Bland, et al v. Fleet Finance, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Ida Sanders, Brenda Colvin, Deborah Stevenson, George NMI Jones, Robert E. Malone, Famous Jones, Polly Joiner Rogers, Carolyn Clay Turnage, Catherine NMI Moore, Elizabeth Rose, Harold Bankhead, Michael Buckhalter, Annie Tate, Hazel Brooks, Sherry Blanchard, Lula Jones, Florence McGowan, Carrie Hargrove, Willie D. Parson, Danny Colvin, Alonzo Smith, Willie Smith, Curtis Bush, Georgia M. Robinson, Willie M. Smith, T. J. Conner, Hazel Bland, Eddie Powell, Sallie Jones, Freddie Bridges, Gloria Jordan, William Sherrod, Robert Moore, Marilyn J. Rose, Bertha M. Langford, Otis Harris, Irene M. Smith, Riley D. Murry, Geneva McGregory, Maggie Conner, Marcia Deloach, Delinda Boiler, Brenetta Sherrod, Henry L. Smith, Willie B. Payne, Mary Lee Hill, Carla Gore Tate, Willie C. Johnson, George Hairston, Columbus Phillips, Dorothy J. White, Aaron Jones, Willie Henry, Joyce Smith, Delane Sherrod and Cherry Wells
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Security Insurance Company, Union Security Life Insurance Company, Fleet Financial Group, Inc., Fleet Finance, Inc. and Defendants Nos. 1-15
Case Number: 1:2002cv00442
Filed: December 13, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2004. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2004 Case closed (dlh)
May 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting [49-1] motion for Reconsideration of [46-1] order, granting [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment; the plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice and this case is closed ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/17/04) COB # 56 pg. 100 Date of Entry: 5/18/04 (dlh) Modified on 05/18/2004
May 18, 2004 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/17/04) (dlh)
April 27, 2004 Telephonic Case Management Conference set at 11:00 5/21/04 Location: Aberdeen before Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis (jla)
April 1, 2004 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of first set of interrogatories and first set of requests for production by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Hazel Bland (jla)
March 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Fleet Financial Group, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice; claims of plaintiffs Sherry Blanchard, Brenetta Sherrod and Deborah Stevenson dismissed with prejudice; this order shall not affect the remainder of defendant Fleet Finance's motion for summary judgment, to be considered by the court separately ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/5/04) Date of Entry: 3/5/04 (rke)
February 27, 2004 Filing 52 JOINDER by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security in rebuttal of Fleet Finance, Inc. in support of its motion for reconsideration and motion for summary judgment (not filed) (mhg)
February 25, 2004 Filing 53 REBUTTAL by Fleet Finance, Inc. to response to [49-1] motion for Reconsideration of [46-1] order by Fleet Financial Fleet Finance, Inc. (mhg)
February 23, 2004 Filing 51 RESPONSE by Hazel Bland to [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc. (dlh)
February 17, 2004 Filing 50 JOINDER by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security in [49-1] motion for Reconsideration of [46-1] order by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc. (mhg)
February 12, 2004 Filing 49 MOTION by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou for Reconsideration of [46-1] order (dlh)
February 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER staying entry of scheduling order pending ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment (signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis on 2/10/04) Date of Entry: 2/10/04 (jla)
February 10, 2004 Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/9/04 (jla)
February 10, 2004 Filing 47 CIVIL MINUTES for: T/CMC held 2/9/04 before Mag. Judge Davis; entry of scheduling order stayed pending court's ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment (jla)
February 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying as moot [39-1] motion to Strike, denying as moot [37-1] motion to Hold in Abeyance [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc., or, in the alternative, for additional time to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment, denying [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/2/04) Date of Entry: 2/2/04 (rke)
January 26, 2004 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of pre-discovery disclosure by Hazel Bland to Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou, American Bankers, American Security, Union Security (jla)
January 14, 2004 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of pre-discovery disclosure by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou to Hazel Bland, et al (jla)
January 12, 2004 Filing 43 JOINDER by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou in [41-1] motion response by American Bankers (mhg)
January 12, 2004 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by American Bankers in support of [41-1] motion response by American Bankers (rke)
January 12, 2004 Filing 41 RESPONSE by American Bankers to [37-1] motion to Hold in Abeyance [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc., or, in the alternative, for additional time to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment by Hazel Bland (rke)
January 9, 2004 Filing 40 JOINDER by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security in [39-1] motion to Strike by Fleet Finance, Inc. (dlh)
January 9, 2004 Filing 39 REPLY by Fleet Finance, Inc. to response to [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc. (dlh)
December 30, 2003 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Hazel Bland, et al to [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc. (jla) Modified on 01/05/2004
December 29, 2003 Filing 37 MOTION by Hazel Bland to Hold in Abeyance [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc., or, in the alternative, for additional time to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment (jla)
December 18, 2003 Filing 36 JOINDER by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security in [35-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Fleet Financial Grou, Fleet Finance, Inc. (dlh)
November 25, 2003 Telephonic Case Management Conference reset at 2:30 2/9/04 Location: Aberdeen before Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis (jla)
November 10, 2003 Filing 35 MOTION by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou for Summary Judgment (in expandable folder) (dlh)
October 24, 2003 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of pre-discovery disclosure of core information by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Hazel Bland (dlh)
September 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, Lifting Stay of Proceedings , setting Telephonic Case Management Conference 2:30 1/13/04 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis on 9/18/03) Date of Entry: 9/18/03 (mhg)
September 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying [9-1] motion to Remand ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/11/03) Date of Entry: 9/11/03 (mhg)
September 11, 2003 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/11/03) (mhg)
September 8, 2003 Filing 30 SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security ; (jla)
September 8, 2003 Filing 29 JOINDER by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou in [28-1] opposition response by Union Security, American Security, American Bankers (jla)
September 8, 2003 Filing 28 RESPONSE by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security in opposition to [9-1] motion to Remand by Hazel Bland (jla)
August 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting [26-1] joint motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to remand, Response to Motion reset to 9/5/03 for [9-1] motion to Remand the parties shall have until 9/22/03 to complete all remand related discovery with respect to plaintiffs Joyce Smith and Annie Tate and until 10/7/03 to serve supplemental response to plaintiff's motion to remand as to those plaintiffs ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 8/25/03) Date of Entry: 8/25/03 (dlh)
August 25, 2003 Filing 26 JOINT MOTION by Hazel Bland, American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Extend Time to respond to motion to remand (dlh)
May 22, 2003 Mailed copy of order and standard operating procedure re E-Government Act of 2002 to all counsel of record (dlh)
May 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct remand related discovery, Response to Motion reset to 8/15/03 for [9-1] motion to Remand ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/22/03) Date of Entry: 5/22/03 (dlh)
May 21, 2003 Filing 24 NOTICE by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to take deposition of plaintiffs 6/11,12,16,17/03 (no place specified) (dlh)
May 19, 2003 Filing 23 MOTION by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Extend Time to conduct remand related discovery (dlh)
May 16, 2003 Filing 22 FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security ; (dlh)
April 16, 2003 Filing 21 CIVIL MINUTES: CMC was not held (dlh) Modified on 04/18/2003
February 20, 2003 Filing 20 Corporate statement by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou identifying FleetBoston as parent corporation. (mhg)
February 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand for the purpose of conducting remand-related discovery, granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to remand, Response to Motion reset to 5/15/03 for [9-1] motion to Remand ( signed by Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/11/03) Date of Entry: 2/11/03 (jla)
February 10, 2003 Filing 18 REPLY by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to response to [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand for the purpose of conducting remand-related discovery by Union Security, American Security, American Bankers (dlh)
February 7, 2003 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of first set of discovery requests by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Hazel Bland (dlh)
February 7, 2003 Filing 16 REPLY by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to response to [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand for the purpose of conducting remand-related discovery by Union Security, American Security, American Bankers (dlh)
February 3, 2003 Filing 15 OBJECTION by Hazel Bland et al Re: [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand for the purpose of conducting remand-related discovery by Union Security, American Security, American Bankers (dlh)
January 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending ruling on motion to remand (signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis on 1/30/03) Date of Entry: 1/30/03 (jla)
January 29, 2003 Filing 13 MOTION by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Extend Time to respond to the plaintiff's motion to remand for the purpose of conducting remand-related discovery (dlh)
January 29, 2003 Filing 12 JOINDER by Fleet Finance, Inc., Fleet Financial Grou in [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to remand by Union Security, American Security, American Bankers (dlh)
January 24, 2003 Filing 11 MOTION by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security to Extend Time to respond to motion to remand (mhg)
January 16, 2003 Motion(s) referred: [10-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending ruling on motion to remand referred to Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis (jla)
January 13, 2003 Filing 10 MOTION by Hazel Bland, et al to Stay Proceedings pending ruling on motion to remand (mhg)
January 13, 2003 Filing 9 MOTION by Hazel Bland, et al to Remand (mhg)
January 3, 2003 Filing 8 Corporate statement by Union Security identifying American Security as parent corporations. (dlh)
January 3, 2003 Filing 7 Corporate statement by American Bankers identifying American Bankers', Fortis, Inc., Fortis (NL), Interfinancial, Inc., United Family as parent corporations. (dlh)
January 3, 2003 Filing 6 Corporate statement by American Security identifying Interfinancial, Inc. as parent corporations. (dlh)
January 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16.1(A) INITIAL ORDER setting Telephonic Case Management Conference (CMC) at 11:00 4/15/03 before Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis . No later than 21 days prior to the CMC, counsel shall confer, either in person or telephonically. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis on 1/2/03) (jla)
December 20, 2002 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Fleet Financial Grou (dlh)
December 20, 2002 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Fleet Finance, Inc. (dlh)
December 13, 2002 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT Chief Judge Glen H. Davidson and Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis (dlh)
December 13, 2002 **Set Jury Flag (dlh)
December 13, 2002 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by American Bankers, American Security, Union Security against Hazel Bland, Harold Bankhead, Delinda Boiler, Cherry Wells, Sherry Blanchard, Freddie Bridges, Hazel Brooks, Michael Buckhalter, Curtis Bush, Danny Colvin, Brenda Colvin, T. J. Conner, Maggie Conner, Marcia Deloach, George Hairston, Otis Harris, Carrie Hargrove, Willie Henry, Mary Lee Hill, Willie C. Johnson, Aaron Jones, Sallie Jones, Famous Jones, George NMI Jones, Lula Jones, Gloria Jordan, Bertha M. Langford, Robert E. Malone, Geneva McGregory, Florence McGowan, Robert Moore, Catherine NMI Moore, Riley D. Murry, Willie D. Parson, Willie B. Payne, Columbus Phillips, Eddie Powell, Georgia M. Robinson, Polly Joiner Rogers, Marilyn J. Rose, Elizabeth Rose, Ida Sanders, Delane Sherrod, William Sherrod, Brenetta Sherrod, Alonzo Smith, Henry L. Smith, Irene M. Smith, Joyce Smith, Willie Smith, Willie M. Smith, Deborah Stevenson, Annie Tate, Carla Gore Tate, Carolyn Clay Turnage, Dorothy J. White (dlh)
December 13, 2002 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fleet Financial Grou, American Bankers, American Security, Union Security from Lowndes County Circuit Court re contract dispute; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 69972 (dlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bland, et al v. Fleet Finance, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Sanders
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Colvin
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stevenson
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George NMI Jones
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Malone
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Famous Jones
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Joiner Rogers
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Clay Turnage
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine NMI Moore
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rose
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Bankhead
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buckhalter
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Tate
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Brooks
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Blanchard
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Jones
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence McGowan
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Hargrove
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie D. Parson
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Colvin
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Bush
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia M. Robinson
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie M. Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. J. Conner
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Bland
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Powell
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallie Jones
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Bridges
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Jordan
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sherrod
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn J. Rose
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha M. Langford
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Harris
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene M. Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley D. Murry
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva McGregory
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Conner
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Deloach
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delinda Boiler
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenetta Sherrod
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B. Payne
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee Hill
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Gore Tate
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie C. Johnson
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hairston
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Phillips
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J. White
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jones
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Henry
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Smith
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delane Sherrod
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Wells
Represented By: Eric D. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Security Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Finance, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants Nos. 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?