National Labor Relations Board v. Enjoi Transportation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Defendant: Enjoi Transportation, LLC, Mr. Gregory Lynn and Ms. Paulette Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2018cv13597
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Marianne O Battani
2 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Gregory Lynn* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Lynn (corrected) by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Enjoi Transportation, LLC* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Enjoi Transportation, LLC (corrected) by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Paulette Hamilton* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paulette Hamilton (corrected) by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Enjoi Transportation, LLC, Paulette Hamilton, Gregory Lynn*. Reason: *Service Dates in Affidavit are incorrect* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Lynn by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paulette Hamilton by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Enjoi Transportation, LLC by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Enjoi Transportation, LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Paulette Hamilton served on 12/15/2018, answer due 1/7/2019; Gregory Lynn served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Thomas, Paul)
December 17, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 12/20/18 at 2:30 is Cancelled. (LVer)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Polly Misra on behalf of National Labor Relations Board. (Misra, Polly)
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Petitioner's counsel must initiate the call. (LVer)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Protective Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Alternate Service by National Labor Relations Board. (Thomas, Paul)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Protective Restraining Order by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Thomas, Paul)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
November 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Enjoi Transportation, LLC, Paulette Hamilton, Gregory Lynn* (SKra)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by National Labor Relations Board against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 18-mc-50994, Judge Roberts] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16) (Thomas, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Enjoi Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enjoi Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Gregory Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Paulette Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Paul A. Thomas
Represented By: Polly Misra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?