Weaver #182171 v. Christiansen

Petitioner: Daniel Weaver #182171
Respondent: John Christiansen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00127
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Daniel J. Weaver #182171 requesting the local civil court rules (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (pjw)
March 20, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of respondent John Christiansen (Christensen-Brown, Andrea)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE upon Attorney General on March 12, 2019 (jlg) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (jlg)
March 11, 2019 SERVICE in a habeas action: copy of habeas petition and order to answer sent, tracking number number 9405511899560695303790 as to the Attorney General; Respondent John Christiansen served via regular mail (pjw) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (jlg)
March 11, 2019 Copy of Orders #9 and #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel Weaver #182171 (pjw) Modified date filed on 3/11/2019 (jlg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 Petitioner's motion for expedited consideration and #4 Petitioner's motion for release on bond pending a decision on his habeas corpus petition; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and brief by regular mail on the respondent and one copy by certified mail on the Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
February 20, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel Weaver #182171 (ns)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:18-cv-13305; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re documents #3 and #4 by Daniel J. Weaver (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for bond by Daniel J. Weaver. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to expedite review and respondent's response by Daniel J. Weaver. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel J. Weaver against John Christiansen, Receipt No: DET117691 - Fee: $ 5. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver #182171 v. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Weaver #182171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Christiansen
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?