Rivera v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Rivera and Jon Rivera
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv13786
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING #12 Amended Class Action Complaint and Retaining Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/8/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/7/2018 Final Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 6/11/2019 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2017. (Sandusky, K)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Miller, E.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 11/7/2017 at 04:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (Sandusky, K)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 04:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (George, David)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Ford Motor Company's Time to File an Answer to the Amended Class Action Complaint ( Answer due by 9/26/2017). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 9/6/2017. (Sandusky, K)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Ford Motor Company's Time to File an Answer to the Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE TO APPEAR: In-Person Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Sandusky, K)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION & ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #13 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint held on 5/30/2017. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: David B. Yarbrough) (Number of Pages: 31) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Yarbrough, David)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2017 re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ford Motor Company. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (Sandusky, K)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schelkopf on behalf of Jon Rivera. (Schelkopf, Matthew)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER for Adjournment of May 19, 2017 Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing RESET for 5/30/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Thomas, John)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Allen Lienhardt on behalf of Jon Rivera. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Upon review, the Court grants the defendant's Application to Exceed Reply Brief Page Limit (Dkt. #18 ). The reply brief should not exceed 10 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION to Exceed Reply Brief Page Limit by Ford Motor Company. (Thomas, John)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing RESET for 5/19/2017 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Sandusky, K)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. George on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (George, David)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Jon Rivera. (Miller, E.)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying without Prejudice Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford 2013 New Vehicle Limited Warranty) (Thomas, John)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jon Rivera against Ford Motor Company. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Miller, E.)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss. ( Amended Complaint due by 2/7/2017) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New Vehicle Limited Warranty) (Thomas, John)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Thomas, John)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time ( Response due by 1/17/2017). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Thomas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Thomas, John)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista L. Lenart on behalf of All Defendants. (Lenart, Krista)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 11/4/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. (Miller, E.)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (LHos)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Jon Rivera. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jon Rivera against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5929573 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: David M. George
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Represented By: Krista L. Lenart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Rivera
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?