Bogan v. MTD Consumer Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheaneter J. Bogan
Defendant: MTD Consumer Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00225
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's request for Reinstatement and Front Pay; Denying 141 Motion for Hearing; and Denying 142 Motion to take Deposition. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/27/2020. (ray)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 133 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/3/2018. (adm)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 120 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/18/2017. (adm)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED ORDER re 91 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 90 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/9/2017. (adm)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 JUDGMENT in favor of Sheaneter J. Bogan against MTD Consumer Group, Inc. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/20/2017. (psk)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/17/2017. (adm)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/1/2016. (geb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogan v. MTD Consumer Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheaneter J. Bogan
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD Consumer Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?