Baltrusaitis et al v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Baltrusaitis, Guillermo Antunez, Patrick Barth, Richard Broecker, Ryan Budek, Tuyen Chu, Darryl Craig, Satish Doshi, John Fletcher, JON HUTCHINSON, Alan Jarzembowski, Frank Kotsonis, Sandra Lange, Arthur Laurin, Kevin Luczak, Tim Mauro-Vetter, Reginald McIntyre, Carl Oberndorfer, Jerome Peacock, Ejaz Rahman, Charlie Rickman, Mark Rosinski, Greg Ryntz, Michael Savosky, Brian Schiffman, Fred Schnell, Mark Skelly, Gregory Skonieczny, Lisa Sowinski, Suraj Tandon, Chance Tess, James Viriglio, Brian Warda, Corey Watkins, Danny Woodruff, Harold Wright, JOHN ZELL and James Ziemianski
Defendant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC, Alphons Iacobelli, Jerome Durden, Michael Brown, Gary Jones, Dennis Williams, Norwood Jewell, Virdell King, Keith Mickens, FCA US, LLC and Chrysler Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv10861
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Shea on behalf of Virdell King. (Shea, John)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Norwood Jewell. (TTho)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER RE #27 Motion for Clarification of the Court's #21 May 4, 2023 Order. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norwood Jewell served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Levi, Robert)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Virdell King served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Levi, Robert)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jerome Durden served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Levi, Robert)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint MOTION re #21 Stipulation and Order, Order to Extend Time to (Free) Clarify the Court's May 4, 2023 Order by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Oppenheimer, Elisabeth)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Nedelman on behalf of Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gary Jones served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Levi, Robert)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Alphons Iacobelli waiver sent on 5/7/2023, answer due 7/6/2023. (Myers, Kenneth)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Dennis Williams waiver sent on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Myers, Kenneth)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bertram L. Marks appearing on behalf of Michael Brown (Marks, Bertram)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS UAW AND FCA US LLC'S TIME TO ANSWER #1 COMPLAINT. (Response due by 5/30/2023). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Brown waiver sent on 4/18/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Myers, Kenneth)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. FCA US, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Myers, Kenneth)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Keith Mickens waiver sent on 4/21/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Myers, Kenneth)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Plaintiffs. (Myers, Kenneth) Modified on 4/24/2023 (SSch). [WAIVER IS FOR FCA US, LLC. See de #19 ]
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Cohen, Jacob)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Marie Jordan on behalf of FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Jordan, Julia)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Holley on behalf of FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Holley, Steven)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (f/k/a Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.) for FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Schwartz on behalf of FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC. (Schwartz, Brian)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Macey on behalf of International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Macey, Edward)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [STRICKEN - DOCUMENT CONTAINS FILLABLE FIELDS] NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Macey on behalf of International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Macey, Edward) Modified on 4/18/2023 (DPer).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael Brown, Jerome Durden, FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC, John Fletcher, Alphons Iacobelli, Norwood Jewell, Gary Jones, Virdell King, Keith Mickens, Dennis Williams* (DPer)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America served on 4/14/2023, answer due 5/5/2023. (Levi, Robert)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of error directed to Edward A. Macey re #9 Notice of Appearance. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Michael Brown, Jerome Durden, FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC, Alphons Iacobelli, Norwood Jewell, Gary Jones, Virdell King, Keith Mickens, Dennis Williams. (Levi, Robert)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Karabell on behalf of International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Karabell, Jacob)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Oppenheimer on behalf of International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Oppenheimer, Elisabeth)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth D. Myers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Myers, Kenneth)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth D. Myers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Myers, Kenneth)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Levi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Levi, Robert)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2023-199599-NZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9312452 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 3:20-cv-12793-RHC-RSW, Judge Robert H. Cleland] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Oppenheimer, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltrusaitis et al v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Baltrusaitis
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Antunez
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Barth
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Broecker
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Budek
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuyen Chu
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Craig
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satish Doshi
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fletcher
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON HUTCHINSON
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Jarzembowski
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Kotsonis
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lange
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Laurin
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Luczak
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Mauro-Vetter
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald McIntyre
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Oberndorfer
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Peacock
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ejaz Rahman
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Rickman
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rosinski
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Ryntz
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Savosky
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Schiffman
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Schnell
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Skelly
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Skonieczny
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sowinski
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suraj Tandon
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance Tess
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Viriglio
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Warda
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Watkins
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Woodruff
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Wright
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ZELL
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ziemianski
Represented By: Kenneth D. Myers
Represented By: Robert L. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Represented By: Edward A. Macey
Represented By: Jacob Karabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC, f/k/a Chrysler Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphons Iacobelli
Represented By: Michael A. Nedelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Durden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Represented By: Bertram L. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virdell King
Represented By: John A. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Mickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Brian M. Schwartz
Represented By: Julia Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Brian M. Schwartz
Represented By: Julia Marie Jordan
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?