Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Dell, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company and Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Defendant: Simplo Technology Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Dell, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10393
Filed: February 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER About Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and to Extend Deadlines (ECF No. #41 ). ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford). (Plaintiff's counsel to initiate phone conference) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
November 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/18/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (MarW)
November 15, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. of filing Discovery Confidentiality Order agreed by parties (Christie, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference regarding Motion to Compel set for 11/18/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (Plaintiff's counsel to initiate conference call) (MarW)
November 4, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Extend Deadlines Concurrence filed by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Mulcahy, Patrick)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: #41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Extend Deadlines filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 16, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Marisa L. Saber re #41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Extend Deadlines filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 In Support of Affirmation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 In Support of Affirmation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 In Support of Affirmation, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 In Support of Affirmation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 In Support of Affirmation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 In Support of Affirmation, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 In Support of Affirmation) (Saber, Marisa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Extend Deadlines by Allstate Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
October 2, 2019 Attorney Kevin M. Mulvaney is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. (DTof)
September 23, 2019 Filing 40 WITNESS LIST by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Mulcahy, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Attorney John R. Christie for Dell, Inc. added. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: John R. Christie re 38 Notice (Other). Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: John R. Christie re 37 Notice (Other). Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2019; FACILITATION INFORMATION DUE BY 12/1/2019; FACILITATION TO BE HELD BY 3/14/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/17/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman; Jury Trial set for 12/15/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul D. Borman - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof)
March 15, 2019 Filing 35 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Saber, Marisa)
March 15, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference 03/19/2019 is Cancelled. (DTof)
February 13, 2019 Filing 34 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Denali Intermediate Inc., Other Affiliate Dell Technologies Inc. for Dell, Inc.. (Mulvaney, Kevin)
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE TO APPEAR: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 3/15/2019; Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2019 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER supplementing the Court's January 16, 2019 Bench Opinion granting defendant Simplo Technology's motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (MBea)
January 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2019 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Simplo Technology Co., Ltd. Disposition: Motion GRANTED (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof) Modified on 1/16/2019 (DTof).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
October 30, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF HEARING on #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
October 29, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re letters rogatory (DPer)
October 22, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 is Cancelled ; will be rescheduled. (DTof)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED ORDER to dismiss defendant Samsung SDI America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DPer)
August 29, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Christie, John)
August 29, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Christie, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Simplo Technology Co., Ltd.. (Mulvaney, Kevin)
August 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING on #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 03:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
August 17, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Plaintiffs' Brief In Support of Response filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Saber, Marisa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Saber, Marisa) [FILED WITHOUT BRIEF ATTACHED, DOCUMENT RE-FILED AS DKT 23 WITH BRIEF]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING Samsung SDI America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 3, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Simplo Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Wei, Chin-Wen) (Mulvaney, Kevin)
May 16, 2018 Filing 19 JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT REPORT by Allstate Insurance Company (Saber, Marisa)
April 10, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Plaintiffs. (Saber, Marisa) Modified on 4/11/2018 (DWor). [WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD]
April 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa L. Saber on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to Serve. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 5, 2018 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Allstate Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letters Rogatory), #2 Exhibit A-Summons Issued to Defendant Simplo Technology Co.,Ltd.) (Carroll, Philip)
March 2, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Defendant Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Extend the Life of Summons by Allstate Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons) (Carroll, Philip)
March 2, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , Request for Extension of Time to Serve and Extend the Life of Summons Issued to Defendant Simplo Technology Co., Ltd. by Allstate Insurance Company, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letters Rogatory), #2 Exhibit A- Summons) (Carroll, Philip)
February 27, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Christie, John)
February 26, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dell, Inc. (Mulvaney, Kevin)
February 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Dell, Inc.. (Mulvaney, Kevin)
February 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Mulvaney on behalf of Dell, Inc.. (Mulvaney, Kevin)
February 16, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Mulcahy, Patrick)
February 16, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick F. Mulcahy appearing on behalf of Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Mulcahy, Patrick)
February 14, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Samsung SDI America, Inc. served on 2/5/2018, answer due 2/26/2018. (Carroll, Philip)
February 14, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dell, Inc. served on 2/5/2018, answer due 2/26/2018. (Carroll, Philip)
February 2, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (Carroll, Philip)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6582802 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Illinois - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Texas. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Carroll, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Dell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin M. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John R. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Christie
Represented By: Kevin M. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T. Carroll
Represented By: Marisa L. Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Philip T. Carroll
Represented By: Marisa L. Saber
Represented By: Patrick F. Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?