United States of America v. Gentry
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Billy Mike Gentry
Case Number: 1:2012cv00215
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Chickasaw
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Agriculture (DISCONTINUED AFTER 5/3/2013)
Cause of Action: 07:181 Packers & Stockyard Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Billy Mike Gentry. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/13/2016. (am)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/2/2016. (dbm)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 04/09/2015. (geb)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 17 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 09/02/2014. (geb)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 15 Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/30/2013. (dm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jean-Michel Voltaire
Represented By: Felecia L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Mike Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?