International Paper Company v. Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP et al
Plaintiff: International Paper Company
Defendant: NCR Corporation, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP and Weyerhaeuser Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01229
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting STIPULATION #17 staying time to answer complaint, cross-claims and counterclaim pending appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by All Parties Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint, Cross-Claims and Counterclaim by defendant NCR Corporation (McAtee, Darin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in support of MOTION to stay #7 ("Defendant NCR Corporation's Response in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Stay") filed by NCR Corporation (McAtee, Darin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ("Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest") by NCR Corporation identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Corporation, Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group, L.P., Other Affiliate Appvion, Inc., Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, Other Affiliate B.A.T Industries PLC for NCR Corporation (McAtee, Darin)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Darin P. McAtee on behalf of defendant NCR Corporation (McAtee, Darin)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter A. Smit on behalf of cross-defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, counter-claimants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Smit, Peter)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jan M Conlin on behalf of cross-defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, counter-claimants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Conlin, Jan)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of George P. Sibley on behalf of cross-defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, counter-claimants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Sibley, George)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Douglas M. Garrou on behalf of cross-defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, counter-claimants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Garrou, Douglas)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against International Paper and Crossclaims against NCR and Weyerhaeuser filed by Georgia-Pacific LLC, Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP (Shebelskie, Michael) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (jlg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Shebelskie, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koch Industries, Inc. for Fort James Corporation, Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Shebelskie, Michael)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael Randolph Shebelskie on behalf of cross-defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC (Shebelskie, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Fischbach, Ryan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, NCR Corporation, Weyerhaeuser Company (mg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Parker, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff International Paper Company, counter-defendant International Paper Company re Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , complaint #1 , MOTION to stay #7 (Parker, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to stay by plaintiff International Paper Company, counter-defendant International Paper Company; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff International Paper Company's Motion to Stay, #2 Certification Regarding Motion Concurrence) (Parker, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Paper Company (Parker, John)
November 6, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Margaret C. Hupp on behalf of counter-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, cross-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Hupp, Margaret)
November 6, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James C. Baird on behalf of counter-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, cross-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Baird, James)
November 6, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark William Schneider on behalf of counter-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, cross-claimant Weyerhaeuser Company, defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Schneider, Mark)
November 6, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Georgia-Pacific LLC, NCR Corporation, Weyerhaeuser Company (none provided) (mg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weyerhaeuser Company (Watson, Scott)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses , CROSSCLAIM against NCR Corporation, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Fort James Corporation, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP , COUNTERCLAIM against International Paper Company by Weyerhaeuser Company (Watson, Scott)
November 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John F. Cermak on behalf of plaintiff International Paper Company (Cermak, John)
November 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sonja A. Inglin on behalf of plaintiff International Paper Company (Inglin, Sonja)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:11-cv-483 (jlb)
November 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David W. Centner on behalf of plaintiff International Paper Company (Centner, David)
November 1, 2018 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4280766; for civil filing fee (jlb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by International Paper Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Paper Company v. Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCR Corporation
Represented By: Darin P. McAtee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jan M Conlin
Represented By: George P. Sibley
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael Randolph Shebelskie
Represented By: Peter A. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort James Corporation
Represented By: Jan M Conlin
Represented By: George P. Sibley
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael Randolph Shebelskie
Represented By: Peter A. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP
Represented By: Jan M Conlin
Represented By: George P. Sibley
Represented By: Douglas M. Garrou
Represented By: Michael Randolph Shebelskie
Represented By: Peter A. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Represented By: James C. Baird
Represented By: Scott Michael Watson
Represented By: Mark William Schneider
Represented By: Margaret C. Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Paper Company
Represented By: John Daniel Parker
Represented By: David W. Centner
Represented By: Sonja A. Inglin
Represented By: John F. Cermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?