Case name not on file
Defendant: ..
Case Number: 1:2014cv00154
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 244 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/23/2017. (psk)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 234 Order on 192 195 Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/20/2016. (adm) Modified on 9/20/2016 (dlh).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying 197 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/13/2016. (am)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 202 Order on Motion to Increase Limitation Fund, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/27/2016. (geb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?