Dicken v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Kristi Dicken
Defendant: John Doe, Jeremy Bush, Wellman and Westbrook
Case Number: 2:2020cv10991
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
June 2, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen pursuant to Administrative Order. (SSch)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Jeremy Bush, Wellman, Westbrook* (SKra)
May 15, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Rasor, James)
April 22, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00315.
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from miwd on 4/22/2020.]
April 22, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Shawn Dicken in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5146133 (Rasor, James) [Transferred from miwd on 4/22/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with jury demand against Jeremy Bush, Unknown Party, Unknown Wellman, Unknown Westbrook filed by Shawn Dicken (Rasor, James) Modified text on 4/10/2020 (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00315.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicken v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Kristi Dicken
Represented By: James B. Rasor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?