Allen et al v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Brandee Patrick, Terry Davis, Danisha Mathis, Berdella Strong, Siera Rodriguez, Amy Nowack, Jenny Baka, India Porter, Melany Byrd, Korey Parker, Sheila Shelton, Sharnethia Wells, Jennifer Kosal, Valerie Parks, Kimberly Parsley, Jasmin McGinnis, Malissa Williams, Lashondra Davis, Lutisha Tolbert, Kena Banks, Ashley Hoath, Carolyn Curry, Crystal Martin-Levier, Amanda Jenkins, Lasonia Whitehead, Jessica Cluesman, Corrine Baker, Angela Musselman, Misty Lemke, Retta Huggins, Karina Kuznicki, Carolyn Taylor, Shuron Beverly, Marsha Rutherford, Maria Carroll, Rita Walker, Annette Martin, Trina Wheatley, Mary Williams, Christina Platt, Peggy Allen, Tara Vallejo, Jennifer Fauble-Webb, Edith Turner, Amber Woodby, Yolanda Santana, Blanche Hayward, Georgette Campbell, Susan Price, Rewa Forest, Kelly Stock, Stacey Anderson, Kelly Smith, Rose Toodle-Lilly, Vairley Dunlap, Bridgette Gifford, Kim Staton, Tabatha Dawson, Lillian Roberts, Kimberly Wascher, Stacy Lantz, Dinisha Thompson, Ciara Byers, Kristen Fast, Yasmeen Campbell, Andreka Long, Rachel Edwards, Michelle Paad, Dominqua Pye, Annie Cole, Tonalynn Bernard, Chantel Easter, Chana Woods, Bernice Starks, Lawanda Hampton, Tiffany Woods, Brooke Lajiness, Wendy Hemmings, Sarah Hudson, Linda Flowers, Debra Starr, Vandera Varner, Beverly Sharpe, Patricia Plummer, Cournesha Manley, Sharon Davis, Julia Baragar, Andrea Holder, Megan Gort, Chanti Lattner, Alexis Welsh and Samantha Grigg
Defendant: Charles Jamsen, Bhamini Sudhir, Kristi Goehmann, Patricia Robinson, Heidi Washington, Jennifer Stillman, Jeffrey Bomber, Zandra Lyons, Officer Hinton, Katerine McKowell, Katie Guyor, Marcia Porter, RUM Jackson, James Blessman, Dr. James, Brenna Reichman, Robert Lacy, Subrina Aiken, Claire Pei, Donna Rohrs, Carmen McIntyre, Kayla Young-Troost, Anthony Stewart, Richard D. Russell, James Hill, Lieutenant Keys, Grievance Coordinator Awasung, Jamil Shabayta, Shawn Brewer, Kristina Fisher, PC Shilding, Tonya Allen, Keith Barber, Catherine Ozor, Rickey Coleman, Kelly Lichner, Joel Kaptich, Hope Webb, Sunhwa Choi, Dr. Qin, Wendy Hibbits, Robin Howard, Kristyn Fiorini, Voncha Henderson, Alice Pemrose, Richard Harbaugh, Brianna Lagrow, Michael Henderson, Dr. Bergman, Latasha Boa, Joseph Kummer, Deputy Warden Smith, Pamela Olmstead, Adam Zwolensky, Joseph Treppa, D. Jones, Corizon Health, Inc., Bryant Tinsley, Kimberly Valdez, Jessica Lopez, Jennifer Borso, Angela J. Witter and Shanequa Owens
Case Number: 2:2019cv11837
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Blessman served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. RUM Jackson served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kayla Young-Troost served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Angela J. Witter served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Keith Barber served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pamela Olmstead served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wendy Hibbits served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kristyn Fiorini served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristie Ann Sparks on behalf of Subrina Aiken, Tonya Allen, Grievance Coordinator Awasung, Latasha Boa, Jennifer Borso, Shawn Brewer, Kristina Fisher, Kristi Goehmann, Katie Guyor, Richard Harbaugh, Voncha Henderson, James Hill, Officer Hinton, Robin Howard, D. Jones, Joel Kaptich, Lieutenant Keys, Joseph Kummer, Brianna Lagrow, Kelly Lichner, Jessica Lopez, Zandra Lyons, Shanequa Owens, Catherine Ozor, Marcia Porter, Patricia Robinson, Richard D. Russell, Jamil Shabayta, Deputy Warden Smith, Anthony Stewart, Jennifer Stillman, Bryant Tinsley, Joseph Treppa, Kimberly Valdez, Heidi Washington, Hope Webb, Adam Zwolensky. (Sparks, Kristie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Sunhwa Choi, Katerine McKowell (Chapman, Ronald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Dr. James, Robert Lacy (Chapman, Ronald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Donna Rohrs, Bhamini Sudhir (Chapman, Ronald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Chapman on behalf of Dr. Bergman, Jeffrey Bomber, Rickey Coleman, Charles Jamsen, Claire Pei, Alice Pemrose, Dr. Qin, Brenna Reichman. (Chapman, Ronald)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Staying Case. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Mertens on behalf of Subrina Aiken, Tonya Allen, Grievance Coordinator Awasung, Latasha Boa, Jennifer Borso, Shawn Brewer, Kristina Fisher, Kristi Goehmann, Katie Guyor, Richard Harbaugh, Voncha Henderson, James Hill, Officer Hinton, Robin Howard, D. Jones, Joel Kaptich, Lieutenant Keys, Joseph Kummer, Brianna Lagrow, Kelly Lichner, Jessica Lopez, Zandra Lyons, Shanequa Owens, Catherine Ozor, Marcia Porter, Patricia Robinson, Richard D. Russell, Jamil Shabayta, Deputy Warden Smith, Anthony Stewart, Jennifer Stillman, Bryant Tinsley, Joseph Treppa, Kimberly Valdez, Heidi Washington, Hope Webb, Adam Zwolensky. (Mertens, Scott)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Subrina Aiken waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Tonya Allen waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Grievance Coordinator Awasung waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Latasha Boa waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Jennifer Borso waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Shawn Brewer waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kristina Fisher waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kristi Goehmann waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Katie Guyor waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Richard Harbaugh waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Voncha Henderson waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; James Hill waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Officer Hinton waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Robin Howard waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; D. Jones waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Joel Kaptich waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Lieutenant Keys waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Joseph Kummer waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Brianna Lagrow waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kelly Lichner waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Jessica Lopez waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Zandra Lyons waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Shanequa Owens waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Catherine Ozor waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Marcia Porter waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Patricia Robinson waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Richard D. Russell waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Jamil Shabayta waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Deputy Warden Smith waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Anthony Stewart waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Jennifer Stillman waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Bryant Tinsley waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Joseph Treppa waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kimberly Valdez waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Heidi Washington waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Hope Webb waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Adam Zwolensky waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Mertens, Scott)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Corizon Health, Inc. (Chapman, Ronald)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Chapman on behalf of Corizon Health, Inc.. (Chapman, Ronald)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint, MI to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts in Detroit, MI. (ATee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith L. Altman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Altman, Keith)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline M. Sinkovich on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sinkovich, Madeline)
June 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Subrina Aiken, Tonya Allen, Grievance Coordinator Awasung, Keith Barber, Dr. Bergman, James Blessman, Latasha Boa, Jeffrey Bomber, Jennifer Borso, Shawn Brewer, Sunhwa Choi, Rickey Coleman, Corizon Health, Inc., Kristyn Fiorini, Kristina Fisher, Kristi Goehmann, Katie Guyor, Richard Harbaugh, Michael Henderson, Voncha Henderson, Wendy Hibbits, James Hill, Officer Hinton, Robin Howard, RUM Jackson, Dr. James, Charles Jamsen, D. Jones, Joel Kaptich, Lieutenant Keys, Joseph Kummer, Robert Lacy, Brianna Lagrow, Kelly Lichner, Jessica Lopez, Zandra Lyons, Carmen McIntyre, Katerine McKowell, Pamela Olmstead, Shanequa Owens, Catherine Ozor, Claire Pei, Alice Pemrose, Marcia Porter, Dr. Qin, Brenna Reichman, Patricia Robinson, Donna Rohrs, Richard D. Russell, Jamil Shabayta, PC Shilding, Deputy Warden Smith, Anthony Stewart, Jennifer Stillman, Bhamini Sudhir, Bryant Tinsley, Joseph Treppa, Kimberly Valdez, Heidi Washington, Hope Webb, Angela J. Witter, Kayla Young-Troost, Adam Zwolensky* (SKra)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7292489 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cv-10707, Judge Victoria A. Roberts] (Radner, Solomon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jamsen
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhamini Sudhir
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Goehmann
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Robinson
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Stillman
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bomber
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zandra Lyons
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hinton
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katerine McKowell
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Guyor
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Porter
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUM Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Blessman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenna Reichman
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lacy
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subrina Aiken
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Pei
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Rohrs
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Young-Troost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Stewart
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Russell
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hill
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Keys
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Coordinator Awasung
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamil Shabayta
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Brewer
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Fisher
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PC Shilding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Allen
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Ozor
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Coleman
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Lichner
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Kaptich
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Webb
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunhwa Choi
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Qin
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Hibbits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Howard
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristyn Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voncha Henderson
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Pemrose
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harbaugh
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Lagrow
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bergman
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Boa
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kummer
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Smith
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Zwolensky
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Treppa
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jones
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Tinsley
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Valdez
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Lopez
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Borso
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela J. Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanequa Owens
Represented By: Scott A. Mertens
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandee Patrick
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Davis
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danisha Mathis
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berdella Strong
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siera Rodriguez
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Nowack
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Baka
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India Porter
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melany Byrd
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Parker
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Shelton
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharnethia Wells
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kosal
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Parks
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Parsley
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin McGinnis
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Williams
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashondra Davis
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutisha Tolbert
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kena Banks
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hoath
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Curry
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Martin-Levier
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Jenkins
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasonia Whitehead
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cluesman
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrine Baker
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Musselman
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Lemke
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retta Huggins
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Kuznicki
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuron Beverly
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Rutherford
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carroll
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Walker
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Martin
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Wheatley
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Platt
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Allen
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Vallejo
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fauble-Webb
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Turner
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Woodby
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Santana
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Hayward
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette Campbell
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Price
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rewa Forest
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Stock
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Anderson
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Smith
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Toodle-Lilly
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vairley Dunlap
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Gifford
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Staton
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Dawson
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Roberts
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wascher
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Lantz
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinisha Thompson
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciara Byers
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Fast
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmeen Campbell
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreka Long
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Edwards
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Paad
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominqua Pye
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Cole
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonalynn Bernard
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Easter
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chana Woods
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Starks
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Hampton
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Woods
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Lajiness
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Hemmings
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hudson
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Flowers
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Starr
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vandera Varner
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Sharpe
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Plummer
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cournesha Manley
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Davis
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Baragar
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Holder
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Gort
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanti Lattner
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Welsh
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Grigg
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Represented By: Madeline M. Sinkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?