King v. Cole's Poultry, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James E. King, Sr., Jimmy Rice, Nida Rice, Willie Jones, James Lenoir, Ordell Clopton, Anna Clopton, Larry Porter, Willie Howard, Earnest Doss, Orlando Rice, Felicia Rice, Chris Rice, Rodger Scott, Charity Scott, Claude Ware, Walter Tumblin, Valerie May Wilson, Michael Ray Wilson, Jr., Claude Devauld, Christine Devauld, Linda Tumblin, Hazel Tumblin, Ira Fields, Robbie Fields, Lucille Fields, Henry Jean Parks, Chasity Denice Young, Leona Bernice Ivy, Miloyd Ware, Barbara Porter, James E. King, Jr., Tina Porter, Natasha Porter, Sally Devauld, Samantha Ezell, Kent Gardner, Valerie Gardner, Stephanie Tumblin, Katroy Tumblin, Henry Tumblin, Myrtice Tumblin, Caron Ewing, Raymond Howard, Sherwin Walker, Mandolyn Body, William Elliot, Inez Elliot, Stella Dobson, Amanda Boggan, Ryaion McAlister, Pamela McAlister, Glen McAlister, Roxie McAlister, Lillie Page, Eddie McAlister, Gloria McAlister and John Moore
Defendant: Peco Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00088
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER denying 484 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/5/17. (rel)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 428 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/9/2017. (lpm)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER denying 259 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/17/2017. (lpm)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER denying 257 Motion to Sever. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/13/2016. (lpm)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER denying 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 207 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 229 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 187 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 189 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 191 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/12/2016. (lpm)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/29/2016. (lpm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Cole's Poultry, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peco Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Carmody
Represented By: R. Richard Cirilli, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren O. Lawhorn
Represented By: Scott Fuller Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. King, Sr.
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Rice
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nida Rice
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Jones
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lenoir
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ordell Clopton
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Clopton
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Porter
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Howard
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Doss
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Rice
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Rice
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Rice
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Scott
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Scott
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Ware
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie May Wilson
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Devauld
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Devauld
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Fields
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Fields
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Fields
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Jean Parks
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity Denice Young
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Bernice Ivy
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miloyd Ware
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Porter
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. King, Jr.
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Porter
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Porter
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Devauld
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Ezell
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Gardner
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gardner
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katroy Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtice Tumblin
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron Ewing
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Howard
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin Walker
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandolyn Body
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Elliot
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Elliot
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Dobson
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Boggan
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryaion McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Page
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria McAlister
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moore
Represented By: Peter B. Bieri
Represented By: Richard Scott Harrison
Represented By: Andrew R. Klonowski
Represented By: Richard H. Middleton, Jr.
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Brian Lee Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?