Smith et al v. Kellogg Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Bouchard, Alice Donovan, Frank Pimental, Johnny Padgett, Kenneth Henrick, Michael Gaddy, Jonathan Jakubiak, Andrew Lescinsky, Albert Byrd, Jr., Jeff Elia, Ralph Alexander, Todd Bruck, Bryan Malone, Greg Snider, Kenneth Baker, Brian Smith, Melody English, Linda Giguere, David Barnes, Scotty Poarch, Shannon K Webb, Deborah A Schutt, Daniel Becker, Brian Feeley, John Theodore, Larry Knab, Richard E. Carns, Mark Schanzenbach, Timothy W Siegrist, Barbara McGinnis, Kathy Black, Justin Van Wyk, Richard Bush, Sean Fefie, Tammy Brewer, William Callaway, James L Lowery, James C Keillor, Haniel Santiago, Elizabeth LaMasse, Theresa M. Sozzo, Marcus Mason, Keith Rulka, William Vehlewald, David C. Prohow, James D. Hess, Jamie Phillips, David C. Phillips, Daniel P Muesenfechter, Roseann Miracola, Robert Graham, Razza Oreste, Kimberly A Gilford, Ronald Eibner, Kelly-Anne Tremper, Charles Aaron Gee, Jim Hoos, Christian Sanchez, John F Ahart, Renato Linsangan, Maurizio Dolce, David W Phillips, Amanda Surko, Daniel Ramseth, David Fletcher, Bryan M. Duntz, Mark LaRue, Darrell Godbee, Kenneth R Leather, Andrew Brown, Kevin W. Johnson, Joseph Markiewicz, John Sloan, Cynthia Daniels, Cyndi Watson, Jason C. Trahan, Philip Talento, Shelley Goddard, Billy Roberts, David Whelan, Kyle Leikam, Alfreda Gatewood, Terrie Steele, Brian Heber, Sheila Simpson, Paul Turner, Albert Boudreaux, Timothy Altman, Donald A Malmgren, Jeffrey M. Sitarek, Rich Mag, John Furby, Carman Payne, Amy Spadaro, Scott Chwascinski, Carlada Christian, Darrell Parrish, John Schmidt, Roger Pillitteri, Lance Turner, Jesus Varela, Jay J. Ammer, Michael J. Shirey, Jennifer L Holman, Tina M Krycia, Charles Williamson, Shenodh Yousef, Raymond Kwan, Mark Young, Dylan Harris, Joseph Berres, Jeffrey J. Curley, John Apostolou, Donald Aubrey, Travis M Anderson, Donald H Link, Raudel Medina, Matthew Smith, Douglas C Merrill, Dorothy E Soppleland, Mark Heger, Philip J. Gluszak, Kenneth D Uder, Patrick Sullivan, Kristy Bond, Keith Young, Lonnie Williams, Daniel Reller, Chad Brooks, Logan J. Hartman, Thoetis L. Ramsey, Ralph Barrish, Brian J Bloom, Lauren Miller Reeves, Regina Coshatt, Andy Alvarado, Carl R Haas, Robert Nichols, Mario Espaillat, Joseph Simao, Brian A Mack, Mary C. Keeley, Gregory Ratliff, Natalie Leatherwood, Felix Gregory, Dustan Gill, Gary Feeney, Charles R. Sewell, Terri L. Saunders, William H Sing and Richard Abbott
Defendant: Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01341
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #241 sent via U.S. Mail to Christiana L. Signs (jlg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 242 MOTION to stay re #227 Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification to Facilitate a Limited Period of Class Discovery by defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.1(d), #4 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.3(b), #5 Certificate of Service) (Boudreau, James)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 2/20/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 240 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Boudreau, James)
January 24, 2019 Copy of Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement #239 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Christiana L. Signs (ems)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER that Defendants Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE re #148 , #169 of Withdrawal of Consent to Sues by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 237 DECLARATION re #227 of Lesley Tse in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 236 DECLARATION re #227 of William Vehlewald in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 235 DECLARATION re #227 of Amy Spadaro in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 234 DECLARATION re #227 of Brian Smith in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 233 DECLARATION re #227 of Mark Young in Support by plaintiff Mark Young (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 232 DECLARATION re #227 of Scotty Poarch in Support by plaintiff Scotty Poarch (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 231 DECLARATION re #227 of Roseman Miracola in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 230 DECLARATION re #227 of Raudel Medina in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 229 DECLARATION re #227 of Kevin Johnson in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Certify Class #227 filed by Brian Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed FLSA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - 496 P. Proposed Pretrial Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - 65 D. ANSWER, #4 Exhibit 4 - 133-5 Exhibit Bussell Declaration and Attachments, #5 Exhibit 5 - Holton Dep, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bussell Dep, #7 Exhibit 7 - Groulx Dep, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pennington Dep, #9 Exhibit 9 - Workload Itinerary, #10 Exhibit 10 - Proposed Post Card Reminder) (Dunn, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 227 MOTION to certify class and to Issue Notice by plaintiff Brian Smith; (Dunn, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 226 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #209 with affirmative defenses by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Boudreau, James) Modified text and filers on 1/11/2019 (ems).
January 9, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Katherine Smith Kennedy on behalf of plaintiffs Brian Smith, Roseann Miracola, Scotty Poarch, Mark Young (Kennedy, Katherine) Modified text per request of attorney via ECF HelpDesk call on 1/9/2019 (ems).
January 8, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lesley Ann Tse on behalf of plaintiffs Roseann Miracola, Scotty Poarch, Brian Smith, Mark Young (Tse, Lesley)
January 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Feeney on behalf of defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Feeney, Brian)
January 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradly A. Nankerville on behalf of defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Nankerville, Bradly)
January 7, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue by plaintiff Brian Smith (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent to Sue) (Dunn, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE re #161 , #106 , #173 , #168 , #148 , #119 , #172 , #154 of Withdrawals of Consent to Sue by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (ems).
December 20, 2018 ATTORNEY James M. Nelson ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (lep)
December 20, 2018 ATTORNEY James N. Boudreau ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (lep)
December 19, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Gabroy and Scarborough) by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Sweeney and Dumas) by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #221 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Christian James Gabroy, Jeff Martin Scarborough, Alex David Dumas, Michael J.D. Sweeney, Christina L. Signs, James Norman Boudreau, James M. Nelson (ems)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #218 motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading; deadline extended to 1/10/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 220 RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead #218 filed by Brian Smith, Mark Young, Scotty Poarch, Roseann Miracola (Dunn, Matthew) Modified text and filers on 12/18/2018 (ems).
December 18, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Meagan Maureen Rafferty on behalf of plaintiffs Roseann Miracola, Scotty Poarch, Brian Smith, Mark Young (Rafferty, Meagan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 219 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead #218 filed by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Richards, John)
December 17, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead by defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Richards, John)
December 14, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John R. Richards on behalf of defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Richards, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 217 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney James M. Nelson; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 216 (DISREGARD) ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Tami D. Cowden; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems) Modified text on 12/11/2018; attorney termed per her request (kvt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 215 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney James Norman Boudreau; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 214 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Christiana L. Signs; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 213 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Michael J.D. Sweeney; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 212 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Alex David Dumas; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 211 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Jeff Martin Scarborough; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 210 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Christian James Gabroy; attorney admission deadline set for 1/2/2019; (ems)
December 4, 2018 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #208 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Christian James Gabroy, Jeff Martin Scarborough, Alex David Dumas, Michael J.D. Sweeney, Christina L. Signs, James Norman Boudreau, Tami D. Cowden, James M. Nelson (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 208 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
December 3, 2018 Filing 209 AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed per Order #206 ) against All Defendants filed by Roseann Miracola, Scotty Poarch, Brian Smith, Mark Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smith Signed Consent to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Miracola Signed Consent to Sue, #3 Exhibit C - Poarch Signed Consent to Sue, #4 Exhibit D - Young Signed Consent to Sue, #5 Exhibit E - Smith Paystub (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F - Miracola Paystub (Redacted), #7 Exhibit G - Poarch Paystub (Redacted), #8 Exhibit H - Young Paystubs (Redacted)) (mla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 207 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Nevada, their case number 2:17-cv-01914; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (mla)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting #183 Second Motion to Amend. Defendants' #196 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is Granted. Plaintiff's #185 Motion to Transfer is Granted. The claims of all Plaintiffs are TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Michigan. The clerk of the court shall transfer the case to that district and close this file. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE re #98 Notice; #124 Notice; filed by Timothy Altman, Robert Nichols. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Lauren Miller Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE re #125 Notice, #172 Notice, #106 Notice, #21 Notice, #94 Notice; filed by Alfreda Gatewood, Tina M Krycia, Kyle Leikam, William H Sing, David Whelan. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consents to Sue by Brian Smith re #18 Notice (Other), #137 Notice (Other). (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE re #84 Notice, #134 Notice, #173 Notice, #154 Notice, #87 Notice, #155 Notice, #94 Notice; filed by Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE re #156 Notice, #30 Notice, #175 Notice, #148 Notice; filed by Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 199 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Violation of the Local Rules as to document #198 . Attorney Action Required - Document #198 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Matthew Dunn. Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. Attorney Matthew Dunn is advised to refile document #198 and properly link the document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Document #198 terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 198 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Matthew Dunn. CORRECTION: Attorney advise to refile document #198 pursuant to the local rules regarding electronic filing. NOTICE; filed by Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) Document #198 is terminated as filed in error on 10/12/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 197 RESPONSE to #196 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 196 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re #195 Reply; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to #185 Motion to Change Venue, #183 Motion,, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 194 RESPONSE to #185 Motion to Change Venue by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 193 RESPONSE to #183 Motion,, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Replies due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daryl Nisenson) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 192 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 R 1st Amended Response to Demand for Arb, #2 Exhibit 2 Claimant's Response to Kellogg's Counterclaims, Supplemental Retaliation Claim) (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #190 Notice (Other),,,, by Plaintiffs Richard Abbott, Ralph Alexander, Travis M Anderson, David Barnes, Albert Boudreaux, William Callaway, Richard E. Carns, Scott Chwascinski, Ronald Eibner, Gary Feeney, Robert Graham, Logan J. Hartman, Brian Heber, James Hess, Andrew Lescinsky, Raudel Medina, Darrell Parrish, Billy Roberts, Christian Sanchez, Terri L. Saunders, Mark Schanzenbach, Michael J. Shirey, Terrie Steele, Patrick Sullivan, Amanda Surko, Lance Turner, Paul Turner, William Vehlewald, Lonnie Williams. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 190 VIEW Corrected Image #191 as to NOTICE re #125 Notice, #81 Notice, #159 Notice, #108 Notice, #19 Notice, #153 Notice, #21 Notice, #161 Notice, #148 Notice , #20 Notice, #146 Notice, #166 Notice, #101 Notice , #143 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #135 Notice, #82 Notice (Other), #138 Notice, #157 Notice, #73 Notice, #74 Notice, #156 Notice, #72 Notice, #28 Notice, #106 Notice, #158 Notice, #132 Notice, #162 Notice , #170 Notice; filed by Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) Modified on 9/14/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Denying Defendants' #187 Emergency Motion to Enforce Stay and to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiff's #183 Motion to Amend and #185 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 188 RESPONSE to #187 Motion to Enforce, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Email Correspondence) (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 187 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Stay Pending Arbitration By Striking Plaintiffs Unauthorized Motions For Leave To Amend Complaint And To Transfer Venue And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support re #121 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Responses due by 9/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tami D. Cowden. (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION to Transfer Venue; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Responses due by 9/7/2018. (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 184 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #183 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Matthew Dunn. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Attorney Matthew Dunn is advised to only refile the Motion Change Venue/Transfer contained in ECF No. #183 using the correct event to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b), LR IC 2-2(c) and FRCP 7(b). (no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 183 SECOND MOTION to Amend re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Responses due by 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A Consent to Sue, #4 Exhibit B Consent to Sue, #5 Exhibit C Consent to Sue, #6 Exhibit D Consent to Sue, #7 Exhibit E Paystub (Redacted), #8 Exhibit F Paystub (Redacted), #9 Exhibit G Paystub (Redacted), #10 Exhibit H Paystubs (Redacted)) (Dunn, Matthew). Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Matthew Dunn on 8/24/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Gaddy . (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 181 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue by Matthew Smith re #138 Notice (Other). (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE of Withdrawals re: NOTICES #14 , #19 , #21 , #103 , #136 , and #143 ; filed by Jay J. Ammer, Maurizio Dolce, Philip J. Gluszak, Carl R Haas, Gregory Ratliff, Keith Rulka . (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Mark LaRue. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #21 Notice, #27 Notice, #114 Notice, #120 Notice, #149 Notice, #150 Notice, #152 Notice; filed by Kevin W. Johnson, James C Keillor, Rich Mag, Barbara McGinnis, Daniel Ramseth, Haniel Santiago, Amy Spadaro (Dunn, Matthew) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Non-Compliant filing with Local Rules 2-2 and Attorney Action Required to document #176 : ERROR: Documents should have been properly linked to establish the docket-entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). CORRECTION: Attorney Matthew Dunn is advised to refile document #176 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) and properly link document to the appropriate document already filed in this case pursuant to the local rules regarding electronic filing. Document #176 is terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 176 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Matthew Dunn. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file document pursuant to the local rules regarding electronic filing procedures. NOTICE; filed by Brian Smith. (Dunn, Matthew) Document #176 terminated as filed in error on 7/27/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Marcus Mason. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Raymond Kwan. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Dylan Harris, Jason C. Trahan, Bryan M. Duntz. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Alfreda Gatewood, Mary C. Keeley. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Kristy Bond, Jeffrey J. Curley. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by James Hess, Douglas C Merrill, Terri L. Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Kelly-Anne Tremper. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Johnny Padgett. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Mark Heger (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Kimberly A Gilford, Kenneth R Leather, Patrick Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 165 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #164 Notice; filed by Carlada Christian. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carlada Christian. (Attachments: #1 Consen) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 163 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by John Furby. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Todd Bruck, Joseph Berres, Billy Roberts, Justin Van Wyk. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey M. Sitarek, David C. Prohow . (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by David C. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Paul Turner. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 157 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Natalie Leatherwood, James L Lowery, Keith Young. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Travis M Anderson, Kathy Black, Frank Pimental, Joseph Markiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Cynthia Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Donald A Malmgren, Shannon K Webb. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Logan J. Hartman. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Dustan Gill, Barbara McGinnis re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Alice Donovan, Roger Pillitteri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Exhibit Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Ramseth. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Haniel Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Amanda Surko, Chad Brooks, Brian Feeley, Daniel Becker, Cyndi Watson, Mario Espaillat. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, by John Apostolou, Jamie Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Scott Chwascinski, Christian Sanchez re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Reller, Donald Aubrey. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jeff Elia, Kenneth D Uder. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #142 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Albert Byrd, Jr, Maurizio Dolce, Brian Heber, Andrew Lescinsky. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder, filed by Albert Byrd, Jr, Maurizio Dolce, Andrew Lescinsky, Brian Heber re #1 Complaint,,. (Sweeney, Michael) Corrected Image #143 Attached on 5/11/2018 (TR). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by John Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Razza Oreste. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Kenneth Baker, Anthony Bouchard re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, by Darrell Parrish, Matthew Smith. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Joseph Simao re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Keith Rulka. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Lance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jim Hoos. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald Eibner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jesus Varela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Deborah A Schutt re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder, by Tammy Brewer, Shenodh Yousef re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by John F Ahart, Donald H Link. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Greg Snider. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Melody English. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE; filed by Tina M Krycia, Michael J. Shirey re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Henrick, Timothy Altman. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by John Theodore. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER that #115 Brian Smith's Motion to Conditionally Certify a Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Action and Issue Notice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/16/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting Defendants' #55 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The case is stayed pending arbitration. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report by 9/15/2018 and every 180 days thereafter. Defendants' #85 Motion Reconsideration is Denied as moot. Defendants' #105 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by James C Keillor. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, by David Fletcher, Timothy W Siegrist. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting Kellogg's #116 Motion to Stay Briefing and Adjudicationof Smiths #115 Motion for Conditional Class Certification. Should the Judge deny its Motion to Compel, Kellogg's Response to ECF No. 115 will be due within 21 days of that Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Christiana L. Signs re #116 Motion, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Signs, Christiana) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 116 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #115 Motion to Certify Class or Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Responses due by 2/21/2018. (Boudreau, James) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally in FLSA Collective Action and to Issue Notice Responses due by 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed FLSA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 Pre-Trial Order, #3 Exhibit 3 Kellogg Thomas Answer, #4 Exhibit 4 2016 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit 5 Bussel Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 Holton Depo., #7 Exhibit 7 Bussell Depo., #8 Exhibit 8 Nilles Depo., #9 Exhibit 9 Oldre Depo., #10 Exhibit 10 Kellogg Planned Display, #11 Exhibit 11 Sales Account Team Email, #12 Exhibit 12 Groulx Depo., #13 Exhibit 13 Pennington Depo., #14 Exhibit 14 Johnson Itinerary, #15 Exhibit 15 Proposed Reminder Notice, #16 Declaration of Alex D. Dumas, #17 Declaration of Brian Smith, #18 Declaration of Kevin Johnson, #19 Declaration of Raudel Medina, #20 Declaration of Amy Spadaro, #21 Declaration of William Vehlewald) (Dumas, Alex) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Rich Mag. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting #109 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Dunn for Brian Smith and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christian James Gabroy. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/31/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/31/2018. Re: #109 and #110 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition does not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Petition is not signed by the party. Counsel is advised to refile Petition with the Court under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #109 by February 14, 2018. Failure to comply may result in denial of the Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Mark Schanzenbach. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #109 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Dunn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christian Gabroy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4950701) by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) Corrected image #110 attached on 1/31/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by William Callaway. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #105 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 2/1/2018. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Linda Giguere, Philip Talento, Lonnie Williams, David Whelan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority re #85 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jennifer L Holman. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carl R Haas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 102 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to #95 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #55 Motion to Compel; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d) by attorney Michael Sweeney. Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 1/19/2018 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Ralph Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #96 Brief, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - National Labor Relations Board opinion - IBM Corporation) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 99 RESPONSE to #95 Brief, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 March 8, 2017 Sales Communications Email) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Brian Smith re #96 Brief, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Kellogg 11/10/2017 Letter) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #79 ORDER; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Smith Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 Kellogg Briefing Document, #3 Exhibit 3 Kellogg 2/20/17 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 Kellogg's Responses, #5 Exhibit 5 Kellogg's Responses) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 95 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #55 Motion to Compel; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Briefing Document, #2 Exhibit B Continued Employment/Incentive Agreement & General Release, #3 Exhibit C 2/20/17 letter to Brian Smith, #4 Exhibit D 3/3/17 Email from Sales Communications, #5 Exhibit E Defendants Responses, #6 Exhibit F Plaintiffs Responses and Objections) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Bryan Malone, William H Sing. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Mark Young. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue by Theresa M. Sozzo re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting #90 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Briefs Re: #79 Order allowing limited discovery on Defendants' #55 Motion to Compel. Supplemental Briefs due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
December 11, 2017 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Supplemental Briefs re #79 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Thoetis L. Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 88 REPLY to #86 Response to #85 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Responses and Objections) (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Darrell Godbee. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 86 RESPONSE to #85 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 11/28/2017. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 85 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #79 Order on #55 Motion to Compel, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Responses due by 11/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A JAMS Streamlined Arbitration Rules & Procedures)(Cowden, Tami) Event modified on 11/7/2017 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE re #1 Complaint; filed by Sean Fefie. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 83 REPLY to #75 Reply to Response to Motion; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) M [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Richard E. Carns. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE re #1 Complaint; filed by David Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting #78 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #55 Motion to Compel. Defendantas' Replies due by 10/23/2017. Plaintiff has until 10/31/2017 to file a sur-reply no longer than five pages. Plaintiffs' #77 Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration is Withdrawn. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 80 replaced on 10/26/2017) (SLD). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER allowing limited discovery on Defendants' #55 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The parties may serve each other with written discovery requests. Responses will be due within 14 days of service unless otherwise agreed to by the parties or ordered by the court. Supplemental briefs will be due within 45 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 78 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #55 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to withdraw #77 MOTION to Strike; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Signs, Christiana) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 2-2(d) by attorney Christiana Signs. Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 10/26/2017 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION to Strike #75 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Responses due by 11/7/2017. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Roseann Miracola. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to #55 Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Signs, Christiana) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Albert Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Graham. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Richard Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 71 RESPONSE to #55 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 10/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Smith)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Brian J Bloom. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that Plaintiff's #67 Motion to Withdraw his Motion to Amend Complaint is Granted. Plaintiff's #31 Motion to Amend Complaint is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #31 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 67 DUPLICATE ENTRY See #32 ReplyMOTION to Withdraw #31 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2017 (JM). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting #64 Motion to Extend Time re #31 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and #55 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Replies to #31 Motion due by 9/29/2017. Plaintiff's Responses to #55 Motion due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 63 TRO Hearing,,, held on September 19, 2017, before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Court Reporter: Kathy Eismann, KE@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/26/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/24/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KE) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 64 UNOPPOSED FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re: #31 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and #55 MOTION to Compel; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 63 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TRO Hearing held on 9/19/2017 before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Crtrm Administrator: Melissa Johansen; Pla Counsel: Michael Sweeney and Jeff Scarborough; Def Counsel: Tami Cowden, James Nelson and James Boudreau; Court Reporter/Recorder: Katherine Eismann; Time of Hearing: 10:40 a.m. - 12:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 6C; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears arguments of counsel regarding #34 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court recessed from 12:03 p.m. until 12:26 p.m. As stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED the #34 Emergency Motion for TRO is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED the #45 Motion to Strike is DENIED. The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate order to follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #61 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex David Dumas and approving Attorney Christian Gabroy as Designation of Local Counsel for Brian Smith. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/19/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 61 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alex D. Dumas and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christian Gabroy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4780144) filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith . (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 60 THIRD Supplemental DECLARATION re #45 Motion to Strike; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 59 SECOND Supplemental DECLARATION re #45 Motion to Strike; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 58 Supplemental DECLARATION re #45 Motion to Strike; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE; filed by Sheila Simpson. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Dorothy E Soppleland. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel Arbitration; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Responses due by 9/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Patrick Cronin)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #31 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daryl Nisenson)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 9/13/2017. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Motion hearing RE: #34 Motion for TRO currently set for tomorrow 9/14/2017 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting #47 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James M. Nelson and approving Attorney Tami D. Cowden as Designation of Local Counsel for Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 51 Amended DECLARATION of Brian Smith re #34 Motion for TRO ; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Smith Separation Agreement)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #45 Motion to Strike, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Replies due by 9/19/2017. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #34 Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Declaration of Brian Smith)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 48 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d) and Local Rule IA 11-2. Attorney Action Required by Alex Dumas are in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d) and Local Rule IA 11-2. After review of the Courts records, there has been no filing of your Verified Petition which was due on 8/27/2017 (see Notice # 3 entered on 7/13/2017), and that you have not registered for CM/ECF. - Pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-2 and Local Rule IC 2-1: You are required to be granted permission to practice before this Court as well as register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. - For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. - Upon approval of the Verified Petition attorney is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings at the Court's website. (no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 47 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James M. Nelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tami D. Cowden (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4769431) filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeff Martin Scarborough on behalf of Plaintiffs Andy Alvarado, Jay J. Ammer, Ralph Barrish, Andrew Brown, Richard Bush, Scott Chwascinski, Regina Coshatt, Gary Feeney, Charles Aaron Gee, Philip J. Gluszak, Shelley Goddard, Felix Gregory, Jonathan Jakubiak, Kevin W. Johnson, Larry Knab, Elizabeth LaMasse, Kyle Leikam, Renato Linsangan, Brian A Mack, Raudel Medina, Daniel P Muesenfechter, Carman Payne, David W Phillips, Scotty Poarch, Gregory Ratliff, Charles R. Sewell, Sheila Simpson, Brian Smith, Amy Spadaro, Terrie Steele, William Vehlewald. (Scarborough, Jeff) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 45 FIRST MOTION to Strike #34 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Responses due by 9/21/2017. (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #34 Motion for TRO, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Replies due by 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Patrick Cronin)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James N. Boudreau for Kellogg Company,James N. Boudreau for Kellogg Sales Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Tami D. Cowden. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christiana L. Signs for Kellogg Company and Sales and approving Designation of Local Counsel Tami D. Cowden. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 41 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christiana L. Signs and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tami D. Cowden (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4762547) by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Court/Jurisdictions)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 40 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James N. Boudreau and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tami D. Cowden (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4762519) by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A List of Court/Jurisdictions)(Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Ralph Barrish, Larry Knab, Sheila Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tami D. Cowden on behalf of Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Cowden, Tami) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Hearing on #34 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 9/7/2017., Replies due by 9/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Brian Smith shall immediately serve the defendants with the complaint, the emergency motion for temporary restraining order, and a copy of this order by email and regular mail. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 36 AMENDED DECLARATION of Michael J.D. Sweeney re #34 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Brian Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 31, 2017 Filing 34 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration Michael J.D. Sweeney, #5 Declaration Julia Friday)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Regina Coshatt. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Andy Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 31 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint re #1 Complaint,,. by Plaintiff Brian Smith. Responses due by 9/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carman Payne. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 25, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #14 Notice; filed by Scott Chwascinski. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Raudel Medina. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE e #1 Complaint, filed by Amy Spadaro. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #24 Notice; filed by Jonathan Jakubiak. (Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Brian A Mack, Shelley Goddard. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Jonathan Jakubiak. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles R. Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 15, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Elizabeth LaMasse. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Terrie Steele, Philip J. Gluszak, Kevin W. Johnson, Kyle Leikam. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Felix Gregory, William Vehlewald ,. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Scott Chwascinski, Charles Aaron Gee, Gregory Ratliff, Jay J. Ammer, Gary Feeney. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Daniel P Muesenfechter, David W Phillips, Scotty Poarch. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Notices of Filing of Consent to Joinder is granted. The Clerk shall strike ECF Nos. #8 , #9 and #13 from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 16 First MOTION to Strike #13 Joinder, #9 Joinder, #8 Joinder Motion to Strike Notices of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Plaintiffs Andrew Brown, Richard Bush, Renato Linsangan, Daniel P Muesenfechter, David W Phillips, Scotty Poarch, Brian Smith. Responses due by 8/22/2017. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 7, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint; filed by Andrew Brown, Renato Linsangan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint; filed by Brian Smith. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues)(Sweeney, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 13 STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Richard Bush (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Sweeney and approving Attorney Christian J. Gabroy as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/1/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Smith, Scotty Poarch, Daniel P Muesenfechter, David W Phillips re #2 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 10 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael J.D. Sweeney and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christian Gabroy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4714603) filed by Plaintiffs Daniel P Muesenfechter, David W Phillips, Scotty Poarch, Brian Smith. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
August 1, 2017 Filing 9 STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiffs David W Phillips, Daniel P Muesenfechter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 8 STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Scotty Poarch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kellogg Sales Company re #1 Complaint. (MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 7/14/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Brian Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael J.D. and Alex Dumas to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/27/2017. (no image attached) (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kellogg Company re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4689081), filed by Brian Smith. Proof of service due by 10/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I- Consent to Joinder, #2 Exhibit II-Redacted Paycheck, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Gabroy, Christian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Kellogg Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bouchard
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Donovan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Pimental
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Padgett
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Henrick
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gaddy
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jakubiak
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lescinsky
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Byrd, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Elia
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Alexander
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bruck
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Malone
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Snider
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Baker
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Smith
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Represented By: Lesley Ann Tse
Represented By: Katherine Smith Kennedy
Represented By: Meagan Maureen Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody English
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Giguere
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barnes
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Poarch
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Lesley Ann Tse
Represented By: Katherine Smith Kennedy
Represented By: Meagan Maureen Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon K Webb
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A Schutt
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Becker
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Feeley
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Theodore
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Knab
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Carns
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Schanzenbach
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W Siegrist
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McGinnis
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Black
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Van Wyk
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bush
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Fefie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Brewer
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Callaway
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Lowery
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Keillor
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haniel Santiago
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth LaMasse
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Sozzo
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Mason
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rulka
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Vehlewald
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Prohow
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Hess
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Phillips
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Phillips
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P Muesenfechter
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Miracola
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Lesley Ann Tse
Represented By: Katherine Smith Kennedy
Represented By: Meagan Maureen Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Graham
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Razza Oreste
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A Gilford
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Eibner
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly-Anne Tremper
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Aaron Gee
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Hoos
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Sanchez
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Ahart
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato Linsangan
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurizio Dolce
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Phillips
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Surko
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ramseth
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fletcher
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan M. Duntz
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark LaRue
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Godbee
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Leather
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brown
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin W. Johnson
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Markiewicz
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sloan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Daniels
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndi Watson
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason C. Trahan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Talento
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Goddard
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Roberts
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whelan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Leikam
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Gatewood
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Steele
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Heber
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Simpson
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Turner
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Boudreaux
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Altman
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Malmgren
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Sitarek
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Mag
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Furby
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carman Payne
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Spadaro
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chwascinski
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlada Christian
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Parrish
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Schmidt
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Pillitteri
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Turner
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Varela
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay J. Ammer
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Shirey
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Holman
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M Krycia
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Williamson
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenodh Yousef
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kwan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Young
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Lesley Ann Tse
Represented By: Katherine Smith Kennedy
Represented By: Meagan Maureen Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Harris
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Berres
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Curley
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Apostolou
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Aubrey
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis M Anderson
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald H Link
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raudel Medina
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Smith
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas C Merrill
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy E Soppleland
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Alex David Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Heger
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J. Gluszak
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Uder
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Bond
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Young
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Williams
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Reller
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Brooks
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan J. Hartman
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thoetis L. Ramsey
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Barrish
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Miller Reeves
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Coshatt
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Alvarado
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl R Haas
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nichols
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Espaillat
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Simao
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A Mack
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary C. Keeley
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ratliff
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Leatherwood
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Gregory
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustan Gill
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Feeney
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Sewell
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L. Saunders
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Sing
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Abbott
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Represented By: James M Nelson
Represented By: Tami D. Cowden
Represented By: James Norman Boudreau
Represented By: Christiana L. Signs
Represented By: James M. Nelson
Represented By: Brian Feeney
Represented By: John R. Richards
Represented By: Bradly A. Nankerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Represented By: James M Nelson
Represented By: Tami D. Cowden
Represented By: James Norman Boudreau
Represented By: Christiana L. Signs
Represented By: James M. Nelson
Represented By: Brian Feeney
Represented By: John R. Richards
Represented By: Bradly A. Nankerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?