Carroll v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bernie Williams, Shanice Boyette, David Latvick, William Romesburg, Robert S. Lyss, Jr., Judy Brownlow, Derrick Jamerson, Jack Herrell, Melissa Costello, Eric Wilson, Robyn Zelenetz, John Costello, Chad Niegelsen, Julia D Hall, Harvey Jassem, Aaron Patrick Gardner, Chaan William Beard, Nick J Widmar, William Resh, Marc Stewart, William R. Solinski, Nicholas Allen, Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System, James Stepahin, Kenneth Odegard, Gina Wrigley, Jerald Rasor, Patrick Kosacek, Dawn Faron-Ardine, Sheila Schult, Donald Ardine, Harry Vogel, Laura Gene Richardson, Tyler Bliss, Angela Jolly, Saulius Malinauskas, Joshua Sackos, Molly Briggs, Timothy Flynn, Jerzy Bobko, Kathleen Lawrence, Daniel Sullivan, Hava Gurevich, Nathan Wheeler, Charles Woods, Jeffrey King, John Gatti, Segundino Butron, III, Duncan Lawrence, Jeremy Bowman, FRANCISCO SURO, Richard Taylor, Nathan Staley, Christopher VanCompernolle, Jason Quillen, Joseph Bruno, Gary Osman, Annie Argento, Nora Donaire, Donna Kirkman, Jose Cavaliere, Amy Dvorak, Kevin Morris, Adam Spring, Bryan Kingman, Rebekah Osterman, James Uttecht, Kristoff T'Siobbel, Rone Tempest, Janet Levy Pauli, Ari Kaufman, Dylan Hanson, Michael Lorenz, Dominic Troffer, Ryan Parker, Scott Zelenetz, Nancy E. Thompson, Isaac Hoover, Nicholas Bond, Jennifer Dixon, John Rowden, James H. Fisher, Robert Marcolini, Paul Robell, Keri Ross, Thomas Trainer, Ellis Casteen, Susan Matthews, Linda Babinski, DeWayne Fox, Forrest Tinsler, Sandra Herrell, Melanie Rodd, Raymond Thomas, Nancy Stirek, Jamie Joseph, Nicolas Heiss, Giancarlo Ceci, Tim Kirkman, Danijela Bjelic, Pat Ross, John Mazur, Sandra Rossi, Sarah Hayden, Donald Stave, Daniel Carroll, Carol Coplan, Roberto Santana, Christopher Marshall, Donald W Nelson, Jacqulyn Jamerson, William R Rolinski, Danuta Pelc, Aaron Tarnow, Caasi Parr, David Ebenstein, Susan Sherman, Dennis Moore, Hans Schult, Latonia Pitts, Tyler Merz, Todd Briggs, Shelby Fruge, Juliet Brodie, Thomas L Buyers, Karin and Leo McCloskey, Matt and Tammy Moeller, Dario Medina, Carrie Scott, Dan Green, Brett Alters, Michael Santos, Alice Paylor, David Hough, Scott Xavier Brown, Jeremy D. Fisher, Roland Hermann, Philip Reich, Paul Linnee, Kate DeNeveu, Jacqueline Fox, Sara Schram, Drew Schembre, Claudia Kindler, Frank Hoffman, Alexis Weil, Robert F. Eslick, William Pendry, Ralph Waterhouse, Paul Wright, Carl Robinson and Tammy Hendricks
Defendant: Martin Winterkorn, Jan Bures, Volkswagen Manufacturing Corporation of America, Herbert Diess, Porsche Autombil Holding SE, Arkansas State Highway Employees Retirement System, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America LLC, VW Credit, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Audi AG, Porsche AG, Volkswagen of America, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Does 1-25, DR. ING. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Mark McNabb, Volkswagen of America Group, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Jonathan Browning, Suburban Imports of Farmington Hills, Inc. and Michael Horn
Case Number: 2:2015cv13360
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Gerald E Rosen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rebekah Osterman as to Rebekah Osterman (Consolidated from 15-13753) (Whiting, Paul)
January 4, 2016 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 12/17/2015, answer due 1/7/2016. (Brown, Jason)
December 16, 2015 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 12/7/2015, answer due 12/28/2015. (Keller, Amy)
December 16, 2015 Filing 105 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.* (DAll)
December 16, 2015 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Brown, Jason)
December 14, 2015 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:15-cv-05656, filed 12/11/2015. (VLun)
December 10, 2015 Case transferred to Northern District of California. (SSch)
December 10, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2672. (SSch)
December 10, 2015 Filing 103 MDL Certified Transfer Order to Northern District of California for MDL # 2672. (SSch)
December 10, 2015 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/25/2015, answer due 12/16/2015. (Hagstrom, Richard)
December 9, 2015 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. (Keller, Amy) Modified on 12/9/2015 (LHos).[AUDI OF AMERICA LLC SERVED 12/2/15]
December 9, 2015 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen of America Group, Inc. served on 12/2/2015, answer due 12/23/2015. (Keller, Amy)
December 9, 2015 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 12/2/2015, answer due 12/23/2015. (Keller, Amy) Modified on 12/9/2015 (LHos).[RETURN OF SERVICE IS BLANK]
December 9, 2015 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/23/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Miller, Sheldon)
December 8, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lawrence Lieff on behalf of Brett Alters, John Costello, Melissa Costello, Jack Herrell, Sandra Herrell, Susan Sherman. (Lieff, Robert)
December 8, 2015 Filing 96 MDL Certified Transfer Order for MDL # 2672. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
December 8, 2015 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, E.)
December 8, 2015 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, E.)
December 8, 2015 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, E.)
December 8, 2015 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Horn served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, E.)
December 8, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Stoops on behalf of Jerzy Bobko, Molly Briggs, Todd Briggs, Joseph Bruno, Ellis Casteen, Nora Donaire, Tammy Hendricks, Roland Hermann, Derrick Jamerson, Jacqulyn Jamerson, Duncan Lawrence, Kathleen Lawrence, Christopher Marshall, Danuta Pelc, Jason Quillen, Philip Reich, Paul Robell, Joshua Sackos, Hans Schult, Sheila Schult, Christopher VanCompernolle, Gina Wrigley. (Stoops, Kevin)
December 4, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Sickels on behalf of Jerzy Bobko, Molly Briggs, Todd Briggs, Joseph Bruno, Ellis Casteen, Nora Donaire, Tammy Hendricks, Roland Hermann, Derrick Jamerson, Jacqulyn Jamerson, Duncan Lawrence, Kathleen Lawrence, Christopher Marshall, Danuta Pelc, Jason Quillen, Philip Reich, Paul Robell, Joshua Sackos, Hans Schult, Sheila Schult, Christopher VanCompernolle, Gina Wrigley. (Sickels, Robert)
December 4, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Stoops on behalf of Jerzy Bobko, Danuta Pelc. (Stoops, Kevin)
December 4, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE by Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System of withdrawal of . (Kendall, Elton) Modified on 12/4/2015 (DWor). [NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCKET ENTRY #80 ]
December 3, 2015 Filing 87 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Derek W. Loeser appearing on behalf of Donald Ardine, Annie Argento, Linda Babinski, Chaan William Beard, Nicholas Bond, Jeremy Bowman, Juliet Brodie, Segundino Butron, III, Kate DeNeveu, Amy Dvorak, David Ebenstein, Dawn Faron-Ardine, Timothy Flynn, DeWayne Fox, Shelby Fruge, Aaron Patrick Gardner, John Gatti, Dan Green, Hava Gurevich, Dylan Hanson, Nicolas Heiss, David Hough, Harvey Jassem, Angela Jolly, Jamie Joseph, Bryan Kingman, Patrick Kosacek, David Latvick, Janet Levy Pauli, Michael Lorenz, Robert Marcolini, Karin and Leo McCloskey, Matt and Tammy Moeller, Kevin Morris, Kenneth Odegard, Alice Paylor, Jerald Rasor, William Resh, Carl Robinson, William Romesburg, Keri Ross, Pat Ross, Sandra Rossi, John Rowden, Drew Schembre, Sara Schram, Carrie Scott, Adam Spring, Donald Stave, James Stepahin, Nancy Stirek, Daniel Sullivan, Aaron Tarnow, Richard Taylor, Raymond Thomas, Ralph Waterhouse, Alexis Weil, Nathan Wheeler, Eric Wilson, Charles Woods, Paul Wright, Robyn Zelenetz, Scott Zelenetz (Loeser, Derek)
December 3, 2015 Filing 86 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gretchen Freeman Cappio appearing on behalf of Donald Ardine, Annie Argento, Linda Babinski, Chaan William Beard, Nicholas Bond, Jeremy Bowman, Juliet Brodie, Segundino Butron, III, Kate DeNeveu, Amy Dvorak, David Ebenstein, Dawn Faron-Ardine, Timothy Flynn, DeWayne Fox, Shelby Fruge, Aaron Patrick Gardner, John Gatti, Dan Green, Hava Gurevich, Dylan Hanson, Nicolas Heiss, David Hough, Harvey Jassem, Angela Jolly, Jamie Joseph, Bryan Kingman, Patrick Kosacek, David Latvick, Janet Levy Pauli, Michael Lorenz, Robert Marcolini, Karin and Leo McCloskey, Matt and Tammy Moeller, Kevin Morris, Kenneth Odegard, Alice Paylor, Jerald Rasor, William Resh, Carl Robinson, William Romesburg, Keri Ross, Pat Ross, Sandra Rossi, John Rowden, Drew Schembre, Sara Schram, Carrie Scott, Adam Spring, Donald Stave, James Stepahin, Nancy Stirek, Daniel Sullivan, Aaron Tarnow, Richard Taylor, Raymond Thomas, Ralph Waterhouse, Alexis Weil, Nathan Wheeler, Eric Wilson, Charles Woods, Paul Wright, Robyn Zelenetz, Scott Zelenetz (Cappio, Gretchen)
December 3, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE to parties regarding consolidated case. (DPer)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SIXTH ORDER of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
December 2, 2015 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/23/2015, answer due 12/14/2015. (Lipton, Marc)
December 2, 2015 Filing 82 DECLARATION by Thomas C. Michaud re #81 Supplemental Brief, #80 Notice (Other) in Support of the Public Pension Funds' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liasion Counsel filed by Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Michaud, Thomas)
December 2, 2015 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #80 Notice (Other) Memorandum of Law in Support of the Public Pension Funds' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System. (Michaud, Thomas)
December 2, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE by Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel (Michaud, Thomas)
December 2, 2015 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Horn served on 11/11/2015, answer due 12/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 2, 2015 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/4/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 1, 2015 Filing 77 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of Michael Horn (Williams, Michael)
December 1, 2015 Filing 76 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of Michael Horn (Bush, Cheryl)
November 30, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE by Arkansas State Highway Employees Retirement System re #74 MOTION Lead Counsel Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Henzi, Matthew)
November 25, 2015 Filing 74 MOTION Lead Counsel by Arkansas State Highway Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-VW notice - ED VA, #3 Exhibit B-VW notice - ED Mich, #4 Exhibit C-ASHERS VW Executed Certification, #5 Exhibit D-ASHERS loss in VW, #6 Exhibit E-Firm Resume) (Henzi, Matthew)
November 25, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE by Gregory Travalio of filing in District of New Jersey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DeLuca, Anthony)
November 25, 2015 Filing 72 NOTICE to parties regarding consolidated case. (DPer)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FIFTH ORDER of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
November 23, 2015 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/16/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. (Whiting, Paul)
November 20, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Tana Lin on behalf of FRANCISCO SURO. (Lin, Tana)
November 18, 2015 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 10/20/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen of America, Inc. served on 10/20/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 10/20/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen of America, Inc. served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 10/26/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 10/28/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Gustafson, Daniel)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPar)
November 18, 2015 Filing 61 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of VW Credit, Inc. (Williams, Michael)
November 18, 2015 Filing 60 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of VW Credit, Inc. (Bush, Cheryl)
November 18, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE to parties regarding consolidated case. (DPer)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FOURTH ORDER of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPar)
November 12, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Phong-Chau Nguyen on behalf of Brett Alters, John Costello, Melissa Costello, Jack Herrell, Sandra Herrell, Susan Sherman, Marc Stewart, James Uttecht. (Nguyen, Phong-Chau)
November 12, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Budner on behalf of Brett Alters, John Costello, Melissa Costello, Jack Herrell, Sandra Herrell, Susan Sherman, Marc Stewart, James Uttecht. (Budner, Kevin)
November 12, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by David Stellings on behalf of Brett Alters, John Costello, Melissa Costello, Jack Herrell, Sandra Herrell, Susan Sherman, Marc Stewart, James Uttecht. (Stellings, David)
November 12, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Cabraser on behalf of Brett Alters, John Costello, Melissa Costello, Jack Herrell, Sandra Herrell, Susan Sherman, Marc Stewart, James Uttecht. (Cabraser, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2015 Filing 52 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.* (DAll)
November 9, 2015 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 10/30/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 11/2/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of Audi of America, Inc. (Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., improperly sued here as Audi of America, Inc.) (Williams, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 46 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of Audi of America LLC (Williams, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 45 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., improperly sued here as Volkswagen of America, Inc.) (Williams, Michael)
November 9, 2015 Filing 44 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of Audi of America, Inc. (Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., improperly sued here as Audi of America, Inc.) (Bush, Cheryl)
November 9, 2015 Filing 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of Audi of America LLC (Bush, Cheryl)
November 9, 2015 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 41 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of Volkswagen of America, Inc. (Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., improperly sued here as Volkswagen of America, Inc.) (Bush, Cheryl)
November 9, 2015 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/30/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 9, 2015 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Lipton, Marc)
November 9, 2015 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 10/21/2015, answer due 11/12/2015. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting motion to amend case caption. (grants document no.2 in 15-13707) Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
November 5, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE to parties regarding consolidated case. (DPer)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 THIRD ORDER of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
November 4, 2015 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America, Inc. served on 10/19/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Audi of America LLC served on 10/19/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 10/19/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Audi AG, Audi of America LLC, Audi of America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Lin, Tana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 18 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *11/03/15*. Designated lead case number is *15-13360*. (DPer)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER of consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPer)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' #12 DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO OCTOBER 16, 2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, (Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2015) Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (DPar)
October 26, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hedlund on behalf of Tyler Bliss. (Hedlund, Daniel)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Appointing the Honorable Layn R. Phillips and the Honorable Steven W. Rhodes as Masters for Expedited Settlement Negotiations. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (TMcg)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (TMcg)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Show Cause in writing why the Court Should not Issue an Order Directing Defendants to Preserve the Various Categories of Materials. Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2015. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (TMcg)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Appointing Interim Coordinating Class Counsel re #8 Order of Consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (TMcg)
October 16, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Rissman on behalf of Tyler Bliss. (Rissman, Joshua)
October 16, 2015 Filing 9 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *10/16/15*. Designated lead case number is *15-13360*. (SSch)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Consolidation. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (SSch)
October 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen: Status Conference held on 10/14/2015. (TMcg)
October 13, 2015 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Williams, Michael)
October 8, 2015 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 10/2/2015, answer due 10/23/2015. (Marker, Caleb)
October 6, 2015 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Bush, Cheryl)
October 6, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 10/14/2015 10:30 AM before District Judge Gerald E. Rosen (TMcg)
October 1, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.* (LHos)
October 1, 2015 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Marker, Caleb)
October 1, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.* (LHos)
September 30, 2015 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Marker, Caleb)
September 23, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION filed by Daniel Carroll against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-5349632 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Marker, Caleb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernie Williams
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanice Boyette
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Latvick
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Romesburg
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Lyss, Jr.
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Brownlow
Represented By: Sheldon L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jamerson
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Herrell
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Costello
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Wilson
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Zelenetz
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Costello
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Niegelsen
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Joshua J. Rissman
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia D Hall
Represented By: Sarah W. Colegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Jassem
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Patrick Gardner
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaan William Beard
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick J Widmar
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Resh
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Stewart
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Solinski
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Allen
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charter Township of Clinton Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stepahin
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Odegard
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Wrigley
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Rasor
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kosacek
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Faron-Ardine
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Schult
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ardine
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Vogel
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gene Richardson
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bliss
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Joshua J. Rissman
Represented By: Daniel Hedlund
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Jolly
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saulius Malinauskas
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sackos
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Briggs
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Flynn
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerzy Bobko
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Lawrence
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hava Gurevich
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wheeler
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Woods
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey King
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gatti
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundino Butron, III
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Lawrence
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bowman
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO SURO
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Staley
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher VanCompernolle
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Quillen
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Osman
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Argento
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Donaire
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Kirkman
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cavaliere
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Morris
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Spring
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Kingman
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Osterman
Represented By: Paul J. Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Uttecht
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristoff T'Siobbel
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rone Tempest
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Levy Pauli
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Kaufman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Hanson
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lorenz
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Troffer
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Parker
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Zelenetz
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy E. Thompson
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Hoover
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Bond
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dixon
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rowden
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Fisher
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marcolini
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Robell
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Ross
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Trainer
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Casteen
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Matthews
Represented By: Timothy A. Swafford
Represented By: Alan Kellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Babinski
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeWayne Fox
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Tinsler
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Herrell
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Rodd
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Thomas
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Stirek
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Joseph
Represented By: Schuyler E. von Oeyen
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Heiss
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giancarlo Ceci
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Kirkman
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danijela Bjelic
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Ross
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mazur
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rossi
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hayden
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Stave
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carroll
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Coplan
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Santana
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Marshall
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W Nelson
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqulyn Jamerson
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Rolinski
Represented By: Marc E. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danuta Pelc
Represented By: Lance C. Young
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Tarnow
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caasi Parr
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ebenstein
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sherman
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Moore
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Schult
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Pitts
Represented By: Sarah W. Colegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Merz
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Briggs
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Fruge
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Brodie
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L Buyers
Represented By: Sarah W. Colegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin and Leo McCloskey
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt and Tammy Moeller
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Medina
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Scott
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Green
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Alters
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Santos
Represented By: David J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Paylor
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hough
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Xavier Brown
Represented By: Aaron D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy D. Fisher
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Hermann
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Reich
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Linnee
Represented By: Caleb L.H. Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate DeNeveu
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Fox
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Schram
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Schembre
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Kindler
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hoffman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Weil
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Eslick
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pendry
Represented By: Sarah W. Colegrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Waterhouse
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Wright
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Robinson
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Amy C. Williams-Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hendricks
Represented By: Amy L. Marino
Represented By: Robert B. Sickels
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Winterkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Bures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Manufacturing Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Diess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Autombil Holding SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway Employees Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VW Credit, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ING. h.c.F. Porsche AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen of America Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suburban Imports of Farmington Hills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Horn
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?