Walker v. Macomb County et al
Plaintiff: Larry Londra Walker
Defendant: Stephaine Stager, City of Warren, Ronald Laszczak, Eric J. Smith, David Michelis, William Cataldo, Elaine M. Vazza, E.T. Viars, Patric Coletta, Macomb County, Christopher Livingston and Adil Haradvala
Case Number: 2:2019cv12507
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Londra Walker (SOso)
October 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #12 Judgment on Larry Londra Walker Pris. No. 747025, Earnest C Brooks Correctional Facility, 2500 S Sheridan Dr, Muskegon Heights, MI 49444-2600 (JCur)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Planitiff. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Londra Walker (NAhm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Prisoner Account Activity by Larry Londra Walker. (NAhm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Document filed re Addition of parties by Larry Walker. (NAhm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to amend #1 Complaint by Larry Londra Walker. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for stay of proceedings by Larry Londra Walker. (DPer)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Larry Londra Walker. (DPer)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 10/18/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Larry Londra Walker. (LGra)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Macomb County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephaine Stager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Laszczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine M. Vazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.T. Viars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patric Coletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adil Haradvala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Londra Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?