Pulliam v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Sean C. Pulliam
Defendant: Hugh E. Brown and Harold Gwatney Chevrolet Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00137
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AGREED ORDER of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/17/2017. (dbm)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement per NOTICE 106 . This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 7/5/2017. (dbm)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/20/2016. (dbm)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Stay; Answer due 11/30/15 . Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/10/2015. (dbm) Modified on 11/10/2015 (jlm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulliam v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean C. Pulliam
Represented By: Kenneth Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Gwatney Chevrolet Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?