Hardy v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Hardy
Defendant: Bill Johnston, Todd Camp, William Braun, Jessica Hatch, Joe Cheeney and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 1:2020cv00649
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Copy of Report and Recommendation (Screening) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory Hardy (kw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that, except for Plaintiff's MMWA claim, all of Plaintiff's federal claims be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; that Plaintiff's MMWA claim be dismissed without prejudice; and that Plaintiff's state-law claims be dismissed without prejudice; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Gregory Hardy re Amended Complaint #8 (ns)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William Braun, Todd Camp, Joe Cheeney, Jessica Hatch, Bill Johnston, Unknown Parties filed by Gregory Hardy (ns)
July 23, 2020 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory Hardy (clw)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 21, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory Hardy (mg)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
July 20, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Gregory Hardy (mg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Gregory Hardy re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 , complaint, #1 , Affidavit #3 (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory Hardy by plaintiff Gregory Hardy (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Braun, Todd Camp, Joe Cheeney, Jessica Hatch, Bill Johnston, Unknown Parties filed by Gregory Hardy (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment 1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 4, #7 Attachment 5, #8 Attachment 6, #9 Attachment 7, #10 Attachment 8, #11 Attachment 9, #12 Attachment 10, #13 Attachment 11, #14 Attachment 12, #15 Attachment 13, #16 Attachment 14) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Cheeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?