Shaw v. Riverview, City of et al
Plaintiff: Craig Shaw
Defendant: Riverview, City of, Gary Chevillet, Douglas Drysdale and MMRO, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv11693
Filed: May 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BGar)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER Denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED OPINION and ORDER re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Riverview, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Shaw
Represented By: Diane L Hewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview, City of
Represented By: Laura S. Amtsbuechler
Represented By: Laura Bailey Brown
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Chevillet
Represented By: Laura S. Amtsbuechler
Represented By: Laura Bailey Brown
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Drysdale
Represented By: Laura S. Amtsbuechler
Represented By: Laura Bailey Brown
Represented By: Kerry L. Morgan
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMRO, Inc
Represented By: Laura S. Amtsbuechler
Represented By: Laura Bailey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?