Atwood v. Cheney et al
Plaintiff: David Garland Atwood, II
Defendant: Mike Cheney, James Jackson, Tim Nail, Martin Pace and State Fire Marshal
Case Number: 1:2012cv00168
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Attala
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER denying as moot 356 Motion to Enforce; denying as moot 359 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/11/2017. (dbm)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER AND NOTICE OF PAST DUE SANCTIONS re 354 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/13/2017. (dbm)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting 304 Motion for Sanctions; granting 305 Motion for Sanctions; denying 341 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/5/2017. (dbm)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 JUDGMENT in favor of David Garland Atwood, II against James Jackson. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/20/2017. (dbm)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 PRETRIAL ORDER. Estimated length of trial: 4 days. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/17/2017. (dbm)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER ON TRANSCRIPT FEES. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/28/2017. (dbm)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting 303 Motion for Sanctions Hearing; granting 307 Motion for Transcript; granting in part and denying in part 308 Motion for Subpoenas; granting 309 Motion for Subpoena of cell phone records. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/14/2017. (dbm)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER IMPOSING COSTS on Defendant. Payment due within 30 days. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/9/2017. (dbm)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting Mistrial. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/6/2017. (psk)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 AMENDED ORDER to correct date only on ORDER 287 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/2/2017. (dbm)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 246 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/8/16. (jlm)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 230 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/14/2016. (dbm)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying 167 Motion to Transfer Compliance Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/24/2016. (rrz)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying 170 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/21/2016. (rrz)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 143 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/9/2016. (rrz)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Report and Recommendation approved and adopted as the opinion of the Court; Defendant Martin Pace is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/1/15. (cr) Modified on 6/1/2015 (dlh).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwood v. Cheney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Garland Atwood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Fire Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?