Spearman v. Heyns et al
Plaintiff: Rufus Spearman
Defendant: Mark Machulis, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11558
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on Rufus Spearman Pris. No. 320836 at 8585 N. CROSWELL RD., ST. LOUIS, MI 48880. (EBut)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Response to Motion by Mark Machulis, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Sparks, Kristie) Modified on 7/31/2020 (TTho). [EXHIBITS NOT LEGIBLE]
July 30, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #15 Order on Rufus Spearman Pris. No. 320836 at 8585 N. CROSWELL RD., ST. LOUIS, MI 48880. (EBut)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
July 29, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order on Rufus Spearman Pris. No. 320836 at 8585 N. CROSWELL RD., ST. LOUIS, MI 48880. (EBut)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rufus Spearman (SSch)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rufus Spearman. (SSch)
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Material Questions of Fact by Rufus Spearman (SSch)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of Dispute by Rufus Spearman (SSch)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by Rufus Spearman (SSch)
June 22, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Kristie Ann Sparks re #8 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Machulis, Sr (Sparks, Kristie) Modified on 6/22/2020 (LGra).
June 18, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Rufus Spearman Pris. No. 320836 at 8585 N. Crosswell Road, St. Louis, MI 48880. (MLan)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand including #6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Machulis, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Sparks, Kristie)
June 12, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 2:15-cv-00015.
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk) [Transferred from miwd on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MANDATE of USCA re appeal 160 Mandate issued with no costs taxed (mlc) [Transferred from miwd on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Barney, Catherine S. Bauman, Unknown Bohm, Unknown Bowerman, Unknown Cobb, C. Deatsman, Jill Denman, Unknown Fielding, D. Gerth, R. Harris, Unknown Henley, Daniel H. Heyns, Unknown Heyrman, Unknown Hoffman, Unknown Holman, B. Hursch, Unknown Immel, Unknown Jaykka, Cheri Konrad, Unknown Kurth, J. Lancour, Dan Lesatz, Tammi Lindenmuth, R. Livermore, Mark Machulis, Sr, L. Maki, Unknown Mattson, Unknown Miles, L. Miron, K. Nelson, Unknown Nietzel, D. Norman, Unknown O'Dell, Unknown Palomaki, Unknown Parkilla, Unknown Perala, Unknown Price, Loyd W. Rapelje, Unknown Ross, Richard D. Russell, Unknown Rutter, T. Salo, Unknown Schertz, Scott Sprader, Unknown Thoma, W. Trierweiler, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Unknown Vanderscheagan, Unknown Weberg, Unknown Wilkins, O. T. Winn, Unknown Young, J. Zummer, Access Secure Pak, Alger, County of, Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1, JPay filed by Rufus L. Spearman #320836 (Attachments: #1 Attachment F - Claims for Relief) (mlc) Modified text on 5/12/2015 (mlc). [Transferred from miwd on 6/12/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Rufus L. Spearman #320836(mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 2:15-cv-00015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spearman v. Heyns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Machulis, Sr.
Represented By: Kristie Ann Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?