM's Supporting Brief for its Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
February 4, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Applicable to Supporting Brief for Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Harris, Alan)
February 3, 2014 Filing 140 SEALED MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Leitzinger with Brief in Support by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Unpublished Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
February 3, 2014 Filing 139 SEALED RESPONSE re #133 Sealed Motion,,,,,,, by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Unpublished Cases) (Stenerson, Todd)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 5:( Expert Discovery due by 3/28/2014, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/5/2014, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood, Jury Trial set for 1/20/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood), #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. :( Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood, Motion Hearing on Motion to Amend set for 7/31/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood, Motion Hearing on all other Motions set for 11/19/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Loury, R)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND EXPERT REPORTS as to #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. :( Response due by 1/27/2014, Reply due by 3/14/2014) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Loury, R)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Class Certification Briefing and Expert Reports. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
November 5, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE OF HEARING on #133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund.. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel #132 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 21, 2013 Filing 133 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit UU, #48 Exhibit VV, #49 Exhibit WW, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit ZZ, #53 Exhibit AAA, #54 Exhibit BBB, #55 Exhibit CCC, #56 Exhibit DDD, #57 Exhibit EEE, #58 Exhibit FFF, #59 Exhibit GGG, #60 Exhibit HHH, #61 Exhibit III, #62 Exhibit JJJ, #63 Exhibit KKK, #64 Exhibit LLL, #65 Exhibit MMM, #66 Exhibit NNN, #67 Exhibit OOO, #68 Exhibit PPP, #69 Exhibit QQQ, #70 Exhibit RRR, #71 Exhibit SSS, #72 Exhibit TTT, #73 Exhibit UUU, #74 Exhibit VVV, #75 Exhibit WWW, #76 Exhibit XXX, #77 Exhibit YYY, #78 Exhibit ZZZ, #79 Exhibit AAAA, #80 Exhibit BBBB, #81 Exhibit CCCC, #82 Exhibit DDDD, #83 Exhibit EEEE, #84 Exhibit FFFF, #85 Exhibit GGGG, #86 Exhibit HHHH, #87 Exhibit IIII, #88 Exhibit JJJJ, #89 Exhibit KKKK, #90 Exhibit LLLL) (Small, Daniel)
October 16, 2013 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel by Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel Under Seal) (Johnson, Brent)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #131 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
September 13, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Extend the Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Opening and Reply Briefs Supporting Their Motion for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Johnson, Brent)
August 30, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Mary Jane Fait on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc.. (Fait, Mary Jane)
July 31, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2013 re #128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and #124 MOTION (Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Supporting Their Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
July 19, 2013 Filing 129 REPLY to Response re #124 MOTION (Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Johnson, Brent)
July 15, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Supporting Their Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Johnson, Brent)
July 8, 2013 Filing 127 SEALED RESPONSE re #124 Motion, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Johnson email to Cummings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Hedlund email to Cummings, #4 Exhibit 3 - Cummings email to Johnson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Stenerson letter to Small, #6 Exhibit 5 - Small letter to Stenerson, #7 Exhibit 6 - Bjella Depo. Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Smith Depo. Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Felbinger Depo. Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9 - McGuire Depo. Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10 - Johnson Depo. Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 11 - Matzick Depo. Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 12 - Vitale Depo. Excerpts, #14 Exhibit 13 - Marcellino Depo. Excerpts, #15 Exhibit 14 - Gronda Depo. Excerpts, #16 Exhibit 15 - Worden Depo. Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 16 - Susterich Depo. Excerpts, #18 Exhibit 17 - Rodgers Depo. Excerpts, #19 Exhibit 18 - Leach Depo. Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 19 - Reichle Depo. Excerpts, #21 Exhibit 20 - Smith Depo. Excerpts) (Stenerson, Todd)
June 30, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE OF HEARING on #124 MOTION (Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class). Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 18, 2013 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss held on 10/9/12. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cheryl Daniel) (Number of Pages: 40) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2013. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Daniel, C.)
June 17, 2013 Filing 124 MOTION (Plaintiffs' Motion to Add and Drop Named Plaintiffs for the Proposed Class) by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Gustafson, Daniel)
May 23, 2013 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference Hearing on May 28, 2013 is Cancelled. (LSau)
May 23, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/3/2014 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/14/2014 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend the Time to File Motion for Class Certification and Other Deadlines #121 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 17, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION UNOPPOSED Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order No. 3 to Extend the Time to File Their Motion for Class Certification (and Other Deadlines) by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Small, Daniel)
April 16, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/28/2013 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 6/10/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #116 MOTION TO EXTEND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
February 19, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg Notice of Non-Affiliation of John E. Tangren (Fait, Mary Jane)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATED Supplemental PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning Non-Party's HAP's Production of Data and Protected Health Information. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER Concerning AETNA's Production of Data and Protected Health Information. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
February 5, 2013 Filing 116 MOTION TO EXTEND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND OTHER DEADLINES by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER No. 3) (Johnson, Brent)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER on Confidentiality agreement with non-party Healthplus of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER withdrawing #104 Motion to Compel(see document #114 - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATED ORDER regarding responses to written Discovery and Schedule for Class-related Depositions, Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING #109 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil)
December 23, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATED ORDER Amending Deadline for Filing Response re: #72 Amended Complaint, ( Defendant's Responses due by 12/21/2012) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil)
December 17, 2012 Filing 110 SEALED Response to Non-Parties Joseph T. Aoun and Nuyen, Tomtishen and Aoun, P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Green, Patrick)
December 17, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Information Designated Confidential by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Green, Patrick)
December 6, 2012 Filing 108 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories JOINT STATEMENT OF RESOLVED AND UNRESOLVED ISSUES TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 11, 2013. (LBar)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: #104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Certain deposition. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MWil)
December 3, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Dianne M. Nast - NOT SWORN on behalf of Scott Steele. (Nast - NOT SWORN, Dianne)
November 30, 2012 Filing 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatories by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff''s Answers to BCBSM's First Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to BCBSM's First Requests for Admission) (Stenerson, Todd)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SCHEDULING ORDER No. 2: Discovery due by 11/30/2012 Status Conference set for 5/21/2013 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/1/2013 Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2014 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 2/25/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss #80 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
November 30, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 5/21/2013 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
November 6, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Bell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bell, Theodore)
October 25, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent W. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Brent)
October 9, 2012 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2012 re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
October 8, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Related ECF Filing (Miller, E.)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATED ORDER Amending Scheduling Order No. 1. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
September 28, 2012 Filing 97 JOINT STATUS REPORT for October 9, 2012 Status Conference by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887), Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund, Scott Steele, The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Order Requiring Submission of Most Favored Nation Clauses, dated July 18, 2012, #3 Exhibit 2- Order Issuing Determination Report, dated July 18, 2012) (Miller, E.)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #88 Motion for Protective Order- Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATED ORDER to Postpone the Exchange of Final Witness Lists Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: #90 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Information Relating to Previously Filed Motion for Protective Order and Supporting Brief filed by Jeffrey Connolly. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 30, 2012 Filing 94 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #88 MOTION for Protective Order (LBar)
August 29, 2012 Filing 93 REPLY to Response re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: #88 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSro)
August 23, 2012 Filing 91 SEALED Declaration of Jeffrey Connolly re #88 MOTION for Protective Order by Jeffrey Connolly. (McGlynn, Daniel)
August 23, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Confidential Information Relating to Previously Filed Motion for Protective Order and Supporting Brief by Jeffrey Connolly. (McGlynn, Daniel)
August 23, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. McGlynn on behalf of Jeffrey Connolly. (McGlynn, Daniel)
August 22, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION for Protective Order by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Connolly, #3 Exhibit B - DOJ's Notice of Depo of Jeffrey Connolly, #4 Exhibit C - Class Pls' Notice of Depo of Jeffrey Connolly, #5 Exhibit D - 8-21-12 email from Lasken to Danks, #6 Exhibit E - 8-21-12 email from Danks to All Counsel, #7 Exhibit F - DOJ's Revised Notice of Depo of Jeffrey Connolly, #8 Exhibit G - 8-21-12 email from McGlynn to Lipton (Part 1), #9 Exhibit H - 8-21-12 email from McGlynn to Lipton (Part 2), #10 Exhibit I - Aetna's Second Request for Production of Documents to BCBSM, dated 2-21-12, #11 Exhibit J - Aetna's Notice of Depo of Jeffrey Connolly) (Stenerson, Todd)
August 22, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan M. Boone on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Boone, Meghan)
August 17, 2012 Filing 86 RESPONSE to #80 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
August 17, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Phillips on behalf of All Defendants. (Phillips, Robert)
August 15, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 15, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE of hearing on #80 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/17/2012 Replies due by 8/29/2012 Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2012 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 3, 2012 Filing 82 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Miller, E.)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER of Withdrawal of Appearance re #79 Notice of Withdrawal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
July 20, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Stenerson, Todd)
July 19, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Robert A. Cacace by Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund, Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund. (Small, Daniel)
June 22, 2012 Filing 78 SEALED Consolidated Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Class Plaintiffs to File their Consolidated Amended Complaint Without Redactions Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Bankston, T)
June 18, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Heikka on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887). (Heikka, Michelle)
June 13, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl T. Rashid on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Rashid, Carl)
June 13, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Gourley on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Gourley, Jason)
June 13, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan N. Harris on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375). (Harris, Alan)
June 12, 2012 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, E.)
June 8, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Green on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 11-10375), Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan(consolidated from 10-14887). (Green, Patrick)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER mooting #48 Motion for Leave to File Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER for Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel, And Intitial Pretrial Schedule filed by Bradley A. Veneberg, The Shane Group, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2012 Status Conference set for 12/4/2012 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/1/2013 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2013 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JOwe)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #52 Motion for Protective Order and Issuing Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
May 16, 2012 Filing 66 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *5/15/12*. Designated lead case number is *10-14360*. (DWor)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Consolidating Cases, directing papers to be filed in 10-14360, and administratively closing case no. 10-14887 and case no. 11-10375. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DWor)
April 20, 2012 Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 4/20/2012 before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
April 20, 2012 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2012 re #52 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren Daniel) (LSau)
April 18, 2012 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Stenerson, Todd)
April 17, 2012 Filing 63 STATUS REPORT FOR APRIL 20, 2012 STATUS CONFERENCE by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg (Miller, E.)
March 27, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Frushour on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Frushour, Jennifer)
March 26, 2012 Filing 61 REPLY to Response re #52 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion for Protective Order) (Stenerson, Todd)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re #58 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Christopher D. Kaye. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
March 23, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Alamo, Michelle)
March 21, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher D. Kaye by All Plaintiffs. (Kaye, Christopher)
March 20, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Alamo on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Alamo, Michelle)
March 15, 2012 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #52 MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 6, 2012 Email from J. Tangren to C. Johnson) (Miller, E.)
March 7, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #31 Supplemental Brief, of Supplemental Authority and Information in Support of Supplemental Submission (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Messner v. Northshore Univ. Healthsystem, #3 Exhibit 2 - Messner v. Northshore Univ. Healthsystem - reh'g denied) (Miller, E.)
March 7, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 7, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of hearing on #52 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2012 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 27, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION for Protective Order by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Nov. 10, 2011 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 14, 2011 Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Dec. 2, 2011 Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Jan. 17, 2012 Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Dec. 16, 2011 Depo Transcript Falatko, #7 Exhibit 6 - Jan. 17, 2012 Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Jan. 30, 2012 Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - Jan. 31, 2012 Letter, #10 Exhibit 9 - Feb. 6, 2012 Letter, #11 Exhibit 10 - Feb. 6, 2012 Letter, #12 Exhibit 11 - Feb. 7, 2012 Letter, #13 Exhibit 12 - Feb. 7, 2012 Letter, #14 Exhibit 13 - Feb. 7, 2012 Letter, #15 Exhibit 14 - Feb. 7, 2012 Letter, #16 Exhibit 15 - Feb. 10, 2012 Letter, #17 Exhibit 16 - Feb. 14, 2012 Letter, #18 Exhibit 17 - Feb. 15, 2012 Email, #19 Exhibit 18 - Feb. 15, 2012 Email, #20 Exhibit 19 - Feb. 16, 2012 Email, #21 Exhibit 20 - Feb. 21, 2012 Email, #22 Exhibit 21 - Feb. 21, 2012 Email, #23 Exhibit 22 - Feb. 23, 2012 Email, #24 Exhibit 23 - Feb. 23, 2012 Email, #25 Exhibit 24 - Feb. 23, 2012 Letter, #26 Exhibit 25 - Feb. 23, 2012 Letter, #27 Exhibit 26 - In re Michaels Stores Pin Pad Litig.) (Stenerson, Todd)
November 7, 2011 Filing 51 REPLY to Response re #48 MOTION for Leave to File The Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill (Reply to BCBSM's Response) filed by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
November 1, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #48 MOTION for Leave to File The Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Stenerson, Todd)
October 27, 2011 Filing 49 REPLY to Response re #48 MOTION for Leave to File The Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill filed by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Miller, E.)
October 18, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File The Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Kenneth M. Mogill) (Miller, E.)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER concerning confidentiality. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 3, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Donald Bruce Hoffman on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Hoffman, Donald)
August 3, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Todd M. Stenerson on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Stenerson, Todd)
June 7, 2011 Minute Entry - Status Conference held on 6/7/2011 before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Court Reporter Cheryl Warren-Daniel) (LSau)
June 6, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE by Alyson Oliver Notice of Related Filing Withdrawing Plaintiff Steele's Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel (Oliver, Alyson)
May 27, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Related ECF Filing (Danks, Ryan)
May 19, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan of Objection to Plaintiffs' Filings on Proposed Dates (Stenerson, Todd)
May 19, 2011 Filing 41 RESPONSE to the May 11, 2011 Filings of the City of Pontiac and the Shane Group, Et Al. by Ascension Health, Borgess Medical Center, Botsford Hospital, Covenant Healthcare, Genesys Regional Medical Center, Gratiot Community Hospital, Marquette General Health System, Metro Health, MidMichigan Health, Munson Medical Center, Providence Park Hospital - Novi, Southfield Providence Hospital, Sparrow Hospital, St. John Hospital & Medical Center, St. John Hospital - North Shore Campus, St. John Macomb - Oakland Hospital, St. John River District Hospital - East China, St. Joseph Health System, St. Mary's of Michigan Medical Center, William Beaumont Hospital - Grosse Pointe, William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak, William Beaumont Hospital-Troy. (Ettinger, David)
May 19, 2011 Filing 40 RESPONSE to May 11, 2001 Filings of the City of Pontiac and the Shane Group, Et Al. by Ascension Health, Covenant Healthcare, Gratiot Community Hospital, Marquette General Health System, Metro Health, MidMichigan Health, Munson Medical Center, Sparrow Hospital, Botsford Hospital, William Beaumont Hospital - Grosse Pointe, William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak, William Beaumont Hospital-Troy, St. John Hospital & Medical Center, Genesys Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's of Michigan Medical Center, St. Joseph Health System, Borgess Medical Center, Southfield Providence Hospital, Providence Park Hospital - Novi, St. John Hospital - North Shore Campus, St. John Macomb - Oakland Hospital, St. John River District Hospital - East China. (Ettinger, David)[DUPLICATE TO DOCUMENT #41 ] Modified on 5/20/2011 (DPer).
May 19, 2011 Filing 39 REQUEST For Oral Argument by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Miller, E.)
May 13, 2011 Filing 38 RESPONSE to City of Pontiac Proposal of Dates Governing the Matter (Docket No. 123 in Case No. 11-10276) by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Miller, E.)
May 11, 2011 Filing 37 STATEMENT of Shane Group, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters, and Steele Plaintiffs' Proposal Of Dates Governing The Matter by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg (Miller, E.)
May 9, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. McNeill on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (McNeill, Thomas)
May 4, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan of Position Regarding Plaintiffs' Filings on Proposed Class Leadership (Stenerson, Todd)
May 2, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg Shane Group, Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters, and Steele Plaintiffs Response to (1) City of Pontiacs Supplemental Submission Regarding Class Counsel Issues and (2) the Hospital Defendants Opposition to Certain Plaintiffs [Proposed] Order for Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 26, 2011 email exchange) (Tangren - NOT SWORN, John)
May 2, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by Ascension Health Notice of Related Filing (Shumaker, Michael)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER regarding class counsel and organization proposal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 27, 2011 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel, And Intitial Pretrial Schedule filed by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order) (Fink, David)
April 27, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE by Pontiac, City of , of Related ECF Filing (Thompson, Jason)
April 20, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by Sparrow Hospital, Munson Medical Center of Related ECF Filing (Kraus, Richard)
April 19, 2011 Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference Not Held before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 19, 2011 Minute Entry - Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2011 re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases before District Judge Denise Page Hood. Disposition: RESOLVED; PARTIES TO SUBMIT ORDER(Court Reporter Cheryl Warren-Daniel) (LSau)
April 19, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by Gratiot Community Hospital, Marquette General Health System, Metro Health, MidMichigan Health, Covenant Healthcare of Related ECF Filing (Ettinger, David)
April 13, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Bruce Hoffman on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Hoffman, Donald)
April 12, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE by Pontiac, City of Notice of Related ECF Filing (Thompson, Jason)
April 11, 2011 Filing 25 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Miller, E.)
March 14, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE by Pontiac, City of (of Related Filing) (Thompson, Jason)
March 8, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE by Ascension Health notice of related ECF filing (Shumaker, Michael)
March 8, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE by Metro Health, MidMichigan Health, Marquette General Health System of Related ECF Filing (Ettinger, David)
March 8, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE by Gratiot Community Hospital of Related ECF Filing (Ettinger, David)
March 7, 2011 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion to Appoint Counsel (Sommers Schwartz as Interim Class Counsel) filed by City of Pontiac (Docket #43 in Case No. 2:11-cv-10276) by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Unpublished Cases and Order) (Miller, E.)
February 28, 2011 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Motion For Consolidation and Appointment Of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel filed by Plaintiff Scott Steele in Case No. 11-cv-10375. by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Leadership Orders) (Fink, David)[RESPONSE TO #13 MOTION] Modified on 3/1/2011 (PPau).
February 22, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE by Alyson Oliver Notice of Related Filing (Oliver, Alyson)
February 22, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2011 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page and the Joint Discovery Plan must be filed by 4/11/2011 Hood (LSau)
February 22, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of hearing on #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel, And Intitial Pretrial Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2011 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
February 21, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE by Pontiac, City of (of Related ECF Filing) (Thompson, Jason)
January 13, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing on #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel, And Intitial Pretrial Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 04:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SJa)
January 7, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment of Interim Class and Liaison Counsel, And Intitial Pretrial Schedule by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of E. Powell Miller, #3 Exhibit 2-Firm Resume of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP, #4 Exhibit 3-Firm Resume of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC) (Miller, E.)
January 6, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Powell Miller on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Miller, E.)
January 6, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey A. Fry on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Fry, Casey)
January 6, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Kaye on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Kaye, Christopher)
January 5, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bressack, Darryl)
January 5, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fink, David)
December 30, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Stenerson on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Stenerson, Todd)
December 3, 2010 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan waiver sent on 11/2/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (Fink, David)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Lawrence P Zatkoff and Magistrate Judge Virginia M Morgan to District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Mona K Majzoub. (SSch)
November 1, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl G. Bressack on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Bressack, Darryl)
November 1, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jane Fait - NOT ADMITTED on behalf of The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg. (Fait - NOT ADMITTED, Mary)
November 1, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan*. (CGre)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Shane Group, Inc., Bradley A. Veneberg against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-2695759 - Fee: $ 350. County Where Action Arose: Oakland - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:10-cv-14155, Judge Denise Page Hood] (Fink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Shane Group, Inc. et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd M. Stenerson
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel E. Mossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan
Represented By: Thomas G. McNeill
Represented By: Todd M. Stenerson
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A. Fink
Represented By: Robert A. Phillips
Represented By: Patrick B. Green
Represented By: Alan N. Harris
Represented By: Carl T. Rashid
Represented By: Michelle L. Alamo
Represented By: Jason R. Gourley
Represented By: Donald Bruce Hoffman
Represented By: Farayha J. Arrine
Represented By: Michelle R. Heikka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: ADAC Automotive
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Petoskey Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Morbark, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Frankenmuth Bavarian Inn, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Kent Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Thelen Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Hi-Lex Corporation
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Master Automatic Machine Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Scott Mancinelli
Represented By: Scott Mancinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Fisher & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Grand Traverse Band of Ottawa and Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Aetna, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Represented By: Joshua Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Baker College
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Gill-Roy's Hardware/Morgan Properties LLC
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: SAF-Holland USA
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Borroughs Corporation
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Alma Products Company
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Trillium Staffing Solutions
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Tarus Products, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Truss Technologies
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Eagle Alloy, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: FloraCraft Corporation
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Terryberry Company, LLC
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Wade Trim Group Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Huizenga Group
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Star of the West Milling Company
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Gemini Group, Inc.
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Magna International of America, Incorporated
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Four Winds Casino Resort
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: LaBelle Management, Incorporated
Represented By: Perrin Rynders
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jeffrey Connolly
Represented By: Daniel J. McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Beaumont Hospital - Grosse Pointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: James W. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. Mary's of Michigan Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. John Macomb - Oakland Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Ford Health System
Represented By: Matthew M. Dybas
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. John River District Hospital - East China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DLP Marquette General Hospital, LLC
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHE Trinity
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Ford Wyandotte Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Metro Health
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: University of Michigan Health System
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Genesys Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Providence Park Hospital - Novi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Ford West Bloomfield Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Beaumont Hospital - Royal Oak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ascension Health
Represented By: Jonathan F. Jorissen
Represented By: Thomas Demitrack
Represented By: Michael R. Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alpena Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oakwood Southshore Medical Center
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bronson Health Care Group, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Beaumont Hospital-Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Southfield Providence Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marquette General Health System
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: McLaren Health Care Corporation
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oakwood Annapolis Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. John Hospital - North Shore Campus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Prime Healthcare Services - Garden City, LLC
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michigan Health and Hospital Association
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oakwood Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Alyson Oliver
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oakwood Heritage Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Ford Macomb Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Borgess Medical Center
Represented By: Jonathan F. Jorissen
Represented By: Thomas Demitrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Caro Community Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Henry Ford Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MidMichigan Health
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Health Alliance Plan of Michigan
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Covenant Healthcare
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Surgical Hospital
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sparrow Hospital
Represented By: Richard C. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Oakwood Healthcare System
Represented By: Noah S. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Covenant Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pontiac, City of
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gratiot Community Hospital
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Munson Medical Center
Represented By: Richard C. Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Metropolitan Hospital
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. Joseph Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Charlevoix Area Hospital
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: St. John Hospital & Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Botsford Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Shane Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Casey A. Fry
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: Jennifer E. Frushour
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Mary Jane Fait
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Veneberg
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Casey A. Fry
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: Jennifer E. Frushour
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Mary Jane Fait
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Steele
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Erin C. Burns
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Novara
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: Bryan M. Beckerman
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: Robert A. Cacace
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abatement Workers National Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Novara
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: Bryan M. Beckerman
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: Robert A. Cacace
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 671 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Novara
Represented By: Daniel Small
Represented By: Meghan M. Boone
Represented By: Bryan M. Beckerman
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: Robert A. Cacace
Represented By: Daniel J. Nordin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Theodore Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Priority Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian J. Masternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Spectrum Health Systems
Represented By: Brian J. Masternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Iain R. McPhie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Holland Community Hospital
Represented By: Brian J. Masternak
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?