Franklin v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Gary Thomas Franklin
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and Joseph Gasper
Case Number: 3:2019cv12960
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
2 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
3 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gary Thomas Franklin. (NAhm)
October 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order to Show Cause on Gary Thomas Franklin at 167 Evelyn, Kalamazoo, MI 49001. (LWag)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Gary Thomas Franklin to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2019 Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Port Huron. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00365.
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #7 motion and transferring action to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) [Transferred from miwd on 10/9/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Joseph Gasper, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Gary Thomas Franklin (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00365.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Thomas Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gasper
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?