Blocker v. Jonker et al
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Corey Blocker
Defendant: Robert J. Jonker, Michigan, State of, Gretchen Whitmer, United States of America, Joseph R. Biden and Michigan Unemployment Agency
Case Number: 1:2022cv00132
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
2 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Requested Settlement by plaintiff Corey Blocker (ems)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for permanent injunction , MOTION for default judgment as to the defendants, MOTION to supplement to file exhibit C by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (Attachments: #1 MI Child Support Enforcement Financial Report) (mlc)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for permanent injunction against the SBA decision to deny Corey Blocker's EIDL loan modification, and injunction against the Michgan Unemployment Agency by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ems)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to compel evidence (with Statement of Fact) by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ems)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled as 'Statement of Fact') by plaintiff Corey Blocker (ems)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to compel every document from the SBA to prove that Corey Blocker has been blacklisted by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ems)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for preliminary injunction on all executive orders, MOTION for order to provide certificate of service by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ems)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (jra)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Janet T. Neff for all further proceedings pursuant to Order #4 by Judge Robert J. Jonker; Judge Robert J. Jonker no longer assigned to the case (ems)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order of Recusal #4 , Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ems)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ems)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION: Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker disqualified from this case; case to be reassigned ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Corey Blocker (pjw)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker v. Jonker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Corey Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Jonker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Unemployment Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?