Payne v. Broadworth et al
Plaintiff: James U. Payne
Defendant: Broadworth, Silveus, Stoetzel, Panonne, Miller, Townley, Conley, Anderson, Serbantez and T. Anderson
Case Number: 2:2022cv12574
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for T. Anderson, Broadworth, Conley, Miller, Panonne, Serbantez, Silveus, Stoetzel, Townley. (DPer)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on James U. Payne,213 E. Robinson St., Jackson MI 49203 (KSan)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (JOwe)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Service Documents Received (JOwe)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction re 7 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (KSan)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice of Correction, #10 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on James U. Payne,213 E. Robinson St., Jackson, MI 49203 (KSan)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 7 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #8 Directing Service by the US Marshal on James U. Payne,213 E. Robinson St.,Jackson, MI 49203 (KSan)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by James U. Payne. (NAhm)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Dkt. #2 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on James U. Payne, 213 E. Robinson St., Jackson, MI 49203 (KSan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by James U. Payne. (TTho)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James U. Payne against All Defendants (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Broadworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James U. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silveus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serbantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?