Rumsey #222119 et al v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Charles Earnest Rumsey #222119, Jr., Herschel R. Davis #163765, Jr., Steven D. Cohrs #156447, Timothy D. Hollon #277005, Morris Q. Mccord, Jr., Leo E. Niezgoda #232177, Jr. and Warder L. Barnes #623207
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections, Mary Berghuis, Carole Aardsma, Rick Smith, Sheryl D'Epifanio, Mark Sutherby, Raymond Swierenga, Shirlee Harry, Michael Singleton, Sharon Walker and Sharon Wells
Case Number: 1:2010cv00880
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Muskegon
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Carmody
Presiding Judge: Janet T. Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 113 ; denying objections 115 ; granting renewed motion for summary judgment 104 ; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 83 ; the Objections 87 , 89 are denied; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Barnes and Plaintiff Davis 53 is granted; the Motion for Summary Judgment 72 is gr anted in part and denied in part; Defendants may file an appropriate motion(s) to renew their motion for summary judgment; the Opinion and Order is amended only with regard to the disposition ordered; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 83 ; the Objections 87 , 89 are denied; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Barnes and Plaintiff Davis 53 is granted; the Motion for Summary Judgment 72 is granted in part and denied in part; Defendants may file an appropriate motion(s) to renew their motion for summary judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 37 ; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment 34 is granted in part and denied in part; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumsey #222119 et al v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Earnest Rumsey #222119, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herschel R. Davis #163765, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Cohrs #156447
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. Hollon #277005
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Q. Mccord, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo E. Niezgoda #232177, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warder L. Barnes #623207
Represented By: Ernest L. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Berghuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Aardsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl D'Epifanio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sutherby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Swierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirlee Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?