Best v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Dawn L. Best
Defendant: William D. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2015cv00086
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Limit Trial on Remand. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 08/30/2018. (bds)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 01/19/2017. (bds)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 54 Order on 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 08/23/2016. (bds) Modified on 8/23/2016 (dlh).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn L. Best
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Rachel Pierce Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?