The Retail Coach, LLC v. Retail360, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Retail Coach, LLC
Defendant: Retail360, LLC and R360, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00032
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Presiding Judge: David A. Sanders
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/20/2017. (adm)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00032-SA-DAS, 1:16-cv-00125-SA-DAS (adm)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Parties are directed to file in the lead case, 1:16-cv-32-SA-DAS. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00032-SA-DAS, 1:16-cv-00125-SA-DAS (adm)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 42 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/3/2017. (adm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Retail Coach, LLC v. Retail360, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Retail Coach, LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail360, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R360, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?