Ruth v. Eka Chemicals, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steve G. Ruth
Defendant: Eka Chemicals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00165
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/6/2015. (geb)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 59 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/12/2015. (geb)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 50 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 02/17/2015. (geb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth v. Eka Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve G. Ruth
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eka Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?