Whitefoot et al v. Sheriff of Clay County et al
Plaintiff: David J. Whitefoot and Elena R. Whitefoot
Defendant: Sheriff of Clay County, Eddie Scott, Brad Pettit, Frank Williamson, Cecil Simmons, Simmons Mobile Home Service LLC, Terry Simmons, Lee J. Howard and Jeff Rawlings
Case Number: 1:2014cv00113
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 180 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/1/2018. (dbm)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying 174 Motion for separate order. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/13/2017. (dbm)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/18/2017. (dbm)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 163 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/5/2017. (dbm)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 120 Motion for Reconsideration. The stay is LIFTED. Trial is set for 9/18/2017. Discovery is due 7/14/2017. Dispositive motions are due 7/28/2017. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/17/2017. (adm)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 118 Order on [95} Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 98 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 111 Motion to Dismiss, and [115} Motion . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/22/16. (jlm) Modified on 8/23/2016 (dlh).
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 82 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 87 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 93 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/29/2016. (dbm) Modified on 3/29/2016 (dlh).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 79 ORDER on Motions; Denying without prejudice 20 MOTION to Dismiss; Dismissing as Moot 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/15/15. (jlm) Modified on 6/15/2015 (jlm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitefoot et al v. Sheriff of Clay County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Clay County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Mobile Home Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee J. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rawlings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Whitefoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena R. Whitefoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?