Deluca v. LG Chem America, Inc
Plaintiff: Dennis Deluca
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc and LG Chem, Ltd
Case Number: 2:2021cv11241
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem America, Inc. (Higgins, Sean)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Dennis Deluca. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from LG Chem, Ltd. and Subsidiary Financial Statements, #3 Exhibit Dank Shop Website with Battery for Sale, #4 Exhibit Berven v LG Chem Case, #5 Exhibit Orders Denying Motions to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Internet Warning 1, #7 Exhibit Internet Warning 2, #8 Exhibit Proposed Jurisdictional Discovery) (Doherty, Paul)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Dennis Deluca. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from LG Chem, Ltd. and Subsidiary Financial Statements, #3 Exhibit LGCAI LinkedIn, #4 Exhibit Dank Shop Website with Battery for Sale, #5 Exhibit Berven v LG Chem Case, #6 Index of Exhibits Orders Denying Motions to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit Internet Warning 1, #8 Exhibit Internet Warning 2, #9 Index of Exhibits Proposed Jurisdictional Discovery) (Doherty, Paul)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (AChu)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LG Chem, Ltd identifying Corporate Parent LG Corp. for LG Chem, Ltd. (Higgins, Sean)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION by Kiwon Choi re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem, Ltd (Higgins, Sean)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by LG Chem, Ltd. (Higgins, Sean)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem America, Inc. Response due by 7/7/2021 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by LG Chem America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Higgins, Sean)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LG Chem America, Inc identifying Corporate Parent LG Chem, Ltd. for LG Chem America, Inc. (Higgins, Sean)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Chem America, Inc from Livingston County Michigan Circuit Court, case number 21-31021-NP. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8478995 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Higgins, #2 Exhibit A) (Higgins, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deluca v. LG Chem America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Deluca
Represented By: Paul F. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc
Represented By: Sean M Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Represented By: Sean M Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?