United States of America Upon the Relation and For the Use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right-of-Way over 3.28 Acres of Land, more or less, in Lee County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America Upon the Relation and For the Use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way over 3.28 Acres of Land, more or less, in Lee County, Mississippi, Freedom TD Products, Inc., Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC and Don B. Cannada
Case Number: 1:2015cv00019
Filed: January 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/17/17. (rel)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by reason of settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 5/15/17. (rel)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 51 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/6/17. (rel)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Motion Order of Possession. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/24/15. (rel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America Upon the Relation and For the Use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. An Easement and Right-of-Way over 3.28 Acres of Land, more or less, in Lee County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Upon the Relation and For the Use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Birdwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way over 3.28 Acres of Land, more or less, in Lee County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom TD Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Tire Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don B. Cannada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?