Turner v. Aurora Australis Lodge et al
Plaintiff: Wanda NMI Turner
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10, Vanguard Health Care Services, LLC and Aurora Australis Lodge
Case Number: 1:2013cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER on Sanctions 45 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/22/2014. (psk)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 79 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/12/2014. (psk)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall submit costs within fourteen days to Court; Vanguard shall have seven days thereafter to respond. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/12/2013. (psk)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 43 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/10/2013. (psk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Aurora Australis Lodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Health Care Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Australis Lodge
Represented By: William Davis Frye
Represented By: Ceejaye Sneddon Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda NMI Turner
Represented By: Perrin Nelson Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?