Waddle Trucking, LLC v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Waddle Trucking, LLC and Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc.
Defendant: Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. and Paccar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00077
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING CASE BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 05/21/12. (gs)
May 16, 2012 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders: Motion Hearing turned into a Settlement Conference on 5/16/2012. (egs)
May 16, 2012 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION to Compel filed by Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc., Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
April 30, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #69 MOTION to Compel , #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing RESET for 5/16/2012 at 02:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 3 before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
April 20, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Caterpillar's Designation of Experts by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiffs Waddle Trucking, LLC and Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
April 5, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #69 MOTION to Compel , #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2012 01:30 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 3 before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
April 3, 2012 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders: Settlement Conference held on 4/3/2012. (egs)
March 29, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc. by David Aaron Norris on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Norris, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking, LLC by David Aaron Norris on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Norris, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Aaron Norris on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Norris, David)
March 14, 2012 Filing 84 Sealed Document. Exhibit 3 re #63 Motion to Compel Discovery (dlh)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Extend CMO; granting #71 Motion to Seal; Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/20/2012. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/14/2012. (def) Modified on 3/14/2012 (dlh).
March 12, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2012 at 10:00 AM in Judge Sanders Chambers before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
March 8, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Requests for Production of Documents by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. to Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 8, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. to Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 7, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc. by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 7, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking, LLC by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 1, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiff, Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Schelver, Stephen)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/1/2012. (def)
March 1, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #69 MOTION to Compel , #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #70 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines : Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 3 before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
February 29, 2012 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #70 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines and Amendment of Case Management Order filed by Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc., Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
February 28, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION for Protective Order by Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc., Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"- Notices of Deposition) (Adcock, Ken)
February 27, 2012 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2-Letter dated 1/30/12, #3 Exhibit 3-Index (subject to motion to seal), #4 Exhibit 3- E-mails re: discovery dispute) (Schelver, Stephen)
February 27, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Seal Exhibit "3" to Caterpillar's Response re #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen) Modified on 2/28/2012 (jla).
February 24, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Faith Letters and Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Responses to Discovery, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Expert Designation) (Schelver, Stephen)
February 24, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Faith Letters and Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Responses to Discovery, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Expert Designation) (Schelver, Stephen)
February 24, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking LLC by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 24, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 22, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Responses due by 2/27/2012 (dlh)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #65 Responses due by 2/27/2012. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/22/12. (def)
February 17, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
February 15, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Judge Sanders Chambers before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
February 1, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc., Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Caterpillar's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit "B" - Plaintiffs' September 28, 2011 Good Faith Letter to Caterpillar, #3 Exhibit "C" - Plaintiffs' November 15, 2011 Good Faith Letter to Caterpillar, #4 Exhibit "D" - Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit "E" - Caterpillar's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production, #6 Exhibit "F" - Plaintiffs' December 20, 2011 Good Faith Letter to Caterpillar, #7 Exhibit "G" - Caterpillar's January 3, 2012 letter to Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit "H" - Emails between K. Adcock and S. Schelver, #9 Exhibit "I" - Plaintiffs' January 18, 2012 and January 23, 2012 Good Faith Letter to Caterpillar) (Adcock, Ken)
January 31, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Set of Request for Production of Documents by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc., Waddle Trucking, LLC to Defendants, Caterpillar, Inc. and Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.. (Adcock, Ken)
January 25, 2012 Filing 61 ANSWER to #60 Amended Complaint (Corrected Amended Complaint) by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
January 11, 2012 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #59 Amended Complaint; Corrected Amended Complaint filed; see Doc #60 AMENDED COMPLAINT (jla)
January 11, 2012 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
January 11, 2012 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to File. Amended complaint to be filed within 14 days. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/11/2012. (def)
January 5, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff, Waddle Trucking, LLC's Answers to the First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Propounded by Defendant, Caterpillar, Inc. by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC to Defendant, Caterpillar, Inc.. (Adcock, Ken)
January 5, 2012 Filing 56 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT, PACCAR, INC.. (Navarro, Jeffery)
December 19, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Second Set of Requests for Production by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to All Counsel. (Schelver, Stephen) Modified on 12/20/2011 (jla).
December 9, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Amended Complaint) (Adcock, Ken)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Extend CMO. Discovery due by 5/25/2012. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/2/2012. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/5/2012. Motions due by 6/8/2012. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/2/2011. (def)
December 2, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Designation of Experts by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
December 2, 2011 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines filed by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Norris, David)
November 23, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of CMO deadlines - Plaintiff's Designation of Experts /i> by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken) Modified on 11/23/2011 (dlh).
November 16, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Request for Production of Documents by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC to Defendants Caterpillar, Inc. and Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.. (Adcock, Ken)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/6/2011. (def)
October 5, 2011 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Extend CMO. Discovery due by 4/30/2012. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/3/2011. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/3/2012. Motions due by 5/30/2012.. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/30/2011. (def)
September 30, 2011 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines filed by Paccar, Inc.. (Greene, Charles)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to Show Cause re Mandatory Electronic Filing sent to Charles T. Greene. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/11. (jla)
September 13, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Charles T. Greene representing defendant PACCAR. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/1/2011. (def)
August 29, 2011 Filing 41 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee paid on 6/21/11 ; Attorney Charles T. Greene, by Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF ADMISSION) (Navarro, Jeffery)
August 29, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #40 Exhibits to Other Document; Requested Attorney to refile original motion with exhibits attached (jla)
August 29, 2011 Filing 40 EXHIBIT re Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid . (Navarro, Jeffery)
August 17, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
August 3, 2011 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paccar, Inc.. (Navarro, Jeffery)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/3/2011. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/26/2011. (sba) (no document attached)
July 25, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 Response in Opposition re #24 Motion to Dismiss by Paccar, Inc.. (Navarro, Jeffery) Modified on 7/26/2011 (jla).
July 19, 2011 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
July 13, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC to Caterpillar, Inc. and Caterpillar Engine Systems Inc.. (Adcock, Ken)
July 8, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/14/2012 at 01:30 PM in Judge Sanders Chambers before Mag. Judge David A. Sanders. (egs)
July 7, 2011 Case Reassigned from Jerry A. Davis to David A. Sanders. For chambers contact information please see the following web site. ** www.msnd.uscourts.gov/judicialofficers.htm ** (mhg)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/22/2011. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/07/2011. (sba) (no document attached)
July 6, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss by PACCAR Inc. by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Adcock, Ken)
July 5, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC to Defendants. (Adcock, Ken)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #14 without prejudice the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles T. Greene. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis on 6/29/2011. (def)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Governing Final Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis on 6/27/2011. (egs)
June 27, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2012 at 01:30 PM in Judge Davis Chambers before Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis. (egs)
June 27, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Trial: MVD/Jury Trial set for 9/10/2012 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (gs)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2012 at 01:30 PM in Judge Davis Chambers before Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis. Discovery due by 12/30/2011. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/29/2011. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/3/2011. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/3/2011. Motions due by 1/13/2012. Signed by Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis on 6/27/2011. (egs)
June 27, 2011 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/27/2011. (egs)
June 24, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Caterpillar Inc. and Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc. by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiff Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 23, 2011 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 MOTION to Dismiss by PACCAR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Navarro, Jeffery)
June 23, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Paccar, Inc.. (Navarro, Jeffery)
June 23, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiff, Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 22, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Caterpillar Inc.'s Requests for Production by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. to Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 22, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Caterpillar Inc.'s Interrogatories by Stephen Friedrich Schelver on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. to Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/22/2011. (sba)
June 21, 2011 Filing 19 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Caterpillar Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 21, 2011 Filing 18 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
June 21, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PACCAR's Pre-Discovery Core Disclosures by Jeffery M. Navarro on behalf of Paccar, Inc. to All parties. (Navarro, Jeffery)
June 21, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Jeffery M. Navarro for Charles Green: $ 100, receipt number MSN100000711 (jla)
June 21, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #16 Notice (Other) (asked attorney to file Notice of Service) (dlh)
June 20, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE by Jeffery M. Navarro on behalf of Paccar, Inc. PACCAR's INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Navarro, Jeffery)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Deirdre Claire McGlinchey re CMECF Registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/6/11. (jla)
June 1, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Charles T. Greene, by Paccar, Inc.. (Navarro, Jeffery)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Deirdre C. McGlinchey; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colvin G. Norwood, both representing defendants Caterpillar, Inc. and Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc. Signed by Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis on 5/4/2011. (jkj)
April 29, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Colvin G. Norwood,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-734706) by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing) (Schelver, Stephen)
April 29, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Deirdre C. McGlinchey,(Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-734699) by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificates of Good Standing) (Schelver, Stephen)
April 26, 2011 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint. (Adcock, Ken)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2011 at 01:30 PM in Judge Davis Chambers before Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis. Signed by Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis on 4/26/2011. (egs)
April 25, 2011 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
April 25, 2011 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Schelver, Stephen)
April 25, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Paccar, Inc.. (Navarro, Jeffery)
April 25, 2011 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Paccar, Inc. by Jeffery M. Navarro on behalf of Paccar, Inc. (Navarro, Jeffery) Modified on 4/26/2011 (jla).
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AGREED ORDER Extending Time to Answer; Paccar, Inc. answer due 4/25/2011. Signed by Mag. Judge Jerry A. Davis on 4/15/2011. (jkj)
March 30, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ken R. Adcock on behalf of Waddle Trucking, LLC Caterpillar, Inc. served on 3/30/2011. (Adcock, Ken)
March 17, 2011 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Jerry A. Davis. (tab)
March 17, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Paccar, Inc. (tab)
March 17, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 350, receipt number MSN300004487, filed by Waddle Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waddle Trucking, LLC v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waddle Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waddle Trucking of Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Engine Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Aaron Norris
Represented By: Stephen Friedrich Schelver
Represented By: Colvin G. Norwood
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: David Aaron Norris
Represented By: Stephen Friedrich Schelver
Represented By: Colvin G. Norwood
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery M. Navarro
Represented By: Charles T. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?