Bryant et al v. United Furniture Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Brown Heffernan Bryant, Kenny Bryant, Anthony Brown, Cleveland Woodrow Oliver, Jr., David L. Franks, Allie Everett and Eric Thomas
Defendant: United Furniture Industries, Inc., United Furniture Industries CA, Inc., United Furniture Industries NC, LLC and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2013cv00246
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 233 Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/16/2017. (adm)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 209 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/18/2016. (geb)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 107 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Allow Limited Entry of Appearance, Order on Motion for Application of Res Judicata. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 03/30/2015. (geb)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Strike 72 Plaintiff's Reply or for Alternate Relief. Defendants may file a sur-rebuttal, due March 11, 2015. No extension of time shall be granted. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 03/04/2015. (geb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. United Furniture Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Brown Heffernan Bryant
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Bryant
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brown
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveland Woodrow Oliver, Jr.
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Franks
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allie Everett
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas
Represented By: W. Howard Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Furniture Industries CA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Furniture Industries NC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?