Thompson et al v. Thornton et al
Plaintiff: Michael Thompson, Thompson Properties, LLC, United Builders, LLC, Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC, South Willowbrook Associates, LLC, Gulf Shores, LLC, South Willowbrook South, LLC, Thompson Construction Co., LLC, First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC and LTP, LLC
Defendant: Rose Thornton, Michelle Signor, Nicholas Thornton and Robert Signor
Case Number: 1:2024cv00127
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030 Fraud & Related Activity in Connection with Computers
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs to show cause by 4/11/2024 why the Courtshould not decline supplemental jurisdiction; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
March 21, 2024 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #22 sent via U.S. Mail to Michelle Signor, Robert Signor (ns)
March 14, 2024 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline), #21 sent via U.S. Mail to Michelle Signor, Robert Signor (ns)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by 4/9/2024, Plaintiff to either request that a default enter against Defendants Rose Thornton and Nicholas Thornton or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case against these defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
March 11, 2024 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #20 sent via U.S. Mail to Michelle Signor, Robert Signor (ems)
March 4, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with jury demand by Robert Signor (Attachments: #1 Attachment Executed summons) (ns)
March 4, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with jury demand by Michelle Signor (Attachments: #1 Attachment Executed summons) (ns)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed; Nicholas Thornton served on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024 (McKenney, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned executed; Rose Thornton served on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024 (McKenney, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Robert Signor served on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024 (McKenney, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Michelle Signor served on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/6/2024 (McKenney, Stephen)
February 9, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Builders, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thompson Properties, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thompson Construction Co., LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Willowbrook South, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Willowbrook Associates, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LTP, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gulf Shores, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text and filers on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 9, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Michelle Signor, Robert Signor, Nicholas Thornton, Rose Thornton (ems)
February 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
February 9, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kenneth F. Neuman on behalf of plaintiffs First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC, Gulf Shores, LLC, Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC, LTP, LLC, South Willowbrook Associates, LLC, South Willowbrook South, LLC, Michael Thompson, Thompson Construction Co., LLC, Thompson Properties, LLC, United Builders, LLC (Neuman, Kenneth)
February 8, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (McKenney, Stephen)
February 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (with Exhibit 1) against Michelle Signor, Robert Signor, Nicholas Thornton, Rose Thornton filed by Gulf Shores, LLC, United Builders, LLC, South Willowbrook South, LLC, First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC, Thompson Properties, LLC, Thompson Construction Co., LLC, Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC, Michael Thompson, LTP, LLC, South Willowbrook Associates, LLC (McKenney, Stephen) Modified text on 2/9/2024 (ems).
February 8, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC, Gulf Shores, LLC, Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC, LTP, LLC, South Willowbrook Associates, LLC, South Willowbrook South, LLC, Michael Thompson, Thompson Construction Co., LLC, Thompson Properties, LLC, United Builders, LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7289222 (McKenney, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Thornton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thompson
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Properties, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Builders, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbor Cove RV Resort, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Willowbrook Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Shores, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Willowbrook South, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Construction Co., LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Choice Real Estate Associates, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTP, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Timothy McKenney
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Signor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Signor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?