Fayad v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Ray Ahmed Fayad
Defendant: Ronald Dupuis, Michael Moore, Hamtramck, City of, Ecorse City of, Chester Logan, Yousef Dabaja, Anne Moise, Andrew Robinson, Michael Stout, James McMahon, Highland Park, City of, Gasper Fiore, Boulevard & Trumbull Towing, Inc. and Kelly Dupuis
Case Number: 2:2018cv13982
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Yousef Dabaja, Kelly Dupuis, Highland Park, City of, Chester Logan, James McMahon. (Clark, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Highland Park, City of (Clark, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K Chubb on behalf of Yousef Dabaja, Kelly Dupuis, Highland Park, City of, Chester Logan, James McMahon. (Chubb, Anthony)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Clark on behalf of Yousef Dabaja, Kelly Dupuis, Highland Park, City of, Chester Logan, James McMahon. (Clark, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Hamtramck, City of, Anne Moise, Andrew Robinson, Michael Stout. (Kalogerakos, Harry)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Kalogerakos on behalf of Hamtramck, City of, Anne Moise, Andrew Robinson, Michael Stout. (Kalogerakos, Harry)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) with Certificate of Service by Ecorse City of, Michael Moore. (Crow, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kelly Dupuis served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Arraf, Huwaida)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Crow on behalf of Ecorse City of, Michael Moore. (Crow, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathryn Bruner James appearing on behalf of Ray Ahmed Fayad (James, Kathryn)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Boulevard & Trumbull Towing, Inc.* (SOso)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Gasper Fiore* (SOso)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Kelly Dupuis* (SOso)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, by Ray Ahmed Fayad (Arraf, Huwaida)
January 8, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Ray Ahmed Fayad, Defendants Kelly Dupuis, Gasper Fiore, Boulevard & Trumbull Towing, Inc.. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing #4 Amended Document Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Arraf, Huwaida)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ray Ahmed Fayad served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Arraf, Huwaida)
December 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (ATee)
December 23, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ray Ahmed Fayad against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7039665 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: 3rd Judicial Circuit Court, 18-009396, Judge Sheila Gibson] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Arraf, Huwaida)
December 20, 2018 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Ray Ahmed Fayad, Defendants Michael Stout, Andrew Robinson, Anne Moise, Michael Moore, Yousef Dabaja, Ecorse City of, Highland Park, City of, Hamtramck, City of. Reason: Mistakenly created case without having finished adding defendants. (Arraf, Huwaida)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fayad v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Ahmed Fayad
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Kathryn Bruner James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Dupuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moore
Represented By: Michael D. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamtramck, City of
Represented By: Harry Kalogerakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecorse City of
Represented By: Michael D. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Logan
Represented By: Anthony K Chubb
Represented By: John C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yousef Dabaja
Represented By: Anthony K Chubb
Represented By: John C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Moise
Represented By: Harry Kalogerakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Robinson
Represented By: Harry Kalogerakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stout
Represented By: Harry Kalogerakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McMahon
Represented By: Anthony K Chubb
Represented By: John C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Park, City of
Represented By: Anthony K Chubb
Represented By: John C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gasper Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulevard & Trumbull Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Dupuis
Represented By: Anthony K Chubb
Represented By: John C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?