Sundbeck et al v. Sundbeck
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Sundbeck and Lucy Sundbeck
Defendant: Milton O. Sundbeck, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00023
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jerry A. Davis
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on deferred motions for summary judgment 125 , 128 , 172 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/20/2011. (kmc) Modified on 10/20/2011 (dlh).
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 125 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying in part and deferring in part 128 , 172 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment.Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/3/11. (kmc)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER finding as moot 71 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/30/2011. (kmc)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/12/2011. (kmc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundbeck et al v. Sundbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Sundbeck
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Sundbeck
Represented By: C. Michael Ellingburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton O. Sundbeck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?